Noble House v. Certain Underwriters
Plaintiff / Appellant: Noble House, L.L.C.
Defendant / Appellee: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Policy MS-S 5722 (Marine Package)
Case Number: 22-20281
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Marine
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2022 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED Additionally the Brief requires a corrected caption. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Record Excerpts due on 08/15/2022 for Appellant Noble House, L.L.C.. Sufficient Brief due on 08/15/2022 for Appellant Noble House, L.L.C... Appellee's Brief due on 08/31/2022 for Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London [22-20281] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Noble House, L.L.C.. Date of service: 08/01/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Brogan; Attorney for Appellees: Davant, Dmiszewicki; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Haisfield [22-20281] (Blair Brogan ) [Entered: 08/01/2022 08:01 PM]
June 23, 2022 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Noble House, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [22-20281] (CCR) [Entered: 06/23/2022 01:48 PM]
June 22, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Blair Brogan for Appellant Noble House, L.L.C. in 22-20281 [22-20281] (CCR) [Entered: 06/22/2022 10:10 AM]
June 22, 2022 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Noble House, L.L.C. [Transcript already on file] for the Court to process. Date of service: 06/22/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Brogan; Attorney for Appellees: Davant, Dmiszewicki; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Haisfield. [22-20281] (Blair Brogan ) [Entered: 06/22/2022 04:21 PM]
June 21, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-20281] (DDL) [Entered: 06/21/2022 11:25 AM]
June 21, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/01/2022 for Appellant Noble House, L.L.C.. [22-20281] (DDL) [Entered: 06/21/2022 11:26 AM]
June 21, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-20281] (Blair Brogan ) [Entered: 06/21/2022 11:05 AM]
June 17, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Aaron Michael Dmiszewicki for Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London in 22-20281 [22-20281] (CCR) [Entered: 06/17/2022 04:03 PM]
June 17, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Charles Stuart Davant for party(s) Appellee Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, in case 22-20281 [22-20281] (CCR) [Entered: 06/17/2022 01:28 PM]
June 16, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-20281] (Charles Stuart Davant ) [Entered: 06/16/2022 09:34 AM]
June 16, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20281] (Aaron Michael Dmiszewicki ) [Entered: 06/16/2022 09:35 AM]
June 15, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9871339-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-20281] (ABT) [Entered: 06/15/2022 02:54 PM]
June 15, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:21-CV-3585. Electronic ROA due on 06/30/2022. [22-20281] (ABT) [Entered: 06/15/2022 02:57 PM]
June 14, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Noble House, L.L.C. [22-20281] (ABT) [Entered: 06/14/2022 09:44 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Noble House v. Certain Underwriters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Noble House, L.L.C.
Represented By: Blair Brogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, Subscribing to Policy MS-S 5722 (Marine Package)
Represented By: Aaron Michael Dmiszewicki
Represented By: Melaina Diane Haisfield
Represented By: Charles Stuart Davant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?