Franco v. Johnson
Respondent / Appellee: Henry Lucero, Executive Associate Director for the Office of Enforcement and Removal Operations for the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General, Jimmy Johnson, Warden Prairieland Detention Center and Matthew Albence, Acting Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Petitioner / Appellant: Marcus Franco
Case Number: 21-10141
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Marcus Franco advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 02/26/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Carlston; Attorney for Appellees: Cruce-Haag, Ramus [21-10141] (Christopher Carlston ) [Entered: 02/26/2021 08:20 PM]
February 26, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Christopher Carlston for Mr. Marcus Franco for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-10141] (Christopher Carlston ) [Entered: 02/26/2021 07:08 PM]
February 26, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:20-CV-829. Electronic ROA due on 03/15/2021. [21-10141] (RAJ) [Entered: 02/26/2021 04:38 PM]
February 26, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9513336-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-10141] (RAJ) [Entered: 02/26/2021 04:36 PM]
February 22, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michelle M. Ramus for party(s) Appellee William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General Appellee Jimmy Johnson Appellee Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Appellee Matthew Albence Appellee Henry Lucero, in case 21-10141 [21-10141] (RAJ) [Entered: 02/22/2021 04:25 PM]
February 19, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-10141] (Michelle M. Ramus ) [Entered: 02/19/2021 12:17 PM]
February 19, 2021 PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Marcus Franco [21-10141] (MVM) [Entered: 02/19/2021 11:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Franco v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Henry Lucero, Executive Associate Director for the Office of Enforcement and Removal Operations for the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag
Represented By: Michelle M. Ramus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag
Represented By: Michelle M. Ramus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag
Represented By: Michelle M. Ramus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Jimmy Johnson, Warden Prairieland Detention Center
Represented By: Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag
Represented By: Michelle M. Ramus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Matthew Albence, Acting Director United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Ann Elizabeth Cruce-Haag
Represented By: Michelle M. Ramus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Marcus Franco
Represented By: Christopher Carlston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?