Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A. v. BB Energy USA
Plaintiff / Appellee: Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A.
Not Yet Classified: BB Energy USA, L.L.C.
Case Number: 22-20021
Filed: January 13, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Marine

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 14, 2022 Summary Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A. v. BB Energy USA

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied [22-20021] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S MEMORANDUM BRIEF FILED by Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A.. Date of service: 03/02/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cain, Letourneau; Attorney for Appellants: Flynn, Frost, Ponig, Silverman; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Wilgus [22-20021] (Keith Bernard Letourneau ) [Entered: 03/02/2022 11:56 AM]
February 16, 2022 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 03/18/2022 for Appellee Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A. [22-20021] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by BB Energy USA, L.L.C.. Date of service: 02/16/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cain, Letourneau, Wilgus; Attorney for Appellants: Flynn, Frost, Ponig, Silverman [22-20021] (Andrew D. Silverman ) [Entered: 02/16/2022 06:27 PM]
February 16, 2022 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 [22-20021] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant BB Energy USA, L.L.C.. Date of service: 02/16/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cain, Letourneau, Wilgus; Attorney for Appellants: Flynn, Frost, Ponig, Silverman [22-20021] (Andrew D. Silverman ) [Entered: 02/16/2022 06:29 PM]
January 27, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Andrew D. Silverman for Appellant BB Energy USA, L.L.C. in 22-20021 [22-20021] (CCR) [Entered: 01/27/2022 09:49 AM]
January 27, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Claudia Wilson Frost for party(s) Appellant BB Energy USA, L.L.C., in case 22-20021 [22-20021] (CCR) [Entered: 01/27/2022 10:29 AM]
January 27, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Keith Bernard Letourneau for party(s) Appellee Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A., in case 22-20021 [22-20021] (CCR) [Entered: 01/27/2022 11:03 AM]
January 27, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Zachary Cain for Appellee Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A. in 22-20021 [22-20021] (MAS) [Entered: 01/27/2022 01:18 PM]
January 26, 2022 COURT ORDER granting Motion to expedite appeal filed by Appellant BB Energy USA, L.L.C. [ # 9763008-2 ] [22-20021] (CCR) [Entered: 01/26/2022 04:53 PM]
January 26, 2022 BRIEFING SUSPENDED - expedited briefing schedule issued. A/Pet's Brief deadline canceled [22-20021] (CCR) [Entered: 01/26/2022 04:55 PM]
January 26, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. EXPEDITED SCHEDULE. A/Pet's Brief Due on 02/16/2022 for Appellant BB Energy USA, L.L.C... Appellee's Brief due on 03/02/2022 for Appellee Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A... Reply Brief due on 03/16/2022 for Appellant BB Energy USA, L.L.C.. [22-20021] (CCR) [Entered: 01/26/2022 04:57 PM]
January 26, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20021] (Zachary Cain ) [Entered: 01/26/2022 12:25 PM]
January 26, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-20021] (Keith Bernard Letourneau ) [Entered: 01/26/2022 12:21 PM]
January 25, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Christina Elise Ponig for BB Energy USA, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20021] (Christina Elise Ponig ) [Entered: 01/25/2022 02:57 PM]
January 25, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20021] (Claudia Wilson Frost ) [Entered: 01/25/2022 02:50 PM]
January 25, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20021] (James Anglin Flynn ) [Entered: 01/25/2022 02:59 PM]
January 25, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Andrew D. Silverman for BB Energy USA, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-20021] (Andrew D. Silverman ) [Entered: 01/25/2022 02:55 PM]
January 25, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Christina Elise Ponig for Appellant BB Energy USA, L.L.C. in 22-20021, by Attorney(s) James Anglin Flynn for party(s) Appellant BB Energy USA, L.L.C., in case 22-20021 [22-20021] (ABT) [Entered: 01/25/2022 06:19 PM]
January 25, 2022 OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant BB Energy USA, L.L.C. to expedite the appeal [9763008-2]. Date of service: 01/25/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cain, Wilgus; Attorney for Appellants: Flynn, Ponig, Silverman [22-20021] (Andrew D. Silverman ) [Entered: 01/25/2022 10:17 PM]
January 24, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-20021] (DDL) [Entered: 01/24/2022 08:29 AM]
January 24, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/07/2022 for Appellant BB Energy USA, L.L.C.. [22-20021] (DDL) [Entered: 01/24/2022 08:29 AM]
January 14, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9755997-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-20021] (RLL) [Entered: 01/14/2022 12:41 PM]
January 14, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:21-CV-1953. Electronic ROA due on 01/31/2022. [22-20021] (RLL) [Entered: 01/14/2022 12:50 PM]
January 13, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant BB Energy USA, L.L.C. [22-20021] (SDH) [Entered: 01/13/2022 11:50 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A. v. BB Energy USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Preble-Rish Haiti, S.A.
Represented By: Zachary Cain
Represented By: Lauren B. Wilgus
Represented By: Keith Bernard Letourneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: BB Energy USA, L.L.C.
Represented By: Christina Elise Ponig
Represented By: Andrew D. Silverman
Represented By: James Anglin Flynn
Represented By: Claudia Wilson Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?