Jenkins v. TriWest Healthcare
Plaintiff / Appellant: Charles Jenkins
Defendant / Appellee: TriWest Healthcare Alliance
Case Number: 22-30429
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury-Medical Malpractice
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9940899-1] to the Motion for sanctions filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Jenkins in 22-30429 [ # 9933142-2 ]. Response/Opposition deadline satisfied. [22-30429] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by TriWest Healthcare Alliance [9940899-1] to the filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Jenkins [ # 9933142-2 ] Date of Service: 09/16/2022 via US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Beatmann; email - Appellant Jenkins; Attorney for Appellee: Scheiderer. [22-30429] (Jason R. Scheiderer ) [Entered: 09/16/2022 09:53 AM]
September 3, 2022 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Jenkins for sanctions against Appellee TriWest Healthcasre Alliance. Date of service: 09/03/2022. Response/Opposition due on 09/16/2022. [22-30429] (MCS) [Entered: 09/06/2022 02:37 PM]
September 2, 2022 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Charles Jenkins. # of Copies Provided: 0. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 10/03/2022 for Appellee TriWest Healthcare Alliance. [22-30429] (SEP) [Entered: 09/06/2022 10:14 AM]
August 30, 2022 CLERK ORDER denying motion to extend time to file Appellant's brief filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Jenkins [ # 9927829-2 ]. [22-30429] (MCS) [Entered: 08/30/2022 10:02 AM]
August 29, 2022 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Jenkins to extend time to file brief as appellant [9927829-2]. Date of service: 08/29/2022 [22-30429] (MCS) [Entered: 08/30/2022 08:08 AM]
August 3, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jason R. Scheiderer for party(s) Appellee TriWest Healthcare Alliance, in case 22-30429 [22-30429] (MCS) [Entered: 08/03/2022 03:59 PM]
August 2, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30429] (Jason R. Scheiderer ) [Entered: 08/02/2022 05:13 PM]
August 2, 2022 Attorney Jason R. Scheiderer is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: No signature on appearance form. Attorney should also update office telephone number in PACER. [22-30429] (LBM) [Entered: 08/02/2022 03:27 PM]
August 2, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30429] (Jason R. Scheiderer ) [Entered: 08/02/2022 10:33 AM]
July 25, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/06/2022 for Appellant Charles Jenkins. [22-30429] (DDL) [Entered: 07/25/2022 08:18 AM]
July 25, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-30429] (DDL) [Entered: 07/25/2022 08:18 AM]
July 22, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9898736-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-30429] (CB) [Entered: 07/22/2022 01:12 PM]
July 22, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:22-CV-37. Electronic ROA due on 08/08/2022. [22-30429] (CB) [Entered: 07/22/2022 01:17 PM]
July 19, 2022 FEE PAID by Appellant Mr. Charles Jenkins. [22-30429] (MCS) [Entered: 07/19/2022 01:12 PM]
July 19, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Charles Jenkins. [22-30429] (SEP) [Entered: 07/19/2022 10:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jenkins v. TriWest Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Charles Jenkins
Represented By: Charles Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TriWest Healthcare Alliance
Represented By: Jerry A. Beatmann Jr.
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?