Paymentech v. Landry's
Plaintiff / Appellee: Paymentech, L.L.C., JPMorgan Chase, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
3Rd Party Defendant: Visa, Incorporated and Mastercard International, Incorporated
Defendant / Appellant: Landry's Incorporated
Case Number: 21-20259
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Stephen Patrick Pate for party(s) Appellee Mastercard International, Incorporated, in case 21-20259 [21-20259] (CAG) [Entered: 06/30/2021 02:00 PM]
June 28, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20259] (Stephen Patrick Pate ) [Entered: 06/28/2021 08:03 PM]
June 25, 2021 COURT ORDER granting opposed Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [ # 9588726-2 ]. The dismissal is without prejudice to either party's filing a subsequent notice of appeal. Mandate issue date is 07/19/2021. [21-20259] (CAG) [Entered: 06/25/2021 03:51 PM]
June 18, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Douglas Harlan Meal for party(s) Appellant Landry's Incorporated, in case 21-20259 [21-20259] (CAG) [Entered: 06/18/2021 01:56 PM]
June 18, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Seth Carlton Harrington for party(s) Appellant Landry's Incorporated, in case 21-20259 [21-20259] (CAG) [Entered: 06/18/2021 01:48 PM]
June 18, 2021 REPLY filed by Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Paymentech, L.L.C. [9600232-1] to the Response/Opposition filed by Appellant Landry's Incorporated [ # 9596406-2 ], to the Motion filed by Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Paymentech, L.L.C. [ # 9588726-2 ]. Date of Service: 06/18/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Chiu, LeGrand, Levy, Salmons, Siu; Attorney for Appellants: Gray, Harrington, Meal, Pfeiffer, Ward; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Hyman. [21-20259] (Jason York Hoo Siu ) [Entered: 06/18/2021 02:38 PM]
June 18, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Andrew Patrick LeGrand for Appellee Visa, Incorporated in 21-20259 [21-20259] (CAG) [Entered: 06/18/2021 02:51 PM]
June 18, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Allyson Newton Ho for party(s) Appellee Visa, Incorporated, in case 21-20259 [21-20259] (CAG) [Entered: 06/18/2021 02:49 PM]
June 18, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Elizabeth Ashley Kiernan for party(s) Appellee Visa, Incorporated, in case 21-20259 [21-20259] (CAG) [Entered: 06/18/2021 02:57 PM]
June 17, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Andrew Patrick LeGrand for Visa, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20259] (Andrew Patrick LeGrand ) [Entered: 06/17/2021 10:16 AM]
June 17, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20259] (Allyson Newton Ho ) [Entered: 06/17/2021 10:14 AM]
June 17, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20259] (Elizabeth Ashley Kiernan ) [Entered: 06/17/2021 10:19 AM]
June 17, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20259] (Seth Carlton Harrington ) [Entered: 06/17/2021 12:29 PM]
June 17, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20259] (Douglas Harlan Meal ) [Entered: 06/17/2021 12:31 PM]
June 16, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christian J. Ward for party(s) Appellant Landry's Incorporated, in case 21-20259 [21-20259] (JMW) [Entered: 06/16/2021 10:09 AM]
June 16, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Constance Hankins Pfeiffer for party(s) Appellant Landry's Incorporated, in case 21-20259 [21-20259] (JMW) [Entered: 06/16/2021 10:08 AM]
June 16, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20259] (David Bruce Salmons ) [Entered: 06/16/2021 08:05 AM]
June 16, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michelle Elizabeth Gray for party(s) Appellant Landry's Incorporated, in case 21-20259 [21-20259] (JMW) [Entered: 06/16/2021 10:11 AM]
June 16, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michelle Park Chiu for party(s) Appellee Paymentech, L.L.C. Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 21-20259 [21-20259] (ABT) [Entered: 06/16/2021 11:25 AM]
June 16, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David Bruce Salmons (replacing David Levy as lead counsel), Jason York Hoo Siu for party(s) Appellee Paymentech, L.L.C. Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 21-20259 [21-20259] (ABT) [Entered: 06/16/2021 05:24 PM]
June 16, 2021 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/26/2021 for Appellant Landry's Incorporated. [21-20259] (CMB) [Entered: 06/16/2021 04:15 PM]
June 16, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [21-20259] (CMB) [Entered: 06/16/2021 04:14 PM]
June 15, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20259] (Michelle Park Chiu ) [Entered: 06/15/2021 02:54 PM]
June 15, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20259] (Jason York Hoo Siu ) [Entered: 06/15/2021 02:41 PM]
June 14, 2021 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9596406-1] to the Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Paymentech, L.L.C. in 21-20259 [ # 9588726-2 ] Response/Opposition deadline satisfied. Date of Service: 06/14/2021. [21-20259] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Landry's Incorporated [9596406-1] to the Motion to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction filed by Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Paymentech, L.L.C. [ # 9588726-2 ] Date of Service: 06/14/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Gray; Attorney for Appellees: LeGrand, Levy; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Hyman. [21-20259] (Michelle Elizabeth Gray ) [Entered: 06/14/2021 07:37 PM]
June 14, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20259] (Constance Hankins Pfeiffer ) [Entered: 06/14/2021 06:22 PM]
June 14, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20259] (Christian J. Ward ) [Entered: 06/14/2021 06:25 PM]
June 14, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [21-20259] (Michelle Elizabeth Gray ) [Entered: 06/14/2021 07:35 PM]
June 11, 2021 ACKNOWLEDGMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Heather Alcaraz, Est. Completion Dt: 07/01/2021, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 06/01/2021, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 07/01/2021, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Conference 03/11/2021. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied [21-20259] (CAG) [Entered: 06/11/2021 11:05 AM]
