Laddy Valentine, et al v. Bryan Collier, et al
Defendant / Appellant: Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Robert Herrera and Bryan Collier
Plaintiff / Appellee: Laddy Curtis Valentine and Richard Elvin King
Case Number: 20-20525
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 13, 2020 Summary Valentine v. Collier

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 APPENDIX FILED by Appellees Mr. Richard Elvin King and Mr. Laddy Curtis Valentine Date of Service: 10/09/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cobe-Vasquez, Frederick, Hawkins; Attorney for Appellees: Duke, Edwards [20-20525] (Brandon W. Duke ) [Entered: 10/09/2020 11:58 PM]
October 9, 2020 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Richard Elvin King and Mr. Laddy Curtis Valentine [9418509-1] to the Motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Mr. Bryan Collier, Mr. Robert Herrera and TDCJ [ # 9414065-2 ], Motion for extraordinary relief filed by Appellants Mr. Bryan Collier, Mr. Robert Herrera and TDCJ [ # 9414065-3 ] Date of Service: 10/09/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cobe-Vasquez, Frederick, Hawkins; Attorney for Appellees: Duke, Edwards. [20-20525] (Brandon W. Duke ) [Entered: 10/09/2020 11:45 PM]
October 6, 2020 RESPONSE DUE to opposed motion for stay pending appeal filed by Appellants Mr. Bryan Collier, TDCJ and Mr. Robert Herrera in 20-20525 [ # 9414065-2 ]Response/Opposition due by 10/09/2020 [20-20525] (JMW) [Entered: 10/06/2020 04:38 PM]
October 6, 2020 COURT ORDER granting opposed motion for a temporary administrative stay during our consideration of its motion to stay the district court's permanent injunction pending appeal [ # 9414065-3 ], granting appellants' unopposed motion for leave to file redacted exhibits in support of its motion for stay pending appeal [ # 9414785-2 ]; granting appellants' unopposed motion to place exhibits 8,9, and 10 under seal [ # 9414210-2 ]; granting appellees' motion for leave to file a response by Friday, 10/9/20, to appellants' motion to stay the permanent injunction pending appeal [ # 9414460-2 ] [20-20525] (JMW) [Entered: 10/06/2020 04:34 PM]
October 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kyle Douglas Hawkins for party(s) Appellant Bryan Collier Appellant TDCJ Appellant Robert Herrera, in case 20-20525 [20-20525] (JMW) [Entered: 10/06/2020 01:42 PM]
October 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick for Appellant TDCJ in 20-20525, Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick for Appellant Robert Herrera in 20-20525, Attorney Matthew Hamilton Frederick for Appellant Bryan Collier in 20-20525 [20-20525] (JMW) [Entered: 10/06/2020 01:38 PM]
October 6, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Bryan Collier, Mr. Robert Herrera and TDCJ for leave to file redacted exhibits in support of the Emergency Motion to Stay Pending Appeal [9414785-2]. Date of service: 10/06/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cobe-Vasquez, Frederick; Attorney for Appellees: Duke, Edwards [20-20525] (Matthew Hamilton Frederick ) [Entered: 10/06/2020 10:15 AM]
October 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-20525] (Kyle Douglas Hawkins ) [Entered: 10/06/2020 09:55 AM]
October 5, 2020 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of motion stay pending appeal..... (Exhs. 8, 9 and 10) [ # 9414210-2 ] filed by Appellants Mr. Bryan Collier, Mr. Robert Herrera and TDCJ Date of Service: 10/05/2020 [20-20525] (JMW) [Entered: 10/06/2020 08:41 AM]
October 5, 2020 MOTION filed by Appellees Mr. Richard Elvin King and Mr. Laddy Curtis Valentine for leave to file a response by 10/9/20 [9414460-2] to the Motion filed by Appellants Mr. Bryan Collier, Mr. Robert Herrera and TDCJ [ # 9414065-2 ], Motion filed by Appellants Mr. Bryan Collier, Mr. Robert Herrera and TDCJ [ # 9414065-3 ]. Date of service: 10/05/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cobe-Vasquez, Frederick; Attorney for Appellees: Duke, Edwards [20-20525] (Brandon W. Duke ) [Entered: 10/05/2020 09:09 PM]
October 5, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Bryan Collier, Mr. Robert Herrera and TDCJ to place exhibits 8-10 under seal [9414210-2]. [20-20525] (JMW) [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:12 PM]
October 5, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9414189-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 10/20/2020 for Appellants Bryan Collier, Robert Herrera and Texas Department of Criminal Justice [20-20525] (CBW) [Entered: 10/05/2020 03:01 PM]
October 5, 2020 MOTION AND/OR DOCUMENT UNDER TEMPORARY SEAL pending a ruling by the court filed by Appellants Mr. Bryan Collier, Mr. Robert Herrera and TDCJ Exhibits 8-10 to Appellants' motion to stay pending appeal This document is unopposed. Date of service: 10/05/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cobe-Vasquez, Frederick; Attorney for Appellees: Duke, Edwards [20-20525] (Matthew Hamilton Frederick ) [Entered: 10/05/2020 02:28 PM]
October 5, 2020 REDACTED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT FILED by Appellants Mr. Bryan Collier, Mr. Robert Herrera and TDCJ Date of Service: 10/05/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cobe-Vasquez, Frederick; Attorney for Appellees: Duke, Edwards [20-20525] Voluminous) (Matthew Hamilton Frederick ) [Entered: 10/05/2020 02:19 PM]
October 5, 2020 OPPOSED MOTION for a temporary administrative stay while it considers this motion [9414065-3]. [20-20525] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Bryan Collier, Mr. Robert Herrera and TDCJ for stay pending appeal [9414065-2] Ruling is requested by: 10/13/2020. Date of service: 10/05/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Cobe-Vasquez, Frederick; Attorney for Appellees: Duke, Edwards [20-20525] (Matthew Hamilton Frederick ) [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:52 PM]
October 5, 2020 Attorney Matthew Frederick added as counsel of record for Appellants Bryan Collier, Robert Herrera and TDCJ in 20-20525 [20-20525] (CAG) [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:06 PM]
October 5, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-20525] (Matthew Hamilton Frederick ) [Entered: 10/05/2020 11:36 AM]
October 2, 2020 PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Bryan Collier, Mr. Robert Herrera and TDCJ [20-20525] (CBW) [Entered: 10/02/2020 12:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Laddy Valentine, et al v. Bryan Collier, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Texas Department of Criminal Justice
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Christin Audrey Cobe-Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Robert Herrera
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Christin Audrey Cobe-Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Bryan Collier
Represented By: Kyle Douglas Hawkins
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Christin Audrey Cobe-Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Laddy Curtis Valentine
Represented By: Jeff S. Edwards
Represented By: Brandon W. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Richard Elvin King
Represented By: Jeff S. Edwards
Represented By: Brandon W. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?