Francis Smith v. Charles Osborne, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Atticus Cox, Scott Mays, Michael Kersten, Charles David Dawson, Attorney General, City of Denton, Texas, United States Department of Homeland Security, Charles Dawson Osborne, James Pentecost, Todd Hileman, David Kershaw, Chris Watts, United States Attorney General United States of America, Patricia McDaniel Osborne, Stephanie Berry, United States Postal Service, Does 1-100 and Edward Oster
Plaintiff / Appellant: Francis Amodu Smith
Case Number: 20-40684
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert Austin Wells for Appellee DHS in 20-40684, Attorney Robert Austin Wells for Appellee United States Attorney General United States of America in 20-40684, Attorney Robert Austin Wells for Appellee Attorney General in 20-40684, Attorney Robert Austin Wells for Appellee USPS in 20-40684 [20-40684] (SDH) [Entered: 12/01/2020 02:03 PM]
December 1, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert Austin Wells, Esq. for Attorney General, United States Attorney General United States of America, DHS and USPS for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40684] (Robert Austin Wells ) [Entered: 12/01/2020 09:28 AM]
November 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Caleb Peter Garcia for party(s) Appellee City of Denton, Texas Appellee Todd Hileman Appellee Chris Watts Appellee Stephanie Berry, in case 20-40684 [20-40684] (NFD) [Entered: 11/23/2020 10:49 AM]
November 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40684] (Caleb Peter Garcia ) [Entered: 11/19/2020 07:48 AM]
November 5, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/15/2020 for Appellant Francis Amodu Smith. [20-40684] (RLL) [Entered: 11/05/2020 04:43 PM]
November 5, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-40684] (RLL) [Entered: 11/05/2020 04:42 PM]
October 21, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:18-CV-906. Electronic ROA due on 11/05/2020. [20-40684] (SDH) [Entered: 10/21/2020 11:35 AM]
October 21, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9425799-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-40684] (SDH) [Entered: 10/21/2020 11:32 AM]
October 14, 2020 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Francis Amodu Smith [20-40684] (ABT) [Entered: 10/14/2020 07:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Francis Smith v. Charles Osborne, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Atticus Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Michael Kersten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Charles David Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Attorney General
Represented By: Robert Austin Wells Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of Denton, Texas
Represented By: Caleb Peter Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Robert Austin Wells Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Charles Dawson Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Pentecost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Todd Hileman
Represented By: Caleb Peter Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: David Kershaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Chris Watts
Represented By: Caleb Peter Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Attorney General United States of America
Represented By: Robert Austin Wells Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Patricia McDaniel Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Stephanie Berry
Represented By: Jerry Edward Drake Jr.
Represented By: Caleb Peter Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Robert Austin Wells Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Edward Oster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Francis Amodu Smith
Represented By: Francis Amodu Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?