Gabriel v. Outlaw
Plaintiff / Appellant: Gwendolyn D. Gabriel, Barbara J. Gabriel, Regina Brown, Brittny Washington and Kenneth J. Gabriel
Defendant / Appellee: Merry Outlaw, Bridgett Zoltowski, Lorenzo Brown, John Michael Frick, Judge Tonya Parker and John Nation
Case Number: 22-10314
Filed: March 30, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: RICO
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2022 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Ms. Regina Brown, Ms. Barbara J. Gabriel, Ms. Gwendolyn D. Gabriel, Mr. Kenneth J. Gabriel and Ms. Brittny Washington. Record Excerpts deadline satisfied [22-10314] (CBW) [Entered: 05/25/2022 02:31 PM]
May 18, 2022 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Regina Brown, Ms. Barbara J. Gabriel, Ms. Gwendolyn D. Gabriel, Mr. Kenneth J. Gabriel and Ms. Brittny Washington. Additionally the Brief requires Record Excerpts must be served with appellant brief.. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Record Excerpts due on 06/01/2022 for Appellants Regina Brown, Barbara J. Gabriel, Gwendolyn D. Gabriel, Kenneth J. Gabriel and Brittny Washington. Appellee's Brief due on 06/17/2022 for Appellees Lorenzo Brown, John Michael Frick, John Nation, Merry Outlaw and Tonya Parker [22-10314] (CBW) [Entered: 05/19/2022 09:03 AM]
May 4, 2022 LETTER filed by Appellants Ms. Regina Brown, Ms. Barbara J. Gabriel, Ms. Gwendolyn D. Gabriel, Mr. Kenneth J. Gabriel and Ms. Brittny Washington advise of missing defendants-appellees in appeal.. [22-10314] (CBW) [Entered: 05/04/2022 04:05 PM]
May 4, 2022 CASE CAPTION updated. Appellees Tonya Parker and John Nation added to case. Reason: omitted at case opening. [22-10314] (CBW) [Entered: 05/04/2022 04:11 PM]
May 4, 2022 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advise of updated caption [22-10314] (CBW) [Entered: 05/04/2022 04:13 PM]
April 21, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Malcolm Deon Dishongh for Appellee Merry Outlaw in 22-10314 [22-10314] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/21/2022 04:02 PM]
April 20, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Malcolm Deon Dishongh for Ms. Merry Outlaw for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10314] (Malcolm Deon Dishongh ) [Entered: 04/20/2022 04:52 PM]
April 12, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney John Michael Frick for Appellee John Michael Frick in 22-10314 [22-10314] (CBW) [Entered: 04/12/2022 04:34 PM]
April 12, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10314] (John Michael Frick ) [Entered: 04/12/2022 09:20 AM]
April 8, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-10314] (DDL) [Entered: 04/08/2022 10:59 AM]
April 8, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/18/2022 for Appellants Regina Brown, Barbara J. Gabriel, Gwendolyn D. Gabriel, Kenneth J. Gabriel and Brittny Washington. [22-10314] (DDL) [Entered: 04/08/2022 10:59 AM]
April 4, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9814631-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-10314] (SEP) [Entered: 04/04/2022 12:47 PM]
April 4, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:20-CV-60. Electronic ROA due on 04/19/2022. [22-10314] (SEP) [Entered: 04/04/2022 12:57 PM]
March 30, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Regina Brown, Ms. Barbara J. Gabriel, Ms. Gwendolyn D. Gabriel, Mr. Kenneth J. Gabriel and Ms. Brittny Washington [22-10314] (LLL) [Entered: 03/30/2022 11:38 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gabriel v. Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Gwendolyn D. Gabriel
Represented By: Gwendolyn D. Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Barbara J. Gabriel
Represented By: Barbara J. Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Regina Brown
Represented By: Regina Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Brittny Washington
Represented By: Brittny Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Kenneth J. Gabriel
Represented By: Kenneth J. Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Merry Outlaw
Represented By: Malcolm Deon Dishongh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bridgett Zoltowski
Represented By: John Michael Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lorenzo Brown
Represented By: Lorenzo Brown
Represented By: Veretta L. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Michael Frick
Represented By: John Michael Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Judge Tonya Parker
Represented By: Jason Thaddeus Contreras Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: John Nation
Represented By: Andrea L. Nation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?