Beal v. Wilmington Trust
Plaintiff / Appellant: Elizabeth B. Beal and Ronnie Beal
Defendant / Appellee: Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated, Wilmington Trust, N.A. and Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 20-40847
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 FEE PAID by Appellants Mrs. Elizabeth B. Beal and Mr. Ronnie Beal. [20-40847] (JMW) [Entered: 02/03/2021 03:29 PM]
January 25, 2021 MOTION filed by pro se appellant Mrs. Elizabeth B. Beal to reopen case [9489809-2] Default has NOT been remedied. Date of service: 01/24/2021 Document is insufficient for the following reasons: case caption must match our case caption exactly; signature of appellant, Ronnie Beal also required. Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Reply due on 02/04/2021 for Appellants Elizabeth B. Beal and Ronnie Beal [20-40847] (JMW) [Entered: 01/26/2021 11:29 AM]
January 12, 2021 CLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to pay fee [9480231-2]; failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter[9480231-2] [20-40847] (JMW) [Entered: 01/12/2021 10:59 AM]
December 31, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Michael F. Hord for Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated in 20-40847, Attorney Michael F. Hord for Appellee Citibank, N.A. in 20-40847, Attorney Michael F. Hord for Appellee Wilmington Trust, N.A. in 20-40847 [20-40847] (ABT) [Entered: 12/31/2020 12:34 PM]
December 29, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Michael F. Hord, Esq. for Citibank, N.A., Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated and Wilmington Trust, N.A. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40847] (Michael F. Hord ) [Entered: 12/29/2020 11:19 AM]
December 28, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jeffrey Alan Shadwick for party(s) Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated Appellee Citibank, N.A. Appellee Wilmington Trust, N.A., in case 20-40847 [20-40847] (ABT) [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:26 PM]
December 28, 2020 Attorney Mr. Michael F. Hord, Esq. for Appellees Citibank, N.A., Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated and Wilmington Trust, N.A. is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [20-40847] (LBM) [Entered: 12/28/2020 02:30 PM]
December 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-40847] (Jeffrey Alan Shadwick ) [Entered: 12/23/2020 04:13 PM]
December 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-40847] (Rupert Fraser Barron ) [Entered: 12/23/2020 03:58 PM]
December 22, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9468814-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 01/06/2021 for Appellants Elizabeth B. Beal and Ronnie Beal. Transcript order due on 01/06/2021 for Appellants Elizabeth B. Beal and Ronnie Beal [20-40847] (ABT) [Entered: 12/22/2020 05:03 PM]
December 17, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Elizabeth B. Beal and Mr. Ronnie Beal [20-40847] (ABT) [Entered: 12/17/2020 04:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Beal v. Wilmington Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Elizabeth B. Beal
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Beal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ronnie Beal
Represented By: Ronnie Beal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Select Portfolio Servicing, Incorporated
Represented By: Eric Craig Mettenbrink
Represented By: Michael F. Hord Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Shadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wilmington Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Eric Craig Mettenbrink
Represented By: Michael F. Hord Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Shadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Eric Craig Mettenbrink
Represented By: Michael F. Hord Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Shadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?