Perez v. JPMorgan Chase Bank
Plaintiff / Appellant: Maricela Perez
Defendant / Appellee: ARNS Investments, L.L.C. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 21-10226
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) William Lance Lewis for party(s) Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 21-10226 [21-10226] (LLL) [Entered: 03/25/2021 11:30 AM]
March 25, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Marcie Lynn Schout for party(s) Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 21-10226 [21-10226] (LLL) [Entered: 03/25/2021 10:37 AM]
March 24, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-10226] (William Lance Lewis ) [Entered: 03/24/2021 02:52 PM]
March 24, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-10226] (Marcie Lynn Schout ) [Entered: 03/24/2021 02:50 PM]
March 22, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/03/2021 for Appellant Maricela Perez. [21-10226] (DDL) [Entered: 03/22/2021 02:33 PM]
March 22, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-10226] (DDL) [Entered: 03/22/2021 02:33 PM]
March 17, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:19-CV-2412. Electronic ROA due on 04/01/2021. [21-10226] (LLL) [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:20 AM]
March 17, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9527964-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-10226] (LLL) [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:16 AM]
March 10, 2021 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Maricela Perez [21-10226] (LLL) [Entered: 03/10/2021 01:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Perez v. JPMorgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Maricela Perez
Represented By: Michael Brinkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARNS Investments, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Eric G. Carlson
Represented By: Marcie Lynn Schout Esq.
Represented By: William Lance Lewis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?