Monica Hardaway, et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, et al
Defendant / Appellee: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INCORPORATED and DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Breach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-WL1, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-WL1
Plaintiff / Appellant: GLENN HARDAWAY and MONICA HARDAWAY
Case Number: 20-20224
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/20/2020 for Appellants Glenn Hardaway and Monica Hardaway. [20-20224] (CMB) [Entered: 06/09/2020 03:41 PM]
June 9, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-20224] (CMB) [Entered: 06/09/2020 03:40 PM]
June 4, 2020 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9327969-1] to the Motion to proceed IFP filed by Appellants Mrs. Monica Hardaway and Mr. Glenn Hardaway in 20-20224 [ # 9323638-2 ] Date of Service: 06/04/2020. [20-20224] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee and Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated [9327969-1] to the Motion filed by Appellants Mrs. Monica Hardaway and Mr. Glenn Hardaway [ # 9323638-2 ] Date of Service: 06/04/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Dove, Shirazi, Yoxall; Appellant Hardaway; US mail - Appellant Hardaway. [20-20224] (Christopher Dove ) [Entered: 06/04/2020 05:00 PM]
June 3, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:18-CV-1062. (Pleadings only) Electronic ROA due on 06/18/2020. [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 06/03/2020 02:52 PM]
May 29, 2020 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion to proceed IFP [ # 9323638-2 ] filed by Appellants Mr. Glenn Hardaway and Mrs. Monica Hardaway Date of Service: 05/29/2020 [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 06/03/2020 02:48 PM]
May 29, 2020 AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL STATUS filed by Appellants Mr. Glenn Hardaway and Mrs. Monica Hardaway in support of the Motion to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Mrs. Monica Hardaway in 20-20224 [ # 9323638-2 ].. [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 06/03/2020 02:47 PM]
May 29, 2020 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Glenn Hardaway to proceed in forma pauperis [9323638-2] Fee deadline canceled. Date of service: 05/29/2020 [20-20224] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Mrs. Monica Hardaway to proceed in forma pauperis [9323638-2]. Date of service: 05/29/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Dove, Shirazi, Yoxall; Appellant Hardaway; US mail - Appellant Hardaway [20-20224] (Monica Hardaway ) [Entered: 05/29/2020 07:40 PM]
May 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Sahar Haidari Shirazi for party(s) Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated, in case 20-20224 [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/19/2020 10:19 AM]
May 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christopher Dove for party(s) Appellee Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated, in case 20-20224 [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/19/2020 10:03 AM]
May 18, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-20224] (Sahar Haidari Shirazi ) [Entered: 05/18/2020 03:43 PM]
May 18, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-20224] (Christopher Dove ) [Entered: 05/18/2020 02:57 PM]
May 15, 2020 CLERK ORDER granting Motion for leave for pro se to file electronically filed by Appellant Mrs. Monica Hardaway [ # 9313987-2 ] [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/15/2020 10:30 AM]
May 15, 2020 MOTION filed by Appellant Mrs. Monica Hardaway for leave to file electronically as a pro se party [9313987-2]. Date of service: 05/14/2020 [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/15/2020 08:35 AM]
May 4, 2020 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 04/29/2020 denying IFP for Appellants Mr. Glenn Hardaway and Mrs. Monica Hardaway. Fee due on 06/03/2020 for Appellants Glenn Hardaway and Monica Hardaway [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/04/2020 11:24 AM]
May 4, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9305895-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-20224] (SDH) [Entered: 05/04/2020 11:19 AM]
April 27, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Glenn Hardaway and Mrs. Monica Hardaway [20-20224] (JMW) [Entered: 04/27/2020 08:15 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Monica Hardaway, et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INCORPORATED
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Represented By: Sahar Haidari Shirazi
Represented By: Christopher Dove Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Breach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-WL1, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-WL1
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Represented By: Sahar Haidari Shirazi
Represented By: Christopher Dove Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLENN HARDAWAY
Represented By: Glenn Hardaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MONICA HARDAWAY
Represented By: Monica Hardaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?