Mays v. City of Shreveport
Plaintiff / Appellant: John L. Mays, Jr.
Defendant / Appellee: City of Shreveport, Shreveport Police Department, Internal Affairs, City of Shreveport, Ben Raymond and City Jail of Shreveport
Case Number: 22-30226
Filed: April 22, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2022 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the document received 05/19/2022, from Appellant Mr. John L. Mays, Jr., because we are unable to determine the relief sought. [22-30226] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/20/2022 12:49 PM]
May 16, 2022 FORWARDING MOTION for IFP received from Appellant Mr. John L. Mays, Jr. to the District Court for filing. [22-30226] (MAS) [Entered: 05/17/2022 11:17 AM]
May 5, 2022 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the document received from Appellant Mr. John L. Mays, Jr. because it is unknow as to what relief you are seeking [22-30226] (MAS) [Entered: 05/06/2022 10:17 AM]
April 27, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9832996-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Miscellaneous due on 05/27/2022 for Appellant John L. Mays Jr. Monitoring for a signed Notice of Appeal. [22-30226] (CB) [Entered: 04/27/2022 09:02 AM]
April 22, 2022 PARTY LIMIT CASE. (FOR A FULL LIST OF PARTIES FOR THIS APPEAL, PLEASE REFER TO THE DISTRICT COURT'S DOCKET SHEET.) [22-30226] (MCS) [Entered: 04/22/2022 09:08 AM]
April 22, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. John L. Mays, Jr. [22-30226] (MCS) [Entered: 04/22/2022 09:05 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mays v. City of Shreveport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: John L. Mays, Jr.
Represented By: John L. Mays Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City of Shreveport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Shreveport Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Internal Affairs, City of Shreveport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ben Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: City Jail of Shreveport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?