Session v. Giannotti
Plaintiff / Appellant: Tujuan Estaisyo Session
Defendant / Appellee: FNU Giannotti, Texas Department of Criminal Justice Robertson Unit Employee, FNU Haines, Texas Department of Criminal Justice Robertson Unit Pill Nurse, FNU Cano, Texas Department of Criminal Justice Unit Assistant Warden, J. Lopez, Texas Department of Criminal Justice Robertson Unit Assistant Warden and FNU Reyes, Texas Department of Criminal Justice Robertson Unit Grievance Staff
Case Number: 23-10010
Filed: January 5, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2023 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [23-10010] (RSM) [Entered: 02/17/2023 01:37 PM]
February 16, 2023 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 1:20-CV-116. Electronic ROA due on 03/03/2023. [23-10010] (MRW) [Entered: 02/16/2023 02:22 PM]
February 16, 2023 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Tujuan Estaisyo Session in support of Motion to proceed IFP in accordance with PLRA [ # 15 ]. [16] [23-10010] (Incorporated in the Motion to Proceed IFP) (MRW) [Entered: 02/16/2023 02:17 PM]
February 16, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Tujuan Estaisyo Session to proceed in forma pauperis in accordance with the Prison Litigation Reform Act (PLRA) [15] Fee deadline canceled, to amend caption [15]. [23-10010] (MRW) [Entered: 02/16/2023 02:16 PM]
February 10, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Tujuan Estaisyo Session for production of documents. Reason: Surveillance Videos.. [23-10010] (MRW) [Entered: 02/13/2023 08:37 AM]
February 6, 2023 Filing 13 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: Letter [23-10010] (MRW) [Entered: 02/09/2023 10:28 AM]
January 31, 2023 Filing 12 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [12] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [23-10010] (RSM) [Entered: 01/31/2023 03:12 PM]
January 31, 2023 Filing 11 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 01/26/2023 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. Tujuan Estaisyo Session because appeal is not taken in good faith - fee assessed - BAUGH case.Fee due on 03/02/2023 for Appellant Tujuan Estaisyo Session [23-10010] (RSM) [Entered: 01/31/2023 02:58 PM]
January 26, 2023 Filing 7 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [7] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Tujuan Estaisyo Session. [7] [23-10010] (RAJ) [Entered: 01/26/2023 09:15 AM]
January 23, 2023 Filing 6 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Brief and Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis received from Appellant Mr. Tujuan Estaisyo Session because they are premature. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending in the district court [23-10010] (MRW) [Entered: 01/23/2023 03:33 PM]
January 11, 2023 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Motion for IFP pending in DC. [23-10010] (RSM) [Entered: 01/11/2023 10:37 AM]
January 5, 2023 Filing 1 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Tujuan Estaisyo Session [23-10010] (AS) [Entered: 01/05/2023 03:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Session v. Giannotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Tujuan Estaisyo Session
Represented By: Tujuan Estaisyo Session
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU Giannotti, Texas Department of Criminal Justice Robertson Unit Employee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU Haines, Texas Department of Criminal Justice Robertson Unit Pill Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU Cano, Texas Department of Criminal Justice Unit Assistant Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. Lopez, Texas Department of Criminal Justice Robertson Unit Assistant Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU Reyes, Texas Department of Criminal Justice Robertson Unit Grievance Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?