Lopez v. Kendall
Plaintiff / Appellant: Arturo S. Lopez, Sr.
Defendant / Appellee: Frank Kendall, III, Secretary of the Air Force and Mary D. Garcia, Human Resource Specialist, Employee Relations Labor, Laughlin Air Force Base
Case Number: 23-50844
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 14, 2024 Lopez v. Kendall

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2024 Filing 18 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the request to add a CD to the record received from Appellant Mr. Arturo S. Lopez, Sr. because a motion is required to supplement the record and hearings are to be transcribed. [23-50844] (CAS) [Entered: 01/17/2024 11:56 AM]
January 12, 2024 Filing 17 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Arturo S. Lopez, Sr.. Additionally the Brief requires INSUFFICIENT FOR: RECORD CITATIONS ARE NOT IN PROPER FORMAT. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Appellee's Brief due on 02/12/2024 for Appellees Mary D. Garcia and Frank Kendall III. Sufficient Brief due on 01/26/2024 for Appellant Arturo S. Lopez Sr.. [23-50844] (RSM) [Entered: 01/12/2024 12:36 PM]
December 21, 2023 Filing 15 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Huiju Jeon for party(s) Appellee Frank Kendall III Appellee Mary D. Garcia, in case 23-50844 [23-50844] (TNM) [Entered: 12/21/2023 02:51 PM]
December 19, 2023 Filing 14 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/29/2024 for Appellant Arturo S. Lopez Sr.. [23-50844] (DDL) [Entered: 12/19/2023 03:55 PM]
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [23-50844] (DDL) [Entered: 12/19/2023 03:54 PM]
December 19, 2023 Filing 12 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [23-50844] (Huiju Jeon ) [Entered: 12/19/2023 02:43 PM]
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 5:21-CV-646. Electronic ROA due on 12/19/2023. [23-50844] (CAS) [Entered: 12/04/2023 04:33 PM]
December 4, 2023 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Arturo S. Lopez, Sr. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [23-50844] (CAS) [Entered: 12/04/2023 04:32 PM]
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 LETTER ISSUED due to fee paid. Transcript Order deadline updated to 12/19/2023 for Appellant Arturo S. Lopez Sr. [23-50844] (CAS) [Entered: 12/04/2023 10:45 AM]
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 LETTER filed by Appellant Mr. Arturo S. Lopez, Sr. referencing case OK to process [ # 5 ]. Letter stating fee was paid and inquiring about electronic filing status. [23-50844] (CAS) [Entered: 12/04/2023 10:34 AM]
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 FEE PAID by Appellant Mr. Arturo S. Lopez, Sr.. Fee deadline satisfied [23-50844] (CAS) [Entered: 12/04/2023 10:31 AM]
November 28, 2023 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Fee due on 12/13/2023 for Appellant Arturo S. Lopez Sr. [23-50844] (CAS) [Entered: 11/28/2023 02:39 PM]
November 20, 2023 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Arturo S. Lopez, Sr. [23-50844] (RSM) [Entered: 11/20/2023 12:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lopez v. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Arturo S. Lopez, Sr.
Represented By: Arturo S. Lopez Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Frank Kendall, III, Secretary of the Air Force
Represented By: Faith Johnson
Represented By: Huiju Jeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mary D. Garcia, Human Resource Specialist, Employee Relations Labor, Laughlin Air Force Base
Represented By: Faith Johnson
Represented By: Huiju Jeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?