Aramark Services v. Aetna Life Ins
Plaintiff: Aramark Services, Incorporated Group Health Plan, Aramark Services Incorporated, formerly known as Aramark Corporation, Aramark Uniform Services, Group Health and Welfare Plan and Aramark Benefits Compliance Review Committee
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 24-40323
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement (E.R.I.S.A.)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2024 Filing 23 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/05/2024 for Appellant Aetna Life Insurance Company. [24-40323] (DDL) [Entered: 06/26/2024 01:08 PM]
June 26, 2024 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [24-40323] (DDL) [Entered: 06/26/2024 01:07 PM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 20 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Peter J. Kocoras for party(s) Appellant Aetna Life Insurance Company, in case 24-40323 [24-40323] (CCR) [Entered: 05/23/2024 04:22 PM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 19 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David Watson Hughes for party(s) Appellant Aetna Life Insurance Company, in case 24-40323 [24-40323] (CCR) [Entered: 05/23/2024 04:20 PM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 17 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Gregory Harris Berman for party(s) Appellant Aetna Life Insurance Company, in case 24-40323 [24-40323] (CCR) [Entered: 05/23/2024 11:53 AM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 16 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Mary Katherine Strahan for party(s) Appellant Aetna Life Insurance Company, in case 24-40323 [24-40323] (CCR) [Entered: 05/23/2024 11:52 AM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 15 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney John Bruce Shely for Appellant Aetna Life Insurance Company in 24-40323 [24-40323] (CCR) [Entered: 05/23/2024 11:51 AM]
May 23, 2024 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 2:23-CV-446. Electronic ROA due on 06/07/2024. [24-40323] (CCR) [Entered: 05/23/2024 11:43 AM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 13 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-40323] (Gregory Harris Berman ) [Entered: 05/22/2024 04:25 PM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 12 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-40323] (Peter J. Kocoras ) [Entered: 05/22/2024 04:23 PM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 11 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-40323] (David Watson Hughes ) [Entered: 05/22/2024 03:44 PM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 10 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-40323] (Mary Katherine Strahan ) [Entered: 05/22/2024 03:26 PM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [24-40323] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Aetna Life Insurance Company advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 05/22/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Shely, Smith; Attorney for Appellee: Truelove [24-40323] (John Bruce Shely ) [Entered: 05/22/2024 03:22 PM]
May 22, 2024 Filing 8 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. John Bruce Shely, Esq. for Aetna Life Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-40323] (John Bruce Shely ) [Entered: 05/22/2024 03:21 PM]
May 8, 2024 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 05/23/2024 for Appellant Aetna Life Insurance Company [24-40323] (CCR) [Entered: 05/08/2024 04:40 PM]
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Aetna Life Insurance Company. [24-40323] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/06/2024 02:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Aramark Services v. Aetna Life Ins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aramark Services, Incorporated Group Health Plan
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aramark Services Incorporated, formerly known as Aramark Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aramark Uniform Services, Group Health and Welfare Plan
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aramark Benefits Compliance Review Committee
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John Bruce Shely Esq.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith Esq.
Represented By: Gregory Harris Berman
Represented By: David Watson Hughes
Represented By: Peter J. Kocoras
Represented By: Mary Katherine Strahan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?