Young v. Landry
Defendant / Appellee: Jeff Landry, Attorney General State of Louisiana
Plaintiff / Appellant: Huguette Nicole Young
Case Number: 21-30024
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 COURT ORDER dismissing appeal for lack of jurisdiction [9515275-2]. [21-30024] (SEP) [Entered: 03/09/2021 12:57 PM]
March 2, 2021 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [21-30024] (DLJ) [Entered: 03/02/2021 01:23 PM]
January 14, 2021 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Huguette Nicole Young. [21-30024] (DLJ) [Entered: 01/14/2021 01:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Young v. Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeff Landry, Attorney General State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Huguette Nicole Young
Represented By: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?