Kenai Ironclad v. CP Marine Services
Plaintiff / Appellee: Kenai Ironclad Corporation
Defendant / Appellant: CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C.
Case Number: 22-30492
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Marine
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Martin Stewart Bohman for Appellee Kenai Ironclad Corporation in 22-30492 [22-30492] (MCS) [Entered: 09/28/2022 01:38 PM]
September 28, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [22-30492] (Harry E. Morse ) [Entered: 09/28/2022 09:19 AM]
September 28, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Harry E. Morse for party(s) Appellee Kenai Ironclad Corporation, in case 22-30492 [22-30492] (MCS) [Entered: 09/28/2022 01:42 PM]
September 27, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30492] (Martin Stewart Bohman ) [Entered: 09/27/2022 05:38 PM]
September 21, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-30492] (DDL) [Entered: 09/21/2022 08:03 AM]
September 21, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/31/2022 for Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C.. [22-30492] (DDL) [Entered: 09/21/2022 08:09 AM]
September 16, 2022 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Motion to Consolidate Cases received from Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. because the motion to consolidate cases filed in case 22-30311 has been denied. [22-30492] (MCS) [Entered: 09/19/2022 10:49 AM]
September 15, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:19-CV-2799. Electronic ROA due on 09/30/2022. [22-30492] (MCS) [Entered: 09/15/2022 03:04 PM]
September 15, 2022 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. [22-30492] (MCS) [Entered: 09/15/2022 03:02 PM]
September 15, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Alfred Jackson Rufty III for Appellant Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. in 22-30492, Attorney Alfred Jackson Rufty III for Appellant CP Marine Services, L.L.C. in 22-30492 [22-30492] (MRW) [Entered: 09/15/2022 09:21 AM]
September 15, 2022 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to reopen case filed by Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. [ # 9939731-2 ] [22-30492] (MCS) [Entered: 09/15/2022 02:57 PM]
September 14, 2022 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Alfred Jackson Rufty, III, Esq. for CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [22-30492] (Alfred Jackson Rufty III) [Entered: 09/14/2022 03:17 PM]
September 14, 2022 OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. to reopen case [9939731-2]. Date of service: 09/14/2022 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Bohman; Attorney for Appellant: Rufty [22-30492] (Alfred Jackson Rufty III) [Entered: 09/14/2022 03:27 PM]
September 6, 2022 CLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter[9932881-2]. [22-30492] (MCS) [Entered: 09/06/2022 11:57 AM]
August 25, 2022 FEE PAID by Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C.. Fee deadline satisfied [22-30492] (MCS) [Entered: 08/25/2022 09:22 AM]
August 16, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9917471-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 08/31/2022 for Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C.. Transcript order due on 08/31/2022 for Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. [22-30492] (AGL) [Entered: 08/16/2022 03:55 PM]
August 12, 2022 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants CP Marine Services, L.L.C. and Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C. [22-30492] (AGL) [Entered: 08/12/2022 08:17 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kenai Ironclad v. CP Marine Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Kenai Ironclad Corporation
Represented By: Martin Stewart Bohman
Represented By: Harry E. Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CP Marine Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alfred Jackson Rufty Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: Ten Mile Exchange, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alfred Jackson Rufty Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?