Gonzalez v. Duane
Plaintiff / Appellant: Berman De Paz Gonzalez, Individually and as Heir and on behalf of the Estate of Berman De Paz-Martinez and Emerita Martinez-Torres, Individually and as Heir and on behalf of the Estate of Berman De Paz-Martinez
Defendant / Appellee: Therese M. Duane, Medical Doctor
Case Number: 22-11019
Filed: October 18, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury-Medical Malpractice
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2022 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Mr. Berman De Paz Gonzalez and Ms. Emerita Martinez-Torres. Extension Granted to and including 01/12/2023. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 01/12/2023 for Appellants Berman De Paz Gonzalez and Emerita Martinez-Torres [22-11019] (LEF) [Entered: 12/06/2022 10:32 AM]
December 5, 2022 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Mr. Berman De Paz Gonzalez and Ms. Emerita Martinez-Torres in 22-11019 for filing Appellants' Brief until 01/12/2023 [22-11019, 21-11258] (William D. Taylor ) [Entered: 12/05/2022 06:38 PM]
November 28, 2022 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising counsel that the cases have been consolidated for oral argument purposes only. Updated caption is attached. [21-11258, 22-11019] (AS) [Entered: 11/28/2022 12:46 PM]
November 16, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Katherine Hancock for party(s) Appellee Therese M. Duane, in case 22-11019 [22-11019] (LEF) [Entered: 11/16/2022 09:41 AM]
November 15, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-11019] (Katherine Hancock ) [Entered: 11/15/2022 02:48 PM]
November 15, 2022 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion to assign cases to same panel received from Appellants Mr. Berman De Paz Gonzalez, Ms. Emerita Martinez-Torres and Appellee Ms. Therese M. Duane because this is a duplicate request for relief. The same relief is requested in the motion filed in 21-11258 [22-11019] (LEF) [Entered: 11/16/2022 09:46 AM]
November 8, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) William D. Taylor for party(s) Appellant Emerita Martinez-Torres Appellant Berman De Paz Gonzalez, in case 22-11019 [22-11019] (LEF) [Entered: 11/08/2022 10:18 AM]
November 4, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-11019] (William D. Taylor ) [Entered: 11/04/2022 04:31 PM]
November 3, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/13/2022 for Appellants Berman De Paz Gonzalez and Emerita Martinez-Torres. [22-11019] (SDH) [Entered: 11/03/2022 10:15 AM]
November 3, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-11019] (SDH) [Entered: 11/03/2022 10:14 AM]
October 26, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-11019] (Philip Avery Vickers ) [Entered: 10/26/2022 10:03 AM]
October 26, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-11019] (Jordan Matthew Parker ) [Entered: 10/26/2022 10:49 AM]
October 26, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jordan Matthew Parker for Appellee Therese M. Duane in 22-11019 [22-11019] (LEF) [Entered: 10/26/2022 04:28 PM]
October 26, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Philip Avery Vickers for party(s) Appellee Therese M. Duane, in case 22-11019 [22-11019] (LEF) [Entered: 10/26/2022 04:29 PM]
October 21, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9965978-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-11019] (PAC) [Entered: 10/21/2022 11:07 AM]
October 21, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:20-CV-72. Electronic ROA due on 11/07/2022. [22-11019] (PAC) [Entered: 10/21/2022 11:09 AM]
October 18, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Berman De Paz Gonzalez and Ms. Emerita Martinez-Torres [22-11019] (CAS) [Entered: 10/18/2022 04:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Duane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Berman De Paz Gonzalez, Individually and as Heir and on behalf of the Estate of Berman De Paz-Martinez
Represented By: Jackson Bryan Davis
Represented By: William D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Emerita Martinez-Torres, Individually and as Heir and on behalf of the Estate of Berman De Paz-Martinez
Represented By: Jackson Bryan Davis
Represented By: William D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Therese M. Duane, Medical Doctor
Represented By: Jordan Matthew Parker Esq.
Represented By: Katherine Hancock
Represented By: Philip Avery Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?