Cargill v. Wilkinson
Plaintiff / Appellant: Michael Cargill
Defendant / Appellee: Regina Lombardo, in her official capacity as Acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, United States Department of Justice, Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General, Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting U.S. Attorney General and Robert M. Wilkinson, Acting U.S. Attorney General
Case Number: 20-51016
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Michael Cargill. Extension Granted to and including 03/08/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 03/08/2021 for Appellant Michael Cargill [20-51016] (LLL) [Entered: 02/01/2021 12:36 PM]
February 1, 2021 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Michael Cargill for filing Opening Brief until 03/08/2021 [20-51016] (Caleb Kruckenberg ) [Entered: 02/01/2021 11:01 AM]
January 25, 2021 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: case caption updated. Jeffrey A. Rosen has been replaced by Robert M. Wilkinson. [20-51016] (LLL) [Entered: 01/25/2021 09:02 AM]
January 22, 2021 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: updated caption [20-51016] (MAS) [Entered: 01/22/2021 03:21 PM]
January 5, 2021 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: case caption updated [20-51016] (LLL) [Entered: 01/05/2021 02:28 PM]
January 4, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Abby Christine Wright for party(s) Appellee Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting U.S. Attorney General Appellee Regina Lombardo, in case 20-51016 [20-51016] (LLL) [Entered: 01/04/2021 04:57 PM]
January 4, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-51016] (Abby Christine Wright ) [Entered: 01/04/2021 09:35 AM]
December 31, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Bradley Hinshelwood for party(s) Appellee DOJ Appellee Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting U.S. Attorney General Appellee Regina Lombardo Appellee Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives, in case 20-51016 [20-51016] (CCR) [Entered: 12/31/2020 12:25 PM]
December 30, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-51016] (Bradley Hinshelwood ) [Entered: 12/30/2020 01:36 PM]
December 29, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Caleb Kruckenberg for Appellant Michael Cargill in 20-51016 [20-51016] (RAJ) [Entered: 12/29/2020 05:09 PM]
December 29, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 02/08/2021 for Appellant Michael Cargill. [20-51016] (CMB) [Entered: 12/29/2020 10:52 AM]
December 29, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-51016] (CMB) [Entered: 12/29/2020 10:50 AM]
December 28, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [20-51016] (LLL) [Entered: 12/28/2020 03:33 PM]
December 28, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Richard Abbott Samp for party(s) Appellant Michael Cargill, in case 20-51016 [20-51016] (RSM) [Entered: 12/28/2020 02:29 PM]
December 28, 2020 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. Michael Cargillfor the Court to process. Date of service: 12/28/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Kruckenberg; Attorney for Appellee: Soskin. [20-51016] (Caleb Kruckenberg ) [Entered: 12/28/2020 10:00 AM]
December 28, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Caleb Kruckenberg for Mr. Michael Cargill for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-51016] (Caleb Kruckenberg ) [Entered: 12/28/2020 09:58 AM]
December 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-51016] (Richard Abbott Samp ) [Entered: 12/23/2020 03:17 PM]
December 22, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 1:19-CV-349. Electronic ROA due on 01/06/2021. [20-51016] (CAS) [Entered: 12/22/2020 03:50 PM]
December 22, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9468636-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-51016] (CAS) [Entered: 12/22/2020 03:48 PM]
December 17, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Michael Cargill [20-51016] (RAJ) [Entered: 12/17/2020 11:12 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cargill v. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Michael Cargill
Represented By: Caleb Kruckenberg
Represented By: Richard Abbott Samp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Regina Lombardo, in her official capacity as Acting Director of the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Robert M. Wilkinson, Acting U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Bradley Hinshelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?