Merrill Lynch v. Palombo
Plaintiff / Appellee: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Incorporated
Defendant / Appellant: John Michael Palombo
Case Number: 22-20571
Filed: October 28, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2022 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. John Michael Palombo. Additionally the Brief requires: See attached letter for deficiencies. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 12/27/2022 for Appellant John Michael Palombo. [22-20571] (CCR) [Entered: 12/12/2022 03:49 PM]
November 17, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Rima F. Hartman for party(s) Appellee Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, in case 22-20571 [22-20571] (ABT) [Entered: 11/17/2022 02:35 PM]
November 17, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-20571] (Rima F. Hartman ) [Entered: 11/17/2022 10:57 AM]
November 14, 2022 FEE PAID by Appellant Mr. John Michael Palombo. Fee deadline satisfied [22-20571] (DDL) [Entered: 11/11/2022 11:09 AM]
November 14, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No [22-20571] (DDL) [Entered: 11/11/2022 11:10 AM]
November 14, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/27/2022 for Appellant John Michael Palombo. [22-20571] (DDL) [Entered: 11/11/2022 11:11 AM]
November 1, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9974454-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 11/16/2022 for Appellant John Michael Palombo [22-20571] (ABT) [Entered: 11/01/2022 04:46 PM]
October 28, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. John Michael Palombo [22-20571] (SDH) [Entered: 10/28/2022 09:39 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Merrill Lynch v. Palombo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Incorporated
Represented By: John P. Kincade
Represented By: Rima F. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: John Michael Palombo
Represented By: John Michael Palombo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?