R. Ceasar v. Veterans Admin Medical Center, et al
Defendant / Appellee: VETERANS ADMINISTRATION MEDICAL CENTER OF ALEXANDRIA, PETER DANCY, Hospital Director and HAMILTON, Deputy Director
Plaintiff / Appellant: R. CEASAR
Case Number: 20-30396
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 CLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to pay fee [9365057-2] [20-30396] (MAS) [Entered: 07/28/2020 01:46 PM]
July 13, 2020 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Motion for IFP and Brief received from Appellant Mr. R. Ceasar because Motion is not in the proper format and does not comply. The brief is premature and cannot be handwritten [20-30396] (MAS) [Entered: 07/15/2020 02:20 PM]
July 6, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9348383-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Fee due on 07/21/2020, for Appellant R. Ceasar. [20-30396] (DLJ) [Entered: 07/06/2020 08:05 AM]
June 25, 2020 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. R. Ceasar. [20-30396] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: R. Ceasar v. Veterans Admin Medical Center, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VETERANS ADMINISTRATION MEDICAL CENTER OF ALEXANDRIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PETER DANCY, Hospital Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAMILTON, Deputy Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: R. CEASAR
Represented By: R. Ceasar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?