Bridges v. Houston Methodist Hosp
Plaintiff / Appellant: Maria Trevino, Ricardo Zelante, Latricia Blank, Jennifer Bridges and Bob Nevens
Defendant / Appellee: Houston Methodist Hospital, doing business as Methodist Hospital System and Houston Methodist The Woodlands Hospital
Case Number: 21-20311
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 13, 2022 Bridges v. Methodist Hospital

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 DISCOUNT OF 10% invoked. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner. To avoid further action the transcript must be filed by 08/25/2021. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date updated to 08/25/2021 for Fred E. Warner, Court Reporter [21-20311] (CCR) [Entered: 08/10/2021 12:26 PM]
July 26, 2021 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Lanie Smith, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 06/15/2021 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [21-20311] (JMW) [Entered: 07/26/2021 09:34 AM]
July 14, 2021 NO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIVED for Ms. Lanie Smith. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Lanie Smith, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 06/24/2021. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 07/14/2021 for Lanie Smith, Court Reporter [21-20311] (CCR) [Entered: 07/14/2021 02:02 PM]
July 14, 2021 NO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIVED for Mr. Fred E. Warner. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 06/24/2021. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 07/26/2021 for Fred E. Warner, Court Reporter [21-20311] (CCR) [Entered: 07/14/2021 01:57 PM]
July 2, 2021 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the letter from David Christenson because Mr. Christenson is not a party to the case nor are we able to determine the relief being sought [21-20311] (CCR) [Entered: 07/02/2021 12:57 PM]
June 24, 2021 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Ms. Latricia Blank, Ms. Jennifer Bridges, Mr. Bob Nevens, Ms. Maria Trevino and Mr. Ricardo Zelante to order transcript of Motion Hearing on 06/11/2021 before Judge Lynn N Hughes for the Court to process. Date of service: 06/24/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Patton, Pfeiffer, Twomey; Attorney for Appellants: Schumacher, Woodfill. [21-20311] (Jill Schumacher ) [Entered: 06/24/2021 03:26 PM]
June 24, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Latricia Blank, Ms. Jennifer Bridges, Mr. Bob Nevens, Ms. Maria Trevino and Mr. Ricardo Zelante. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Fred E. Warner, Proceeding Type and Date: Hearing 06/04/2021. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 07/06/2021 for Fred Warner, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9605009-2 ] [21-20311] (CCR) [Entered: 06/24/2021 04:45 PM]
June 24, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Latricia Blank, Ms. Jennifer Bridges, Mr. Bob Nevens, Ms. Maria Trevino and Mr. Ricardo Zelante. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Lanie Smith, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 06/11/2021. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 07/06/2021 for Lanie E. Smith, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9605013-2 ] [21-20311] (CCR) [Entered: 06/24/2021 04:47 PM]
June 24, 2021 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Ms. Latricia Blank, Ms. Jennifer Bridges, Mr. Bob Nevens, Ms. Maria Trevino and Mr. Ricardo Zelante to order transcript on Hearing on 06/04/2021 before JudgeLynn N Hughes for the Court to process. Date of service: 06/24/2021 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Patton, Pfeiffer, Twomey; Attorney for Appellants: Schumacher, Woodfill. [21-20311] (Jill Schumacher ) [Entered: 06/24/2021 03:25 PM]
June 24, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jared Ryker Woodfill V for Appellant Latricia Blank in 21-20311, Attorney Jared Ryker Woodfill V for Appellant Ricardo Zelante in 21-20311, Attorney Jared Ryker Woodfill V for Appellant Maria Trevino in 21-20311, Attorney Jared Ryker Woodfill V for Appellant Bob Nevens in 21-20311, Attorney Jared Ryker Woodfill V for Appellant Jennifer Bridges in 21-20311 [21-20311] (CCR) [Entered: 06/24/2021 09:38 AM]
June 23, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jared Ryker Woodfill, V for Ms. Latricia Blank, Ms. Jennifer Bridges, Mr. Bob Nevens, Ms. Maria Trevino and Mr. Ricardo Zelante for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20311] (Jared Ryker Woodfill V) [Entered: 06/23/2021 12:20 PM]
June 22, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jill Schumacher for party(s) Appellant Latricia Blank Appellant Bob Nevens Appellant Jennifer Bridges Appellant Maria Trevino Appellant Ricardo Zelante, in case 21-20311 [21-20311] (DMS) [Entered: 06/22/2021 10:35 AM]
June 22, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Constance Hankins Pfeiffer for party(s) Appellee Houston Methodist Hospital Appellee Houston Methodist The Woodlands Hospital, in case 21-20311 [21-20311] (CCR) [Entered: 06/22/2021 10:20 AM]
June 21, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20311] (Constance Hankins Pfeiffer ) [Entered: 06/21/2021 11:22 PM]
June 21, 2021 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [21-20311] (Jill Schumacher ) [Entered: 06/21/2021 12:40 PM]
June 14, 2021 PARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEET.) [21-20311] (ABT) [Entered: 06/14/2021 01:57 PM]
June 14, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9596005-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 06/29/2021 for Appellants Latricia Blank, Jennifer Bridges, Bob Nevens, Maria Trevino and Ricardo Zelante [21-20311] (ABT) [Entered: 06/14/2021 02:23 PM]
June 14, 2021 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Latricia Blank, Ms. Jennifer Bridges, Mr. Bob Nevens, Ms. Maria Trevino and Mr. Ricardo Zelante [21-20311] (ABT) [Entered: 06/14/2021 01:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bridges v. Houston Methodist Hosp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Maria Trevino
Represented By: Jared Ryker Woodfill V
Represented By: Jill Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ricardo Zelante
Represented By: Jared Ryker Woodfill V
Represented By: Jill Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Latricia Blank
Represented By: Jared Ryker Woodfill V
Represented By: Jill Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Jennifer Bridges
Represented By: Jared Ryker Woodfill V
Represented By: Jill Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Bob Nevens
Represented By: Jared Ryker Woodfill V
Represented By: Jill Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Houston Methodist Hospital, doing business as Methodist Hospital System
Represented By: Daniel F. Patton Esq.
Represented By: Michael W. Twomey
Represented By: Constance Hankins Pfeiffer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Houston Methodist The Woodlands Hospital
Represented By: Daniel F. Patton Esq.
Represented By: Michael W. Twomey
Represented By: Constance Hankins Pfeiffer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?