Price-Bedi v. DOJ
Plaintiff / Appellant: Melinda Price-Bedi
Defendant / Appellee: United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Louisiana Supreme Court, St. Charles Parish Planning and Zoning, St. Charles Parish Sheriff's Department, Gregory Champagne, Sheriff, In his Official and/or Personal Capacity, Lance Marino, St. Charles Parish Clerk of Court, in his Official and/or Personal Capacity, Laura Jean Todaro, Kenner Magistrate Judge/Attorney, in her Official and/or Personal Capacity, Valero Energy, United Way of St. Charles, St. Charles Parish Rotary Club, Creative Family Solutions, Louisiana Domestic Abuse Advocacy, Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals, Gretna, Louisiana Bar Association, Louisiana Crime Commissioner, Ford Lumber Company, Houma and Archer Daniels Midland
Case Number: 22-30510
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:21-CV-2161. Electronic ROA due on 09/28/2022. [22-30510] (WMJ) [Entered: 09/13/2022 01:00 PM]
September 13, 2022 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [22-30510] (AGL) [Entered: 09/13/2022 03:45 PM]
September 13, 2022 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/24/2022 for Appellant Melinda Price-Bedi. [22-30510] (AGL) [Entered: 09/13/2022 03:46 PM]
September 13, 2022 FEE PAID by Appellant Ms. Melinda Price-Bedi. Fee deadline satisfied [22-30510] (WMJ) [Entered: 09/13/2022 12:59 PM]
August 30, 2022 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Ms. Melinda Price-Bedi. Extension Granted to and including 09/16/2022. Fee deadline updated to 09/16/2022, for Appellant Melinda Price-Bedi. [22-30510] (DLJ) [Entered: 08/30/2022 09:21 AM]
August 17, 2022 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process (main and additional appeal). [9918107-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Fee due on 09/01/2022 for Appellant Melinda Price-Bedi [22-30510] (AGL) [Entered: 08/17/2022 11:40 AM]
August 15, 2022 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9916307-2] NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Melinda Price-Bedi. [9916307-1] [22-30510] (AGL) [Entered: 08/15/2022 04:20 PM]
August 15, 2022 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Melinda Price-Bedi [22-30510] (AGL) [Entered: 08/15/2022 03:59 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Price-Bedi v. DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Melinda Price-Bedi
Represented By: Melinda Price-Bedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Louisiana Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: St. Charles Parish Planning and Zoning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: St. Charles Parish Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Gregory Champagne, Sheriff, In his Official and/or Personal Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lance Marino, St. Charles Parish Clerk of Court, in his Official and/or Personal Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Laura Jean Todaro, Kenner Magistrate Judge/Attorney, in her Official and/or Personal Capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Valero Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United Way of St. Charles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: St. Charles Parish Rotary Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Creative Family Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Louisiana Domestic Abuse Advocacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals, Gretna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Louisiana Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Louisiana Crime Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ford Lumber Company, Houma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Archer Daniels Midland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?