Kenai Ironclad v. CP Marine Services
Plaintiff / Appellee: Kenai Ironclad Corporation
Defendant / Appellant: CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C.
Case Number: 22-30311
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Marine
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-30311] (AGL) [Entered: 07/15/2022 10:14 AM]
July 15, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/24/2022 for Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C.. [22-30311] (AGL) [Entered: 07/15/2022 10:15 AM]
July 15, 2022 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance of counsel form received from Mr. Alfred J. Rufty, III, counsel for Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. because it is a duplicate of what was filed on 06/02/2022. [22-30311] (CB) [Entered: 07/19/2022 10:29 AM]
July 11, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:19-CV-2799. Electronic ROA due on 07/26/2022. [22-30311] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/11/2022 02:22 PM]
July 11, 2022 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Nichelle Wheeler, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 07/08/2022 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [22-30311] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/11/2022 02:21 PM]
July 8, 2022 NOTICE RECEIVED from Nichelle Wheeler that the transcript ordered by Appellant CP Marine Services, L.L.C. is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [22-30311] (Nichelle Wheeler ) [Entered: 07/08/2022 04:17 PM]
July 5, 2022 NOTICE RECEIVED from Karen A. Ibos that the transcript ordered by Appellant CP Marine Services, L.L.C. is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [22-30311] (Karen Anderson Ibos ) [Entered: 07/05/2022 10:36 AM]
June 29, 2022 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Karen Anderson Ibos, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 06/21/2022 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [22-30311] (WMJ) [Entered: 06/29/2022 12:42 PM]
June 15, 2022 ACKNOWLEDGMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Karen Anderson Ibos, Est. Completion Dt: 07/13/2022, Est. No.of Pgs: 600, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 06/13/2022, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 07/13/2022, Proceeding Type and Date: Bench Trial 02/14/2022 - 02/17/2022. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 07/13/2022 for Karen Anderson Ibos, Court Reporter [22-30311] (CB) [Entered: 06/15/2022 08:09 AM]
June 15, 2022 ACKNOWLEDGMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Nichelle Wheeler, Est. Completion Dt: 07/13/2022, Est. No.of Pgs: 200, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 06/13/2022, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 07/13/2022, Proceeding Type and Date: Bench Trial 02/22/2022. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 07/13/2022 for Nichelle Wheeler [22-30311] (CB) [Entered: 06/15/2022 08:11 AM]
June 14, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Harry E. Morse for party(s) Appellee Kenai Ironclad Corporation, in case 22-30311 [22-30311] (CB) [Entered: 06/14/2022 03:58 PM]
June 13, 2022 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Nichelle Wheeler. [22-30311] (Nichelle Wheeler ) [Entered: 06/13/2022 03:06 PM]
June 13, 2022 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Karen A. Ibos. [22-30311] (Karen Anderson Ibos ) [Entered: 06/13/2022 06:46 AM]
June 10, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30311] (Harry E. Morse ) [Entered: 06/10/2022 09:15 AM]
June 2, 2022 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. Transcript Order Form for Ms. Karen Ibos for the Court to process. Date of service: 06/02/2022 via US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Bohman; Attorney for Appellant: Rufty; email - Attorney for Appellee: Bohman; Attorney for Appellant: Rufty; clerk - Attorney for Appellee: Bohman; Attorney for Appellant: Rufty. [22-30311] (Alfred Jackson Rufty III) [Entered: 06/02/2022 10:59 AM]
June 2, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Alfred Jackson Rufty, III, Esq. for CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30311] (Alfred Jackson Rufty III) [Entered: 06/02/2022 10:56 AM]
June 2, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Martin Stewart Bohman for Appellee Kenai Ironclad Corporation in 22-30311 [22-30311] (AGL) [Entered: 06/02/2022 12:32 PM]
June 2, 2022 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. Transcript Order Form Ms. Nichelle Drake for the Court to process. Date of service: 06/02/2022 via US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Bohman; Attorney for Appellant: Rufty; email - Attorney for Appellee: Bohman; Attorney for Appellant: Rufty; clerk - Attorney for Appellee: Bohman; Attorney for Appellant: Rufty. [22-30311] (Alfred Jackson Rufty III) [Entered: 06/02/2022 11:00 AM]
June 2, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Alfred Jackson Rufty III for Appellant Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. in 22-30311, Attorney Alfred Jackson Rufty III for Appellant CP Marine Services, L.L.C. in 22-30311 [22-30311] (AGL) [Entered: 06/02/2022 12:34 PM]
June 2, 2022 TRANSCRIPT ORDERS (2) received from Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C.. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Karen Anderson Ibos, Proceeding Type and Date: Bench Trial 02/14/2022 - 02/17/2022 ; Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Nichelle Wheeler, Proceeding Type and Date: Bench Trial 02/22/2022. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 06/13/2022 for Karen Ibos, Court Reporter and Nichelle Wheeler, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9860713-2 ], [ # 9860719-2 ] [22-30311] (AGL) [Entered: 06/03/2022 10:27 AM]
June 1, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9859329-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 06/16/2022, for Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. [22-30311] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/01/2022 09:38 AM]
June 1, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30311] (Martin Stewart Bohman ) [Entered: 06/01/2022 04:32 PM]
May 26, 2022 FEE PAID by Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C.. [22-30311] (WMJ) [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:23 PM]
May 26, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. [22-30311] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/26/2022 10:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kenai Ironclad v. CP Marine Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kenai Ironclad Corporation
Represented By: Martin Stewart Bohman
Represented By: Harry E. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CP Marine Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alfred Jackson Rufty Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alfred Jackson Rufty Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?