Ortiz v. Collier
Defendant / Appellee: Alisha Chiles, M. Lewandowski, Bryan Collier, Oscar Mendoza, Assistant Warden J. C. Gonzales, A. Correll, Tommy Ybarra, Warden Robert D. Herrera, Erica V. Hopkins, Lorie Davis, Brittney M. Tillev and Lakisha S. Murphy
Plaintiff / Appellant: Anthony Ortiz
Case Number: 20-20635
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 DISMISSAL NOTICE ISSUED for failure to pay fee [9494841-2] Fee deadline canceled. DIS-1 Remedy due on 02/17/2021 for Appellant Anthony Ortiz. [20-20635] (RLL) [Entered: 02/02/2021 09:02 AM]
January 15, 2021 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken on the 1/12/21 letter request for an extension of time to pay the $400 filing fee and request for a copy of the rules received from Appellant Mr. Anthony Ortiz. On 1/13/21 notice was issued advising that of an extension of time to pay the $505 filing fee for the appeal was extended until 1/27/21. This notice has crossed in the mail. Enclosing a copy of the rules as requested. [20-20635] (DLM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 10:02 AM]
January 11, 2021 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken on the 1/5/21 Correspondence received from Appellant Mr. Anthony Ortiz referring to the $400 filing fee and an asserted claim of imminent danger addressed in his prematurely received appellant's brief. Because he refers to the $400 filing fee for the complaint, not the $505 appeal fee, no action will be taken. 20-20635] (DLM) [Entered: 01/13/2021 10:58 AM]
December 28, 2020 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the brief received from Appellant Mr. Anthony Ortiz because it is premature. Fee due deadline of 12/28/20 [20-20635] (JMW) [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:34 PM]
December 10, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9460498-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 12/28/2020 for Appellant Anthony Ortiz [20-20635] (ABT) [Entered: 12/10/2020 12:33 PM]
December 7, 2020 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Anthony Ortiz [20-20635] (ABT) [Entered: 12/07/2020 12:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alisha Chiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. Lewandowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bryan Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Oscar Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Assistant Warden J. C. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A. Correll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tommy Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Warden Robert D. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Erica V. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brittney M. Tillev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lakisha S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Anthony Ortiz
Represented By: Anthony Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?