Ferguson v. Lockheed Martin
Plaintiff: Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson, Individually
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Case Number: 24-10713
Filed: August 7, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. 3729(a))
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2024 Filing 46 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Ms. Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson. Extension Granted to and including 11/07/2024. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 11/07/2024 for Appellant Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson [24-10713] (RA) [Entered: 09/24/2024 04:22 PM]
September 24, 2024 Filing 45 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Ms. Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson for filing Appellant's Brief until 11/08/2024 [24-10713] (Steven Shepard ) [Entered: 09/24/2024 01:33 PM]
September 23, 2024 Filing 44 COURT ORDER granting Motion to view and obtain sealed document filed by Appellee Lockheed Martin Corporation [ # 39 ] [24-10713] (MFY) [Entered: 09/23/2024 09:57 AM]
September 18, 2024 Filing 39 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Lockheed Martin Corporation to view and obtain sealed document. Date of service: 09/18/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Boyd, Jobe, Sanders, Shackelford, Shepard, Smith, Wilson, Young; Attorney for Appellees: Bronson, Campiti, Hagan, Harper, Vest [24-10713] (Patrick M. Hagan ) [Entered: 09/18/2024 12:09 PM]
September 9, 2024 Filing 38 COURT ORDER granting Motion to view and obtain sealed document filed by Appellant Ms. Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson [ # 33 ] [24-10713] (CAG) [Entered: 09/09/2024 03:49 PM]
September 3, 2024 Filing 33 UNOPPOSED MOTION to view and obtain sealed document. [24-10713] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson to unseal document. Date of service: 09/03/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Boyd, Jobe, Sanders, Shackelford, Shepard, Smith, Wilson, Young; Attorney for Appellees: Bronson, Campiti, Hagan, Harper, Vest [24-10713] (Taylor H. Wilson Jr.) [Entered: 09/03/2024 03:32 PM]
September 3, 2024 Filing 31 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Catherine Carlyle Jobe for party(s) Appellant Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson, in case 24-10713 [24-10713] (ELB) [Entered: 09/03/2024 02:12 PM]
September 3, 2024 Filing 30 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-10713] (Catherine Carlyle Jobe ) [Entered: 09/03/2024 01:31 PM]
August 29, 2024 Filing 29 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/08/2024 for Appellant Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson. [24-10713] (DDL) [Entered: 08/29/2024 10:07 AM]
August 29, 2024 Filing 28 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [24-10713] (DDL) [Entered: 08/29/2024 10:07 AM]
August 23, 2024 Filing 26 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Patrick M. Hagan for party(s) Appellee Lockheed Martin Corporation, in case 24-10713 [24-10713] (SH) [Entered: 08/23/2024 02:46 PM]
August 23, 2024 Filing 25 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Michael James Bronson for party(s) Appellee Lockheed Martin Corporation, in case 24-10713 [24-10713] (SH) [Entered: 08/23/2024 02:44 PM]
August 23, 2024 Filing 23 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Emily Nicole Vest for Appellee Lockheed Martin Corporation in 24-10713 [24-10713] (TST) [Entered: 08/23/2024 10:19 AM]
August 23, 2024 Filing 22 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-10713] (Patrick M. Hagan ) [Entered: 08/23/2024 09:48 AM]
August 23, 2024 Filing 21 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-10713] (Michael James Bronson ) [Entered: 08/23/2024 09:46 AM]
August 22, 2024 Filing 20 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Emily Nicole Vest for Lockheed Martin Corporation for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-10713] (Emily Nicole Vest ) [Entered: 08/22/2024 02:16 PM]
August 19, 2024 Filing 18 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Taylor H. Wilson Jr. for party(s) Appellant Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson, in case 24-10713 [24-10713] (SH) [Entered: 08/19/2024 09:47 AM]
August 16, 2024 Filing 17 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-10713] (Taylor H. Wilson Jr.) [Entered: 08/16/2024 01:48 PM]
August 16, 2024 Filing 15 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Anthony Joseph Campiti for party(s) Appellee Lockheed Martin Corporation, in case 24-10713 [24-10713] (SH) [Entered: 08/16/2024 10:51 AM]
August 16, 2024 Filing 14 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-10713] (Anthony Joseph Campiti ) [Entered: 08/16/2024 09:12 AM]
August 14, 2024 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:24-CV-25. Electronic ROA due on 08/29/2024. [24-10713] (ABT) [Entered: 08/14/2024 12:38 PM]
August 14, 2024 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson advising transcript unnecessary - no hearings. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [24-10713] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 08/14/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Boyd, Sanders, Shackelford, Shepard, Smith, Young; Attorney for Appellees: Harper, Vest [24-10713] (Steven Shepard ) [Entered: 08/14/2024 10:08 AM]
August 13, 2024 Filing 10 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Stephen Lee Shackelford Jr. for party(s) Appellant Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson, in case 24-10713 [24-10713] (ELB) [Entered: 08/13/2024 02:57 PM]
August 13, 2024 Filing 9 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-10713] (Stephen Lee Shackelford Jr.) [Entered: 08/13/2024 12:32 PM]
August 13, 2024 Filing 7 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Steven Shepard for party(s) Appellant Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson, in case 24-10713 [24-10713] (ABT) [Entered: 08/13/2024 10:07 AM]
August 13, 2024 Filing 6 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [6] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 08/28/2024 for Appellant Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson [24-10713] (ABT) [Entered: 08/13/2024 10:01 AM]
August 13, 2024 Filing 5 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-10713] (Steven Shepard ) [Entered: 08/13/2024 08:51 AM]
August 7, 2024 Filing 1 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson [24-10713] (MBC) [Entered: 08/07/2024 01:30 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Lockheed Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: Emily Nicole Vest
Represented By: Joseph W. Harper Esq.
Represented By: Patrick M. Hagan
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Campiti
Represented By: Michael James Bronson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Del Carmen Gamboa Ferguson, Individually
Represented By: James Michael Young
Represented By: Elvin E. Smith Esq. III
Represented By: Roger Dickert Sanders
Represented By: Samuel L. Boyd Esq.
Represented By: Taylor H. Wilson Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Lee Shackelford Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Catherine Carlyle Jobe Esq.
Represented By: Steven Shepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?