Hamblet v. Glass Family
Plaintiff: Travis Hamblet, ex rel.
Defendant: Glass Family of Companies, L.L.C., Prometheus Capital, L.L.C., G.A.S. Global Services, L.L.C., Hirepower Personnel, Inc., Preemp, Inc., doing business as HireResource Staffing, David Glass, Celeste Glass and HarveStaff, L.L.C.
Case Number: 24-20562
Filed: December 19, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. 3729(a))
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2025 Filing 8 CLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter[8] [24-20562] (AMD) [Entered: 01/23/2025 01:07 PM]
December 31, 2024 Filing 7 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [7] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 01/15/2025 for Appellant Travis Hamblet [24-20562] (AMD) [Entered: 12/31/2024 11:52 AM]
December 27, 2024 Filing 4 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Garrett Cole. [24-20562] (Garrett Cole ) [Entered: 12/27/2024 05:03 PM]
December 19, 2024 Filing 1 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Travis Hamblet [24-20562] (RAJ) [Entered: 12/19/2024 10:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Hamblet v. Glass Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Hamblet, ex rel.
Represented By: Jarrett L. Ellzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glass Family of Companies, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alistair Byrne Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prometheus Capital, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alistair Byrne Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.A.S. Global Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alistair Byrne Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hirepower Personnel, Inc.
Represented By: Alistair Byrne Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preemp, Inc., doing business as HireResource Staffing
Represented By: Alistair Byrne Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Glass
Represented By: Alistair Byrne Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celeste Glass
Represented By: Alistair Byrne Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HarveStaff, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alistair Byrne Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?