Imperial Crane v. H & E Equipment
Plaintiff / Appellant: Imperial Crane Services, Incorporated
Defendant / Appellee: H & E Equipment Services, Incorporated
Case Number: 22-30447
Filed: July 27, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other personal property damage
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-30447] (CMB) [Entered: 08/18/2022 09:48 AM]
August 18, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 09/27/2022 for Appellant Imperial Crane Services, Incorporated. [22-30447] (CMB) [Entered: 08/18/2022 09:51 AM]
August 4, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Marshall Perkins for Appellee H & E Equipment Services, Incorporated, in case 22-30447. [22-30447] (DLJ) [Entered: 08/04/2022 11:14 AM]
August 4, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Donald J. Armand, Jr., for Appellee H & E Equipment Services, Incorporated, in 22-30447. [22-30447] (DLJ) [Entered: 08/04/2022 10:21 AM]
August 3, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30447] (Marshall Perkins ) [Entered: 08/03/2022 11:07 AM]
August 3, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Donald J. Armand, Jr. for H & E Equipment Services, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30447] (Donald J. Armand Jr.) [Entered: 08/03/2022 10:58 AM]
August 1, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9904307-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [22-30447] (AGL) [Entered: 08/01/2022 08:42 AM]
August 1, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:21-CV-1183. Electronic ROA due on 08/16/2022. [22-30447] (AGL) [Entered: 08/01/2022 08:44 AM]
July 27, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Imperial Crane Services, Incorporated [22-30447] (AGL) [Entered: 07/27/2022 08:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Imperial Crane v. H & E Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Imperial Crane Services, Incorporated
Represented By: James Edward Sudduth Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: H & E Equipment Services, Incorporated
Represented By: Donald J. Armand Jr.
Represented By: Marshall Perkins Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?