Lemon v. Nurses To Go
Defendant / Appellee: DPM Alliance Hospice Agency, L.L.C., Tejas Quality Home Health, Incorporated, Nurses To Go, Incorporated, Walter F. Crowder, Amed Health, Incorporated, A*Med Management, Incorporated and Tejas Quality Home Health Care, Incorporated
Plaintiff / Appellant: Laverne Fowler, relator, Deborah Lemon, relator, Eric Castillo, relator and Sarah Diaz, relator
Case Number: 21-20173
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. Eric Castillo, Ms. Sarah Diaz, Ms. Laverne Fowler and Ms. Deborah Lemon. Extension Granted to and including 06/24/2021. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 06/24/2021 for Appellants Eric Castillo, Sarah Diaz, Laverne Fowler and Deborah Lemon [21-20173] (SDH) [Entered: 05/17/2021 10:02 AM]
May 14, 2021 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Mr. Eric Castillo, Ms. Sarah Diaz, Ms. Laverne Fowler and Ms. Deborah Lemon for filing Appellant's Opening Brief until 06/24/2021 [21-20173] (Russell S. Cook ) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:59 PM]
April 26, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Morgan A. Jenkins for party(s) Appellee Walter F. Crowder Appellee A*Med Management, Incorporated Appellee Nurses To Go, Incorporated Appellee Amed Health, Incorporated Appellee Tejas Quality Home Health Care, Incorporated Appellee DPM Alliance Hospice Agency, L.L.C., in case 21-20173 [21-20173] (SDH) [Entered: 04/26/2021 11:08 AM]
April 26, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Christopher L. Johnson for Appellee DPM Alliance Hospice Agency, L.L.C. in 21-20173, Attorney Christopher L. Johnson for Appellee Tejas Quality Home Health Care, Incorporated in 21-20173, Attorney Christopher L. Johnson for Appellee Amed Health, Incorporated in 21-20173, Attorney Christopher L. Johnson for Appellee Walter F. Crowder in 21-20173, Attorney Christopher L. Johnson for Appellee Nurses To Go, Incorporated in 21-20173 [21-20173] (SDH) [Entered: 04/26/2021 10:53 AM]
April 23, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20173] (Morgan A. Jenkins ) [Entered: 04/23/2021 02:40 PM]
April 23, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Christopher L. Johnson for Amed Health, Incorporated, Mr. Walter F. Crowder, DPM Alliance Hospice Agency, L.L.C., Nurses To Go, Incorporated and Tejas Quality Home Health Care, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20173] (Christopher L. Johnson ) [Entered: 04/23/2021 02:19 PM]
April 23, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Justin M. Kornegay for Appellee A*Med Management, Incorporated in 21-20173, Attorney Justin M. Kornegay for Appellee DPM Alliance Hospice Agency, L.L.C. in 21-20173, Attorney Justin M. Kornegay for Appellee Tejas Quality Home Health Care, Incorporated in 21-20173, Attorney Justin M. Kornegay for Appellee Amed Health, Incorporated in 21-20173, Attorney Justin M. Kornegay for Appellee Walter F. Crowder in 21-20173, Attorney Justin M. Kornegay for Appellee Nurses To Go, Incorporated in 21-20173 [21-20173] (SDH) [Entered: 04/23/2021 01:09 PM]
April 22, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Justin M. Kornegay for A*Med Management, Incorporated, Amed Health, Incorporated, Mr. Walter F. Crowder, DPM Alliance Hospice Agency, L.L.C., Nurses To Go, Incorporated and Tejas Quality Home Health Care, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20173] (Justin M. Kornegay ) [Entered: 04/22/2021 03:03 PM]
April 15, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/25/2021 for Appellants Eric Castillo, Sarah Diaz, Laverne Fowler and Deborah Lemon. [21-20173] (MAS) [Entered: 04/15/2021 08:22 AM]
April 15, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-20173] (MAS) [Entered: 04/15/2021 08:20 AM]
April 13, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Russell S. Cook for Appellant Laverne Fowler in 21-20173, Attorney Russell S. Cook for Appellant Eric Castillo in 21-20173, Attorney Russell S. Cook for Appellant Sarah Diaz in 21-20173, Attorney Russell S. Cook for Appellant Deborah Lemon in 21-20173 [21-20173] (SDH) [Entered: 04/13/2021 04:19 PM]
April 13, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:16-CV-1775. Electronic ROA due on 04/28/2021. [21-20173] (ABT) [Entered: 04/13/2021 01:13 PM]
April 12, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Eric Castillo, Ms. Sarah Diaz, Ms. Laverne Fowler and Ms. Deborah Lemon advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [21-20173] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Eric Castillo, Ms. Sarah Diaz, Ms. Laverne Fowler and Ms. Deborah Lemon advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 04/12/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Cook; Attorney for Appellees: Johnson, Kornegay [21-20173] (Russell S. Cook ) [Entered: 04/12/2021 11:42 AM]
April 12, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Russell S. Cook for Mr. Eric Castillo, Ms. Sarah Diaz, Ms. Laverne Fowler and Ms. Deborah Lemon for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20173] (Russell S. Cook ) [Entered: 04/12/2021 11:40 AM]
April 9, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Appellee Tejas Quality Home Health, Incorporated in 21-20173 substituted by Appellee Tejas Quality Home Health Care, Incorporated in 21-20173 [21-20173] (CAG) [Entered: 04/09/2021 10:08 AM]
April 6, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9543887-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/21/2021 for Appellants Eric Castillo, Sarah Diaz, Laverne Fowler and Deborah Lemon [21-20173] (ABT) [Entered: 04/06/2021 02:47 PM]
March 31, 2021 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Eric Castillo, Ms. Sarah Diaz, Ms. Laverne Fowler and Ms. Deborah Lemon [21-20173] (CAG) [Entered: 03/31/2021 03:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lemon v. Nurses To Go
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DPM Alliance Hospice Agency, L.L.C.
Represented By: Justin M. Kornegay
Represented By: Christopher L. Johnson
Represented By: Morgan A. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tejas Quality Home Health, Incorporated
Represented By: Justin M. Kornegay
Represented By: Christopher L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nurses To Go, Incorporated
Represented By: Justin M. Kornegay
Represented By: Christopher L. Johnson
Represented By: Morgan A. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Walter F. Crowder
Represented By: Justin M. Kornegay
Represented By: Christopher L. Johnson
Represented By: Morgan A. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Amed Health, Incorporated
Represented By: Justin M. Kornegay
Represented By: Christopher L. Johnson
Represented By: Morgan A. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A*Med Management, Incorporated
Represented By: Justin M. Kornegay
Represented By: Morgan A. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tejas Quality Home Health Care, Incorporated
Represented By: Justin M. Kornegay
Represented By: Christopher L. Johnson
Represented By: Morgan A. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Laverne Fowler, relator
Represented By: Russell S. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Deborah Lemon, relator
Represented By: Russell S. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Eric Castillo, relator
Represented By: Russell S. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sarah Diaz, relator
Represented By: Russell S. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?