Logue v. Wells Fargo Bank
Defendant / Appellee: Morel Mortgage, L.L.C., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Cindy Wood Logue
Case Number: 21-20217
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Ms. Cindy Wood Logue. Date of service: 06/21/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sheppard; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Krolikowski [21-20217] (Jeffrey Craig Jackson ) [Entered: 06/21/2021 04:17 PM]
June 21, 2021 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Cindy Wood Logue. Date of service: 06/21/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sheppard; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Krolikowski [21-20217] (Jeffrey Craig Jackson ) [Entered: 06/21/2021 04:16 PM]
May 10, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/21/2021 for Appellant Cindy Wood Logue. [21-20217] (CMB) [Entered: 05/10/2021 09:38 AM]
May 10, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-20217] (CMB) [Entered: 05/10/2021 09:34 AM]
May 7, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:19-CV-3824. Electronic ROA due on 05/24/2021. [21-20217] (JMW) [Entered: 05/07/2021 12:55 PM]
May 7, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jeffrey Craig Jackson for Appellant Cindy Wood Logue in 21-20217, Attorney Branch Masterson Sheppard for Appellee Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C. in 21-20217 [21-20217] (ABT) [Entered: 05/07/2021 11:45 AM]
May 7, 2021 Attorney Kurt Krolikowski added as counsel of record for Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in 21-20217 [21-20217] (ABT) [Entered: 05/07/2021 11:44 AM]
May 7, 2021 Branch Sheppard is removed as counsel of record for Well Fargo Bank. [21-20217] (ABT) [Entered: 05/07/2021 11:40 AM]
May 7, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Cindy Wood Logue advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [21-20217] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Cindy Wood Logue advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 05/07/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Jackson; Attorney for Appellee: Sheppard [21-20217] (Jeffrey Craig Jackson ) [Entered: 05/07/2021 11:35 AM]
May 5, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20217] (Branch Masterson Sheppard ) [Entered: 05/05/2021 02:07 PM]
May 5, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jeffrey Craig Jackson for Ms. Cindy Wood Logue for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20217] (Jeffrey Craig Jackson ) [Entered: 05/05/2021 01:10 PM]
April 29, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9562950-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 05/14/2021 for Appellant Cindy Wood Logue [21-20217] (SDH) [Entered: 04/29/2021 04:04 PM]
April 23, 2021 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Cindy Wood Logue [21-20217] (ABT) [Entered: 04/23/2021 12:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Logue v. Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Morel Mortgage, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Represented By: Kurt Lance Krolikowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C.
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Cindy Wood Logue
Represented By: Jeffrey Craig Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?