Howell v. Methodist Richardson
Plaintiff / Appellant: Nicole A. Howell
Defendant / Appellee: Methodist Richardson Medical Center, Mental Health
Case Number: 22-10812
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury-Medical Malpractice
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2022 MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate issue date satisfied. [22-10812] (RAJ) [Entered: 10/17/2022 09:53 AM]
September 23, 2022 COURT ORDER dismissing appeal for lack of jurisdiction [9936951-2]. Mandate issue date is 10/17/2022. [22-10812] (MFY) [Entered: 09/23/2022 10:51 AM]
September 12, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: AA Recommendation to submit to court for jurisdictional review. Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-10812] (MFY) [Entered: 09/12/2022 08:36 AM]
August 19, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Nicole A. Howell [22-10812] (CBW) [Entered: 08/19/2022 03:18 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Howell v. Methodist Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Nicole A. Howell
Represented By: Nicole A. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Methodist Richardson Medical Center, Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?