In re: Chinese-Manufactured
Defendant / Appellee: KNAUF DO BRASIL, LIMITED, GEBRUEDER KNAUF VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT, KG, KNAUF INTERNATIONAL GMBH, KNAUF GIPS KG, KNAUF UK GMBH, GUANGDONG KNAUF NEW BUILDING MATERIAL PRODUCTS COMPANY, LIMITED, KNAUF AMF GMBH AND COMPANY, KG, KNAUF INSULATION GMBH, KNAUF PLASTERBOARD WUHU COMPANY, LIMITED, PT KNAUF GYPSUM INDONESIA and KNAUF PLASTERBOARD TIANJIN COMPANY, LIMITED
Plaintiff / Appellant: GUILFORT DIEUVIL
Case Number: 20-30120
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 20, 2020 Summary Dieuvil v. Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft, KG

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/18/2020 for Appellant Guilfort Dieuvil. [20-30120] (SEP) [Entered: 04/07/2020 11:13 AM]
April 7, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-30120] (SEP) [Entered: 04/07/2020 11:12 AM]
April 3, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:09-MD-2047 (See document 22691for designation) and 2:13-CV-609. Electronic ROA due on 04/20/2020. [20-30120] (MCS) [Entered: 04/03/2020 01:31 PM]
April 1, 2020 LETTER filed advising that the designation of the record has been filed with the District Court. (DC docket number 22691). Case Management deadline satisfied. [20-30120] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Appellees Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft, KG, Guangdong Knauf New Building Material Products Company, Limited, Knauf AMF GMBH and Company, KG, Knauf Do Brasil, Limited, Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Insulation GMBH, Knauf International GMBH, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Company, Limited, Knauf Plasterboard Wuhu Company, Limited, Knauf UK GMBH and PT Knauf Gypsum Indonesia referencing Clerk Order to file stipulated record on appeal [ # 9274847-2 ]. Date of Service: 04/01/2020 via email - Appellant Dieuvil; Attorney for Appellees: Dysart, Miller [20-30120] (Kerry J. Miller ) [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:52 PM]
March 27, 2020 OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [9281573-2]. Response/Opposition due on 04/06/2020. [20-30120] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft, KG, Guangdong Knauf New Building Material Products Company, Limited, Knauf AMF GMBH and Company, KG, Knauf Do Brasil, Limited, Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Insulation GMBH, Knauf International GMBH, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Company, Limited, Knauf Plasterboard Wuhu Company, Limited, Knauf UK GMBH and PT Knauf Gypsum Indonesia to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [9281573-2]. Date of service: 03/27/2020 via email - Appellant Dieuvil; Attorney for Appellees: Dysart, Miller [20-30120] (Kerry J. Miller ) [Entered: 03/27/2020 12:55 PM]
March 19, 2020 FEE PAID by Appellant Mr. Guilfort Dieuvil. Fee deadline satisfied [20-30120] (AGL) [Entered: 03/19/2020 10:03 AM]
March 19, 2020 CLERK ORDER directing parties to file stipulated record on appeal, designating only those documents in the record relevant to this appeal [9274847-2] Case Management due on 04/02/2020 [20-30120] (AGL) [Entered: 03/19/2020 10:16 AM]
March 5, 2020 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Kyle A. Spaulding is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:he is no longer associated with this matter. [20-30120] (MCS) [Entered: 03/05/2020 07:38 AM]
March 4, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9263807-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 03/19/2020 for Appellant Guilfort Dieuvil [20-30120] (MRW) [Entered: 03/04/2020 11:22 AM]
March 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30120] (Daniel John Dysart ) [Entered: 03/04/2020 01:14 PM]
March 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Kerry J. Miller for Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft, KG, Knauf AMF GMBH and Company, KG, Knauf Do Brasil, Limited, Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Insulation GMBH, Knauf International GMBH, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Company, Limited, Knauf Plasterboard Wuhu Company, Limited and Knauf UK GMBH for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-30120] (Kerry J. Miller ) [Entered: 03/04/2020 03:52 PM]
March 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Daniel John Dysart for party(s) Appellee PT Knauf Gypsum Indonesia Appellee Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft, KG Appellee Knauf Gips KG Appellee Knauf Plasterboard Wuhu Company, Limited Appellee Guangdong Knauf New Building Material Products Company, Limited Appellee Knauf International GMBH Appellee Knauf AMF GMBH and Company, KG Appellee Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Company, Limited Appellee Knauf Insulation GMBH Appellee Knauf Do Brasil, Limited Appellee Knauf UK GMBH, in case 20-30120 [20-30120] (MCS) [Entered: 03/04/2020 04:27 PM]
March 4, 2020 LETTER filed by Appellees Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft, KG, Knauf AMF GMBH and Company, KG, Knauf Do Brasil, Limited, Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Insulation GMBH, Knauf International GMBH, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Company, Limited, Knauf Plasterboard Wuhu Company, Limited and Knauf UK GMBH The letter is requesting that Kyle Spaulding be removed. Mr. Miller and Mr. Spaulding no longer work together and Mr. Spaulding does not represent any of the appellees in this matter.. Date of Service: 03/04/2020 via US mail - Appellant Dieuvil; email - Attorney for Appellees: Dysart, Miller, Spaulding [20-30120] (Kerry J. Miller ) [Entered: 03/04/2020 04:39 PM]
March 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kerry J. Miller for party(s) Appellee PT Knauf Gypsum Indonesia Appellee Guangdong Knauf New Building Material Products Company, Limited, in case 20-30120, by Attorney Kerry J. Miller for Appellee Knauf Plasterboard Wuhu Company, Limited in 20-30120, Attorney Kerry J. Miller for Appellee Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Company, Limited in 20-30120, Attorney Kerry J. Miller for Appellee Knauf Gips KG in 20-30120, Attorney Kerry J. Miller for Appellee Knauf Do Brasil, Limited in 20-30120, Attorney Kerry J. Miller for Appellee Knauf AMF GMBH and Company, KG in 20-30120, Attorney Kerry J. Miller for Appellee Knauf UK GMBH in 20-30120, Attorney Kerry J. Miller for Appellee Knauf Insulation GMBH in 20-30120, Attorney Kerry J. Miller for Appellee Knauf International GMBH in 20-30120, Attorney Kerry J. Miller for Appellee Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft, KG in 20-30120 [20-30120] (MCS) [Entered: 03/04/2020 09:03 PM]
February 21, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Guilfort Dieuvil. [20-30120] (RLL) [Entered: 02/21/2020 11:58 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Chinese-Manufactured
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KNAUF DO BRASIL, LIMITED
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Kyle Andrew Spaulding
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GEBRUEDER KNAUF VERWALTUNGSGESELLSCHAFT, KG
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Kyle Andrew Spaulding
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KNAUF INTERNATIONAL GMBH
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Kyle Andrew Spaulding
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KNAUF GIPS KG
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Kyle Andrew Spaulding
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KNAUF UK GMBH
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Kyle Andrew Spaulding
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GUANGDONG KNAUF NEW BUILDING MATERIAL PRODUCTS COMPANY, LIMITED
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KNAUF AMF GMBH AND COMPANY, KG
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Kyle Andrew Spaulding
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KNAUF INSULATION GMBH
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Kyle Andrew Spaulding
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KNAUF PLASTERBOARD WUHU COMPANY, LIMITED
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Kyle Andrew Spaulding
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PT KNAUF GYPSUM INDONESIA
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KNAUF PLASTERBOARD TIANJIN COMPANY, LIMITED
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Represented By: Kyle Andrew Spaulding
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GUILFORT DIEUVIL
Represented By: Guilfort Dieuvil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?