Washburne v. Hill
Defendant / Appellee: Heather V. Washburne, Elisa M. Summers, Margaret Keliher, Individually and in her capacity as Trustee of the MHTE and a member of the Advisory Board of the HHTE, Margaret Keliher, Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr. and Carol E. Irwin
Appellee: Chester Donnally and Thomas P. Tatham, Individually
Petitioner / Appellant: Albert G. Hill, IV, on behalf of Caroline Hill and Nance Hill
Appellant: Albert G. Hill, IV
Case Number: 22-10479
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: RICO
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-10479] (CMB) [Entered: 07/12/2022 09:57 AM]
July 12, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/22/2022 for Appellants Albert G. Hill IV, Albert G. Hill IV and Nance Hill. [22-10479] (CMB) [Entered: 07/12/2022 09:58 AM]
June 23, 2022 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [22-10479] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Albert G. Hill, IV, Mr. Albert G. Hill, IV and Ms. Nance Hill advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 06/23/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Benedict, Crawford, Dees, Fogler, Hastings, Huff, Lang, Mason; Attorney for Appellant: Johnson; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Spencer [22-10479] (Zachary E. Johnson ) [Entered: 06/23/2022 09:40 AM]
June 23, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Brian E. Mason for party(s) Appellee Margaret Keliher, in case 22-10479, by Attorney Brian E. Mason for Appellee Margaret Keliher in 22-10479 [22-10479] (LEF) [Entered: 06/23/2022 10:22 AM]
June 23, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:07-CV-2020. Electronic ROA due on 07/08/2022. [22-10479] (LEF) [Entered: 06/23/2022 10:26 AM]
June 22, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Brian E. Mason for Ms. Margaret Keliher for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10479] (Brian E. Mason ) [Entered: 06/22/2022 01:46 PM]
June 13, 2022 CASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Albert G. Hill IV in 22-10479. Counsel added. [22-10479] (LEF) [Entered: 06/13/2022 10:17 AM]
June 13, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Zachary E. Johnson for party(s) Appellant Nance Hill Appellant Albert G. Hill IV, in case 22-10479 [22-10479] (LEF) [Entered: 06/13/2022 10:13 AM]
June 13, 2022 Attorney Mr. R. Kevin Spencer for Appellants Mr. Albert G. Hill, IV, Mr. Albert G. Hill, IV and Ms. Nance Hill is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The submitted appearance form does not match the registered attorney. [22-10479] (LBM) [Entered: 06/13/2022 08:28 AM]
June 10, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10479] (Zachary E. Johnson ) [Entered: 06/10/2022 09:26 AM]
June 10, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-10479] (Zachary E. Johnson ) [Entered: 06/10/2022 09:25 AM]
June 1, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Tom Moore Dees III for Appellee Elisa M. Summers in 22-10479, Attorney Tom Moore Dees III for Appellee Heather V. Washburne in 22-10479 [22-10479] (LEF) [Entered: 06/01/2022 11:21 AM]
May 31, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Tom Moore Dees, III, Esq. for Ms. Elisa M. Summers and Ms. Heather V. Washburne for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10479] (Tom Moore Dees III) [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:48 AM]
May 24, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) W. Scott Hastings for party(s) Appellee Margaret Keliher, in case 22-10479 [22-10479] (LEF) [Entered: 05/24/2022 04:45 PM]
May 23, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-10479] (W. Scott Hastings ) [Entered: 05/23/2022 04:43 PM]
May 19, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9851573-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 06/03/2022 for Appellants Albert G. Hill IV, Albert G. Hill IV and Nance Hill [22-10479] (LEF) [Entered: 05/19/2022 04:36 PM]
May 16, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Albert G. Hill, IV, Mr. Albert G. Hill, IV and Ms. Nance Hill [22-10479] (AS) [Entered: 05/16/2022 11:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Washburne v. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Heather V. Washburne
Represented By: Tom Moore Dees Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Elisa M. Summers
Represented By: Tom Moore Dees Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Margaret Keliher, Individually and in her capacity as Trustee of the MHTE and a member of the Advisory Board of the HHTE
Represented By: Murray Jules Fogler Esq.
Represented By: Carrie L. Huff Esq.
Represented By: W. Scott Hastings Esq.
Represented By: Brian E. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Margaret Keliher, Temporary Administrator of the Estate of Albert G. Hill, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Keith Benedict
Represented By: Brian E. Mason
Represented By: W. Scott Hastings Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Carol E. Irwin
Represented By: Michael Justin Lang Esq. I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chester Donnally
Represented By: Carrie L. Huff Esq.
Represented By: Michael Justin Lang Esq. I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Thomas P. Tatham, Individually
Represented By: Trey Crawford
Represented By: Michael Justin Lang Esq. I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Albert G. Hill, IV, on behalf of Caroline Hill
Represented By: R. Kevin Spencer
Represented By: Zachary E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Nance Hill
Represented By: R. Kevin Spencer
Represented By: Zachary E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Albert G. Hill, IV
Represented By: R. Kevin Spencer
Represented By: Zachary E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?