Lisa Leblanc, et al v. Texas Brine Company, L.L.C., et al
Defendant / Appellee: AMERICAN GUARANTEE & LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY, LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PENNSYLVANIA, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, AIG SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, formerly known as American International Surplus Lines Insurance Company, formerly known as American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company and STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff / Appellee: DIANNE SANCHEZ, CASEY GILLIOT, MICHAEL STEWART, GERTRUDE SANCHEZ and JUSTIN FREY
Defendant / Appellant: TEXAS BRINE COMPANY, L.L.C.
Case Number: 20-30208
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 COURT ORDER that appellant's unopposed motion to view and obtain sealed documents is GRATNED [ # 9312760-2 ]. [20-30208] (MCS) [Entered: 05/13/2020 03:59 PM]
May 13, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Texas Brine Company, L.L.C. to view and obtain sealed document. Date of service: 05/13/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Centola, Fayard, Gray, Honeycutt, Johnson, Laurendine, Mercer, Mollere, Perque; Attorney for Appellants: Chocheles, Freedman, Garner, Hilbert [20-30208] (James M. Garner ) [Entered: 05/13/2020 01:54 PM]
May 8, 2020 COURT ORDER granting Motion to view and obtain sealed document filed by Appellees National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Lexington Insurance Company and AIG Specialty Insurance Company [ # 9309120-2 ] [20-30208] (CBW) [Entered: 05/08/2020 04:13 PM]
May 7, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees AIG Specialty Insurance Company, Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Lexington Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania to view and obtain sealed document. Date of service: 05/07/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Centola, Fayard, Gray, Honeycutt, Johnson, Laurendine, Mercer, Mollere, Perque; Attorney for Appellants: Chocheles, Freedman, Garner, Hilbert [20-30208] (Mary S. Johnson ) [Entered: 05/07/2020 04:54 PM]
April 23, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/02/2020 for Appellant Texas Brine Company, L.L.C.. [20-30208] (DDL) [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:25 PM]
April 23, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-30208] (DDL) [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:24 PM]
April 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Glen Mercer for Appellee Zurich American Insurance Company in 20-30208, Attorney Glen Mercer for Appellee Steadfast Insurance Company in 20-30208, Attorney Glen Mercer for Appellee American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company in 20-30208 [20-30208] (MCS) [Entered: 04/03/2020 02:57 PM]
April 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-30208] (Glen Mercer ) [Entered: 04/03/2020 02:24 PM]
April 2, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Calvin Clifford Fayard Jr. for Appellee Justin Frey in 20-30208, Attorney Calvin Clifford Fayard Jr. for Appellee Gertrude Sanchez in 20-30208, Attorney Calvin Clifford Fayard Jr. for Appellee Casey Gilliot in 20-30208, Attorney Calvin Clifford Fayard Jr. for Appellee Michael Stewart in 20-30208, Attorney Calvin Clifford Fayard Jr. for Appellee Dianne Sanchez in 20-30208 [20-30208] (MCS) [Entered: 04/02/2020 01:49 PM]
April 1, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Calvin Clifford Fayard, Jr., Esq. for Mr. Justin Frey, Mr. Casey Gilliot, Dianne Sanchez, Ms. Gertrude Sanchez and Mr. Michael Stewart for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30208] (Calvin Clifford Fayard Jr.) [Entered: 04/01/2020 04:57 PM]
April 1, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:12-CV-2059 and 2:13-CV-5227. Electronic ROA due on 04/16/2020. [20-30208] (MCS) [Entered: 04/01/2020 02:57 PM]
April 1, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Texas Brine Company, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [20-30208] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Texas Brine Company, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 04/01/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Centola, Fayard, Gray, Honeycutt, Johnson, Laurendine, Mercer, Mollere, Perque; Attorney for Appellants: Chocheles, Freedman, Garner, Hilbert [20-30208] (James M. Garner ) [Entered: 04/01/2020 09:38 AM]
April 1, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ingrid Kemp Laurendine for party(s) Appellee National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania Appellee Lexington Insurance Company Appellee AIG Specialty Insurance Company Appellee Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, in case 20-30208 [20-30208] (MCS) [Entered: 04/01/2020 09:15 AM]
April 1, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Nichole Mart Gray for party(s) Appellee National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania Appellee Lexington Insurance Company Appellee AIG Specialty Insurance Company Appellee Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, in case 20-30208 [20-30208] (MCS) [Entered: 04/01/2020 09:11 AM]
April 1, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Chadwick James Mollere for party(s) Appellee National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania Appellee Lexington Insurance Company Appellee AIG Specialty Insurance Company Appellee Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, in case 20-30208 [20-30208] (MCS) [Entered: 04/01/2020 08:55 AM]
April 1, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Mary S. Johnson for Appellee National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania in 20-30208, Attorney Mary S. Johnson for Appellee AIG Specialty Insurance Company in 20-30208, Attorney Mary S. Johnson for Appellee Lexington Insurance Company in 20-30208, Attorney Mary S. Johnson for Appellee Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania in 20-30208 [20-30208] (MCS) [Entered: 04/01/2020 08:46 AM]
