David Hutchings v. County of Llano, Texas, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Judge Evan Stubbs, Llano County, Ron Cunningham, Llano County Judge, Joyce Gillow, Scott Dudley, Llanos Central Appraisal District, LLano County Tax Assessor/Collector, Llano Central Appraisal District, Bill Blackburn, Sheriff of the Llano County Sheriff's Office, County of Llano, Texas, 424th Judicial District Court, Llano County, Texas, Llano County Emergency Services, Gilbert Bennett, Officer of Llano County Emergency Services, Llano Independent School District, Kris Fogelberg, Officer in the Llano County Tax Assessor/Collector's Office, Mac Edwards, Officer/Superintendent of the Llano ISD and Llano County Sheriff's Office
Plaintiff / Appellant: David Roy Hutchings
Case Number: 20-50885
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/25/2021 for Appellant David Roy Hutchings. [20-50885] (DDL) [Entered: 12/14/2020 03:11 PM]
December 14, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-50885] (DDL) [Entered: 12/14/2020 03:10 PM]
December 11, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Bridget Ranee Robinson for Appellee Mac Edwards in 20-50885, Attorney Bridget Ranee Robinson for Appellee Llano Independent School District in 20-50885 [20-50885] (CAS) [Entered: 12/11/2020 03:55 PM]
December 11, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 1:20-CV-308. Electronic ROA due on 12/28/2020. [20-50885] (CAS) [Entered: 12/11/2020 01:43 PM]
December 11, 2020 FEE PAID by Appellant Mr. David Roy Hutchings. Fee deadline satisfied [20-50885] (CAS) [Entered: 12/11/2020 01:42 PM]
December 9, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Bridget Ranee Robinson for Mr. Mac Edwards and Llano Independent School District for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50885] (Bridget Ranee Robinson ) [Entered: 12/09/2020 02:39 PM]
December 7, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joanna Lippman Salinas for Appellee Joyce Gillow in 20-50885, Attorney Joanna Lippman Salinas for Appellee Gilbert Bennett in 20-50885, Attorney Joanna Lippman Salinas for Appellee Kris Fogelberg in 20-50885, Attorney Joanna Lippman Salinas for Appellee Bill Blackburn in 20-50885, Attorney Joanna Lippman Salinas for Appellee Ron Cunningham in 20-50885, Attorney Joanna Lippman Salinas for Appellee County of Llano, Texas in 20-50885 [20-50885] (LLL) [Entered: 12/07/2020 01:56 PM]
December 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Joanna Lippman Salinas, Esq. for Mr. Gilbert Bennett, Mr. Bill Blackburn, County of Llano, Texas, Mr. Ron Cunningham, Mr. Kris Fogelberg and Ms. Joyce Gillow for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50885] (Joanna Lippman Salinas ) [Entered: 12/04/2020 02:23 PM]
December 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael Abrams for party(s) Appellee 424th Judicial District Court Appellee Evan Stubbs, in case 20-50885 [20-50885] (CAS) [Entered: 12/04/2020 09:44 AM]
December 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-50885] (Michael Abrams ) [Entered: 12/03/2020 12:46 PM]
November 25, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9450553-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Fee due on 12/10/2020 for Appellant David Roy Hutchings [20-50885] (CAS) [Entered: 11/25/2020 02:28 PM]
October 19, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. David Roy Hutchings [20-50885] (LEF) [Entered: 10/19/2020 10:40 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: David Hutchings v. County of Llano, Texas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Judge Evan Stubbs, Llano County
Represented By: Cory A. Scanlon
Represented By: Michael Abrams
Represented By: Cory A. Scanlon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ron Cunningham, Llano County Judge
Represented By: Joanna Lippman Salinas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joyce Gillow
Represented By: Joanna Lippman Salinas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Dudley, Llanos Central Appraisal District
Represented By: D. Kirk Swinney
Represented By: James R. Evans Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LLano County Tax Assessor/Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Llano Central Appraisal District
Represented By: D. Kirk Swinney
Represented By: James R. Evans Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bill Blackburn, Sheriff of the Llano County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Joanna Lippman Salinas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: County of Llano, Texas
Represented By: Joanna Lippman Salinas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: 424th Judicial District Court, Llano County, Texas
Represented By: Cory A. Scanlon
Represented By: Michael Abrams
Represented By: Cory A. Scanlon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Llano County Emergency Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gilbert Bennett, Officer of Llano County Emergency Services
Represented By: Joanna Lippman Salinas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Llano Independent School District
Represented By: Bridget Ranee Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kris Fogelberg, Officer in the Llano County Tax Assessor/Collector's Office
Represented By: Joanna Lippman Salinas Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mac Edwards, Officer/Superintendent of the Llano ISD
Represented By: Bridget Ranee Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Llano County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: David Roy Hutchings
Represented By: David Roy Hutchings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?