Levonzel Anderson v. Management Training Corp., et al
Defendant / Appellee: MANAGEMENT TRAINING CORPORATION, ("MTC"), Individual Capacity, DEPUTY WARDEN GABRIEL WALKER, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity, WARDEN JODY BRADLEY, Official Capacity, SHEIDRA ARRINGTON, Case Manager, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity, TONYA TOOMEY, Warden of Programs, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity, DELVIE GALES, Psych. Counsel, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity, PELICIA HALL, COMMISSIONER, MISSISSIPPI DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, Official Capacity, LARRY LEE, MDOC Contract Monitor, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity, SEAN K. SMITH, MDOC Correction Investigation Division, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity, EMMA TAPLIN, MDOC Compliance Officer, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity, TRACEY ABURTHNOT, Case Manager Supervisor, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity, INVESTIGATOR MICHAEL TURNER, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity and DOCTOR EVELYN DUNN, Psych. Doctor, being sued in her Official Capacity and Individual Capacity
Plaintiff / Appellant: LEVONZEL ANDERSON
Case Number: 20-60342
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Michael James Bentley, Esq. for Ms. Evelyn Dunn and Mr. Delvie Gales for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-60342] (Michael James Bentley ) [Entered: 06/25/2020 11:26 AM]
June 25, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-60342] (Erin Diane Saltaformaggio ) [Entered: 06/25/2020 11:54 AM]
June 25, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Erin Diane Saltaformaggio for party(s) Appellee Delvie Gales Appellee Evelyn Dunn, in case 20-60342 [20-60342] (CB) [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:44 PM]
June 25, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Michael James Bentley for Appellee Evelyn Dunn in 20-60342, Attorney Michael James Bentley for Appellee Delvie Gales in 20-60342 [20-60342] (CB) [Entered: 06/25/2020 03:45 PM]
June 5, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney John Chadwick Williams for Appellee Sean K. Smith in 20-60342, Attorney John Chadwick Williams for Appellee Pelicia Hall, Commissioner, Mississippi Department of Corrections in 20-60342, Attorney John Chadwick Williams for Appellee Larry Lee in 20-60342 [20-60342] (MCS) [Entered: 06/05/2020 04:10 PM]
June 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. John Chadwick Williams, Esq. for Ms. Pelicia Hall, Commissioner, Mississippi Department of Corrections, Mr. Larry Lee and Mr. Sean K. Smith for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-60342] (John Chadwick Williams ) [Entered: 06/04/2020 11:18 AM]
May 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Steven James Griffin for Appellee Gabriel Walker in 20-60342, Attorney Steven James Griffin for Appellee Sheidra Arrington in 20-60342, Attorney Steven James Griffin for Appellee Tracey Aburthnot in 20-60342, Attorney Steven James Griffin for Appellee Michael Turner in 20-60342, Attorney Steven James Griffin for Appellee Emma Taplin in 20-60342, Attorney Steven James Griffin for Appellee Tonya Toomey in 20-60342, Attorney Steven James Griffin for Appellee Jody Bradley in 20-60342, Attorney Steven James Griffin for Appellee Management Training Corporation in 20-60342 [20-60342] (MCS) [Entered: 05/06/2020 01:40 PM]
May 4, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9305968-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 06/29/2020, for Appellant Levonzel Anderson. [20-60342] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/04/2020 12:12 PM]
May 4, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-60342] (Steven James Griffin ) [Entered: 05/04/2020 02:34 PM]
April 27, 2020 CASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Gabriel Walker in 20-60342. Update: Party was inadvertently entered as 'def a def' at case opening; and has now been corrected to 'def e def'. [20-60342] (DLJ) [Entered: 04/27/2020 05:01 PM]
April 27, 2020 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Levonzel Anderson. [20-60342] (DLJ) [Entered: 04/27/2020 04:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Levonzel Anderson v. Management Training Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MANAGEMENT TRAINING CORPORATION, ("MTC"), Individual Capacity
Represented By: Steven James Griffin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPUTY WARDEN GABRIEL WALKER, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity
Represented By: Steven James Griffin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARDEN JODY BRADLEY, Official Capacity
Represented By: Steven James Griffin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHEIDRA ARRINGTON, Case Manager, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity
Represented By: Steven James Griffin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TONYA TOOMEY, Warden of Programs, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity
Represented By: Steven James Griffin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DELVIE GALES, Psych. Counsel, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity
Represented By: Michael James Bentley Esq.
Represented By: Erin Diane Saltaformaggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PELICIA HALL, COMMISSIONER, MISSISSIPPI DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, Official Capacity
Represented By: John Chadwick Williams Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LARRY LEE, MDOC Contract Monitor, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity
Represented By: John Chadwick Williams Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SEAN K. SMITH, MDOC Correction Investigation Division, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity
Represented By: John Chadwick Williams Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMMA TAPLIN, MDOC Compliance Officer, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity
Represented By: Steven James Griffin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRACEY ABURTHNOT, Case Manager Supervisor, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity
Represented By: Steven James Griffin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INVESTIGATOR MICHAEL TURNER, Official Capacity and Individual Capacity
Represented By: Steven James Griffin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOCTOR EVELYN DUNN, Psych. Doctor, being sued in her Official Capacity and Individual Capacity
Represented By: Michael James Bentley Esq.
Represented By: Erin Diane Saltaformaggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEVONZEL ANDERSON
Represented By: Levonzel Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?