April 1, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David Adam Freedman for party(s) Appellant Texas Brine Company, L.L.C., in case 20-30208 [20-30208] (MCS) [Entered: 04/01/2020 08:42 AM]
April 1, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christopher T. Chocheles for party(s) Appellant Texas Brine Company, L.L.C., in case 20-30208 [20-30208] (MCS) [Entered: 04/01/2020 08:40 AM]
April 1, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Peter L. Hilbert Jr. for party(s) Appellant Texas Brine Company, L.L.C., in case 20-30208 [20-30208] (MCS) [Entered: 04/01/2020 08:38 AM]
April 1, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney James M. Garner for Appellant Texas Brine Company, L.L.C. in 20-30208 [20-30208] (MCS) [Entered: 04/01/2020 08:21 AM]
March 31, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30208] (Ingrid Kemp Laurendine ) [Entered: 03/31/2020 03:17 PM]
March 31, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30208] (Nichole Mart Gray ) [Entered: 03/31/2020 03:15 PM]
March 31, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30208] (Chadwick James Mollere ) [Entered: 03/31/2020 03:13 PM]
March 31, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Mary S. Johnson, Esq. for AIG Specialty Insurance Company, Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Lexington Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-30208] (Mary S. Johnson ) [Entered: 03/31/2020 03:10 PM]
March 31, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30208] (David Adam Freedman ) [Entered: 03/31/2020 02:55 PM]
March 31, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30208] (Christopher T. Chocheles ) [Entered: 03/31/2020 02:53 PM]
March 31, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-30208] (Peter L. Hilbert Jr.) [Entered: 03/31/2020 02:51 PM]
March 31, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. James M. Garner, Esq. for Texas Brine Company, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-30208] (James M. Garner ) [Entered: 03/31/2020 02:49 PM]
March 31, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David Blayne Honeycutt for party(s) Appellee Michael Stewart Appellee Casey Gilliot Appellee Gertrude Sanchez Appellee Justin Frey Appellee Dianne Sanchez, in case 20-30208 [20-30208] (MCS) [Entered: 03/31/2020 01:58 PM]
March 31, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-30208] (David Blayne Honeycutt ) [Entered: 03/31/2020 12:31 PM]
March 31, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9283288-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 04/15/2020 for Appellant Texas Brine Company, L.L.C. [20-30208] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/31/2020 09:04 AM]
March 25, 2020 PARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEET.) [20-30208] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/25/2020 10:24 AM]
March 25, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Texas Brine Company, L.L.C. [20-30208] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/25/2020 10:20 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lisa Leblanc, et al v. Texas Brine Company, L.L.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN GUARANTEE & LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Glen Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Mary S. Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Chadwick James Mollere
Represented By: Ingrid Kemp Laurendine
Represented By: Nichole Mart Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Mary S. Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Chadwick James Mollere
Represented By: Ingrid Kemp Laurendine
Represented By: Nichole Mart Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Mary S. Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Chadwick James Mollere
Represented By: Ingrid Kemp Laurendine
Represented By: Nichole Mart Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Glen Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AIG SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, formerly known as American International Surplus Lines Insurance Company, formerly known as American International Specialty Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Mary S. Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Chadwick James Mollere
Represented By: Ingrid Kemp Laurendine
Represented By: Nichole Mart Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEADFAST INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Glen Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DIANNE SANCHEZ
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph Centola Esq. III
Represented By: Richard Gerard Perque
Represented By: David Blayne Honeycutt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CASEY GILLIOT
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph Centola Esq. III
Represented By: Richard Gerard Perque
Represented By: David Blayne Honeycutt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MICHAEL STEWART
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph Centola Esq. III
Represented By: Richard Gerard Perque
Represented By: David Blayne Honeycutt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GERTRUDE SANCHEZ
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph Centola Esq. III
Represented By: Richard Gerard Perque
Represented By: David Blayne Honeycutt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JUSTIN FREY
Represented By: Calvin Clifford Fayard Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence Joseph Centola Esq. III
Represented By: Richard Gerard Perque
Represented By: David Blayne Honeycutt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: TEXAS BRINE COMPANY, L.L.C.
Represented By: James M. Garner Esq.
Represented By: Christopher T. Chocheles
Represented By: Peter L. Hilbert Esq. Jr.
Represented By: David Adam Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?