Pittman v. U.S. Bank
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. Bank, N.A., as successor of Bank of America, NA,, as successor of LaSalle Bank, N.A., on behalf of Registered Holders of Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I Trust 2006-HE-5, Aset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE5, Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated and U.S. Bank, N.A., as successor of Bank of America, NA,, as successor of LaSalle Bank, N.A., on behalf of Registered Holders of Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I Trust 2006-HE-5, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE5
Plaintiff / Appellant: Cheryl Pittman
Case Number: 20-40723
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 22, 2021 Pittman v. U.S. Bank, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/29/2020 for Appellant Cheryl Pittman. [20-40723] (RLL) [Entered: 11/19/2020 12:40 PM]
November 19, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-40723] (RLL) [Entered: 11/19/2020 12:39 PM]
November 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Daron L. Janis for Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated in 20-40723, Attorney Daron L. Janis for Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A. in 20-40723, Attorney Thomas George Yoxall for Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated in 20-40723, Attorney Thomas George Yoxall for Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A. in 20-40723 [20-40723] (SDH) [Entered: 11/06/2020 11:00 AM]
November 5, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Matthew Kyle Hansen for Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated in 20-40723, Attorney Matthew Kyle Hansen for Appellee U.S. Bank, N.A. in 20-40723 [20-40723] (SDH) [Entered: 11/05/2020 04:11 PM]
November 5, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40723] (Matthew Kyle Hansen ) [Entered: 11/05/2020 12:33 PM]
November 5, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Thomas George Yoxall for Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated and U.S. Bank, N.A. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40723] (Thomas George Yoxall ) [Entered: 11/05/2020 11:18 AM]
November 5, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Daron L. Janis, Esq. for Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated and U.S. Bank, N.A. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40723] (Daron L. Janis ) [Entered: 11/05/2020 10:46 AM]
November 5, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:19-CV-397. Electronic ROA due on 11/20/2020. [20-40723] (SDH) [Entered: 11/05/2020 09:33 AM]
November 4, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [20-40723] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Cheryl Pittman advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 11/04/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Hansen, Hard-Wilson, Janis, Yoxall; Attorney for Appellant: Sandberg; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Hard-Wilson [20-40723] (Jeffrey Robert Sandberg ) [Entered: 11/04/2020 03:23 PM]
November 4, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9435547-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 11/19/2020 for Appellant Cheryl Pittman [20-40723] (SDH) [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:55 AM]
October 30, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jeffrey Robert Sandberg for Appellant Cheryl Pittman in 20-40723 [20-40723] (ABT) [Entered: 10/30/2020 09:49 AM]
October 28, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jeffrey Robert Sandberg, Esq. for Ms. Cheryl Pittman for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40723] (Jeffrey Robert Sandberg ) [Entered: 10/28/2020 04:10 PM]
October 26, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Cheryl Pittman [20-40723] (ABT) [Entered: 10/26/2020 05:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Pittman v. U.S. Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. Bank, N.A., as successor of Bank of America, NA,, as successor of LaSalle Bank, N.A., on behalf of Registered Holders of Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I Trust 2006-HE-5, Aset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE5
Represented By: Matthew Kyle Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Daron L. Janis Esq.
Represented By: Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew Kyle Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Daron L. Janis Esq.
Represented By: Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. Bank, N.A., as successor of Bank of America, NA,, as successor of LaSalle Bank, N.A., on behalf of Registered Holders of Bear Stearns Asset Backed Securities I Trust 2006-HE-5, Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-HE5
Represented By: Matthew Kyle Hansen Esq.
Represented By: Daron L. Janis Esq.
Represented By: Brenda Amber Hard-Wilson
Represented By: Thomas George Yoxall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cheryl Pittman
Represented By: Jeffrey Robert Sandberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?