June 11, 2021 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Heather Alcaraz, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 05/25/2021 [21-20259] (CAG) [Entered: 06/11/2021 11:06 AM]
June 11, 2021 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:18-CV-1622. Electronic ROA due on 06/28/2021. [21-20259] (CAG) [Entered: 06/11/2021 11:07 AM]
June 10, 2021 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Heather Alcaraz. [21-20259] (Heather Alcaraz ) [Entered: 06/10/2021 02:30 PM]
June 10, 2021 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Heather Alcaraz. [21-20259] (Heather Alcaraz ) [Entered: 06/10/2021 02:31 PM]
June 10, 2021 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Heather Alcaraz. [21-20259] (Heather Alcaraz ) [Entered: 06/10/2021 02:32 PM]
June 4, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney David Jack Levy for Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-20259, Attorney David Jack Levy for Appellee Paymentech, L.L.C. in 21-20259 [21-20259] (ABT) [Entered: 06/04/2021 12:22 PM]
June 3, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. David Jack Levy for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Paymentech, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20259] (David Jack Levy ) [Entered: 06/03/2021 02:34 PM]
June 3, 2021 OPPOSED MOTION to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [9588726-2]. Date of service: 06/03/2021. Response/Opposition due on 06/14/2021. [21-20259] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Paymentech, L.L.C. to dismiss appeal for lack of jurisdiction [9588726-2]. Date of service: 06/03/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Gray; Attorney for Appellees: LeGrand, Levy; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Hyman [21-20259] (David Jack Levy ) [Entered: 06/03/2021 02:50 PM]
June 2, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Appellee JPMorgan Chase, N.A. in 21-20259 substituted by Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. in 21-20259 [21-20259] (CAG) [Entered: 06/02/2021 04:00 PM]
May 25, 2021 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Landry's Incorporated DKT-13 - 03.11.2021 Pretrial Conference for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/25/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Gray; Attorney for Appellees: Hyman, LeGrand, Levy; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Hyman. [21-20259] (Michelle Elizabeth Gray ) [Entered: 05/25/2021 03:34 PM]
May 25, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Landry's Incorporated. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Heather Alcaraz, Proceeding Type and Date: Pre-Trial Conference 03/11/2021. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 06/04/2021 for Heather Alcaraz, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9582298-2 ] [21-20259] (ABT) [Entered: 05/25/2021 05:02 PM]
May 24, 2021 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Landry's Incorporated Pre-Trial Conference (ECF No. 143) for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/24/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Gray; Attorney for Appellees: Hyman, LeGrand, Levy; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Hyman. [21-20259] (Michelle Elizabeth Gray ) [Entered: 05/24/2021 07:21 AM]
May 24, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Landry's Incorporated advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed (hearings of 1/15/20 & 2/14/19 only). [21-20259] (ABT) [Entered: 05/24/2021 01:01 PM]
May 24, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Landry's Incorporated and returned because information regarding hearing is incorrect. The 3/11/21 hearing is not filed in district court [21-20259] (ABT) [Entered: 05/24/2021 01:03 PM]
May 21, 2021 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Landry's Incorporated DKT 13 - 02.14.19 Intial Conference ECF No. 87 for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/21/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Gray; Attorney for Appellees: Hyman, LeGrand, Levy; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Hyman. [21-20259] (Michelle Elizabeth Gray ) [Entered: 05/21/2021 03:54 PM]
May 21, 2021 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Landry's Incorporated DKT 13 - 01.15.20 Pretrial Conference - ECF No. 102 for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/21/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Gray; Attorney for Appellees: Hyman, LeGrand, Levy; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Hyman. [21-20259] (Michelle Elizabeth Gray ) [Entered: 05/21/2021 03:55 PM]
May 14, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9575119-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 06/01/2021 for Appellant Landry's Incorporated [21-20259] (ABT) [Entered: 05/14/2021 03:44 PM]
May 13, 2021 CASE CAPTION updated. Appellees Visa, Incorporated and Mastercard International, Incorporated added to case. [21-20259] (ABT) [Entered: 05/13/2021 04:10 PM]
May 13, 2021 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Landry's Incorporated [21-20259] (ABT) [Entered: 05/13/2021 04:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Paymentech v. Landry's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Paymentech, L.L.C.
Represented By: David Jack Levy
Represented By: David Bruce Salmons Esq.
Represented By: Michelle Park Chiu
Represented By: Jason York Hoo Siu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JPMorgan Chase, N.A.
Represented By: David Jack Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: David Jack Levy
Represented By: David Bruce Salmons Esq.
Represented By: Michelle Park Chiu
Represented By: Jason York Hoo Siu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Visa, Incorporated
Represented By: Andrew Patrick LeGrand
Represented By: Allyson Newton Ho
Represented By: Elizabeth Ashley Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Mastercard International, Incorporated
Represented By: Martin S. Hyman
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Landry's Incorporated
Represented By: Michelle E. Gray
Represented By: Constance Hankins Pfeiffer Esq.
Represented By: Michelle Elizabeth Gray
Represented By: Seth Carlton Harrington
Represented By: Douglas Harlan Meal
Represented By: Christian J. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?