Rosales v. Industrial Sales & Services
Plaintiff: Rosendo Joseph Rosales, III and Leo C. Butler, Jr.
Defendant: Industrial Sales & Services, L.L.C. and Bernard Gochis
Case Number: 24-40289
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 Filing 20 NO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIVED for Ms. Mary Henry. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Mary Henry, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 05/22/2024. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 06/21/2024 for Mary Henry, Court Reporter [24-40289] (ABT) [Entered: 06/10/2024 09:06 AM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellees Mr. Bernard Gochis and Industrial Sales & Services, L.L.C.. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Mary Henry, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 03/01/2021 , Motion Hearing 12/20/2021 , Status Conference 06/02/2023. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 06/03/2024 for Mary Henry, Court Reporter. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 17 ], [ # 16 ] [24-40289] (ABT) [Entered: 05/22/2024 07:30 AM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellees Mr. Bernard Gochis and Industrial Sales & Services, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed (7/15/21 & 5/4/23). [24-40289] (ABT) [Entered: 05/22/2024 07:29 AM]
May 21, 2024 Filing 17 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellee Industrial Sales & Services, L.L.C. Transcripts for 3/1/2021, 12/20/2021, and 6/2/2023 for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/21/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Hesse, Moore; Attorney for Appellees: Hovnatanian, Jordan, Kroger. [24-40289] (Levon G. Hovnatanian ) [Entered: 05/21/2024 05:03 PM]
May 21, 2024 Filing 16 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellee Industrial Sales & Services, L.L.C. For Transcripts of 7/15/2021 and 5/4/2023 hearings for the Court to process. Date of service: 05/21/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Hesse, Moore; Attorney for Appellees: Hovnatanian, Jordan, Kroger. [24-40289] (Levon G. Hovnatanian ) [Entered: 05/21/2024 05:01 PM]
May 21, 2024 Filing 14 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Melissa Ann Moore for party(s) Appellant Rosendo Joseph Rosales III Appellant Leo C. Butler Jr., in case 24-40289, by Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Leo C. Butler Jr. in 24-40289, Attorney Curt Christopher Hesse for Appellant Rosendo Joseph Rosales III in 24-40289 [24-40289] (ABT) [Entered: 05/21/2024 02:42 PM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Leo C. Butler, Jr. and Mr. Rosendo Joseph Rosales, III advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [24-40289] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Leo C. Butler, Jr. and Mr. Rosendo Joseph Rosales, III advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 05/20/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Hesse; Attorney for Appellees: Hovnatanian, Jordan, Kroger [24-40289] (Curt Christopher Hesse ) [Entered: 05/20/2024 05:27 PM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 12 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-40289] (Melissa Ann Moore ) [Entered: 05/20/2024 03:50 PM]
May 20, 2024 Filing 11 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Curt Christopher Hesse for Mr. Leo C. Butler, Jr. and Mr. Rosendo Joseph Rosales, III for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-40289] (Curt Christopher Hesse ) [Entered: 05/20/2024 02:59 PM]
May 9, 2024 Filing 9 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Levon G. Hovnatanian for party(s) Appellee Industrial Sales & Services, L.L.C. Appellee Bernard Gochis, in case 24-40289 [24-40289] (CCR) [Entered: 05/09/2024 04:43 PM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 8 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-40289] (Levon G. Hovnatanian ) [Entered: 05/08/2024 04:30 PM]
May 3, 2024 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 05/20/2024 for Appellants Leo C. Butler Jr. and Rosendo Joseph Rosales III [24-40289] (ABT) [Entered: 05/03/2024 02:29 PM]
April 30, 2024 Filing 1 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Leo C. Butler, Jr. and Mr. Rosendo Joseph Rosales, III. [24-40289] (RLL) [Entered: 04/30/2024 09:04 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rosales v. Industrial Sales & Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosendo Joseph Rosales, III
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo C. Butler, Jr.
Represented By: Curt Christopher Hesse
Represented By: Melissa Ann Moore Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Sales & Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Elizabeth Mata Kroger Esq.
Represented By: Levon G. Hovnatanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Gochis
Represented By: David B. Jordan
Represented By: Levon G. Hovnatanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?