Talasek v. Unum Life Insurance
Defendant / Appellee: National Oilwell Varco, L.P. and Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff / Appellant: Erica Talasek
Case Number: 21-20069
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 CLERK ORDER granting in part Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Ms. Erica Talasek [ # 9531295-2 ]. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 05/05/2021 for Appellant Erica Talasek [21-20069] (CAG) [Entered: 03/24/2021 08:28 AM]
March 22, 2021 UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend time to file brief as appellant until 05/10/2021 [9531295-2]. Date of service: 03/22/2021 [21-20069] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Erica Talasek to extend time to file brief as appellant until 05/10/2021 [9531295-2]. Date of service: 03/22/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Bolt, Davidoff, Stockard; Attorney for Appellant: Sud [21-20069] (Nitin Sud ) [Entered: 03/22/2021 10:43 AM]
February 23, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/05/2021 for Appellant Erica Talasek. [21-20069] (MRW) [Entered: 02/23/2021 04:24 PM]
February 23, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-20069] (MRW) [Entered: 02/23/2021 04:23 PM]
February 22, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Wesley E. Stockard for Appellee National Oilwell Varco, L.P. in 21-20069 [21-20069] (CAG) [Entered: 02/22/2021 09:08 AM]
February 22, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Elizabeth L. Bolt for party(s) Appellee National Oilwell Varco, L.P., in case 21-20069 [21-20069] (CAG) [Entered: 02/22/2021 09:06 AM]
February 18, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Wesley E. Stockard for National Oilwell Varco, L.P. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20069] (Wesley E. Stockard ) [Entered: 02/18/2021 01:18 PM]
February 18, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20069] (Elizabeth L. Bolt ) [Entered: 02/18/2021 11:48 AM]
February 18, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Bill E. Davidoff for Appellee Unum Life Insurance Company of America in 21-20069 [21-20069] (CAG) [Entered: 02/18/2021 08:22 AM]
February 17, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Nitin Sud for Appellant Erica Talasek in 21-20069 [21-20069] (CAG) [Entered: 02/17/2021 12:43 PM]
February 17, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:18-CV-3306. Electronic ROA due on 03/04/2021. [21-20069] (CAG) [Entered: 02/17/2021 12:42 PM]
February 15, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Bill E. Davidoff for Unum Life Insurance Company of America for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20069] (Bill E. Davidoff ) [Entered: 02/15/2021 12:49 PM]
February 15, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Nitin Sud for Ms. Erica Talasek for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20069] (Nitin Sud ) [Entered: 02/15/2021 09:43 AM]
February 15, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [21-20069] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Erica Talasek advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 02/15/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Davidoff, Stockard; Attorney for Appellant: Sud [21-20069] (Nitin Sud ) [Entered: 02/15/2021 09:37 AM]
February 12, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9503697-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 03/01/2021 for Appellant Erica Talasek [21-20069] (AGL) [Entered: 02/12/2021 02:07 PM]
February 3, 2021 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Erica Talasek [21-20069] (ABT) [Entered: 02/03/2021 05:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Talasek v. Unum Life Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: National Oilwell Varco, L.P.
Represented By: Wesley E. Stockard
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Bolt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Bill E. Davidoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Erica Talasek
Represented By: Nitin Sud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?