Moskovits v. Mercedes-Benz Financial
Plaintiff / Appellant: Alexander Moskovits
Defendant / Appellee: Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA, L.L.C., Automotive Recovery Services, Incorporated, doing business as ADESA and Unknown State and Federal Agents
Case Number: 22-20522
Filed: October 4, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other personal property damage
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2022 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Rachel Willborg. [22-20522] (Rachel Willborg ) [Entered: 10/19/2022 04:27 PM]
October 14, 2022 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Rachel Willborg. [22-20522] (Rachel Willborg ) [Entered: 10/14/2022 04:04 PM]
October 14, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Matt Delmore Manning for Appellee Automotive Recovery Services, Incorporated in 22-20522, Attorney Matt Delmore Manning for Appellee Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA, L.L.C. in 22-20522, by Attorney(s) Nicholas Reid O'Conner for party(s) Appellee Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA, L.L.C. Appellee Automotive Recovery Services, Incorporated, in case 22-20522 [22-20522] (ABT) [Entered: 10/14/2022 08:13 AM]
October 12, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-20522] (Nicholas Reid O'Conner ) [Entered: 10/12/2022 05:38 PM]
October 12, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-20522] (Matt Delmore Manning ) [Entered: 10/12/2022 05:36 PM]
October 5, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process after monitoring for dc#75 reconsideration; if denied ok to process, if granted return for juris review. [9955416-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. [22-20522] (CCR) [Entered: 10/05/2022 04:14 PM]
October 4, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Alexander Moskovits [22-20522] (ABT) [Entered: 10/04/2022 09:21 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Moskovits v. Mercedes-Benz Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Alexander Moskovits
Represented By: Alexander Moskovits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA, L.L.C.
Represented By: Matt Delmore Manning
Represented By: Nicholas Reid O'Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Automotive Recovery Services, Incorporated, doing business as ADESA
Represented By: Matt Delmore Manning
Represented By: Nicholas Reid O'Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Unknown State and Federal Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?