Jehl v. GGNSC Southaven
Plaintiff: Cameron Jehl
Defendant: GGNSC Southaven, L.L.C., doing business as Golden Living Center-Southaven, GGNSC Clinical Services, L.L.C., doing business as Golden Clinical Services and GGNSC Administrative Services, L.L.C., doing business as Golden Ventures
Case Number: 24-60415
Filed: August 15, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. 3729(a))
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2024 Filing 35 REPLY filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Mr. Cameron Jehl [35] to the to stay further proceedings in this court filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Mr. Cameron Jehl [ # 17 ]. Date of Service: 10/03/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellees/Cross-Appellants: Gerry, Gratz, Salcido; Attorney for Appellant/Cross-Appellee: McDuff. [24-60415] (Robert Bruce McDuff ) [Entered: 10/03/2024 11:56 PM]
September 27, 2024 Filing 34 CLERK ORDER denying Motion to stay further proceedings in this court filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Mr. Cameron Jehl [ # 17 ]. [24-60415] (SEP) [Entered: 09/27/2024 11:59 AM]
September 27, 2024 Filing 31 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Margaret Sams Gratz for Appellee/Cross-Appellant GGNSC Clinical Services, L.L.C. in 24-60415, Attorney Margaret Sams Gratz for Appellee/Cross-Appellant GGNSC Administrative Services, L.L.C. in 24-60415, Attorney Margaret Sams Gratz for Appellee/Cross-Appellant GGNSC Southaven, L.L.C. in 24-60415 [24-60415] (SH) [Entered: 09/27/2024 08:47 AM]
September 26, 2024 Filing 29 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [29] to the [21] Motion to stay further proceedings in this court filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Mr. Cameron Jehl in 24-60415 [ # 17 ]. Response/Opposition deadline satisfied. Date of Service: 09/26/2024. [24-60415] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by GGNSC Administrative Services, L.L.C., GGNSC Clinical Services, L.L.C. and GGNSC Southaven, L.L.C. [29] to the to stay further proceedings in this court filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Mr. Cameron Jehl [ # 17 ] Date of Service: 09/26/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellees/Cross-Appellants: Gerry, Gratz, Salcido; Attorney for Appellant/Cross-Appellee: McDuff. [24-60415] (Robert Salcido ) [Entered: 09/26/2024 08:48 PM]
September 26, 2024 Filing 28 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-60415] (Margaret Sams Gratz ) [Entered: 09/26/2024 12:40 PM]
September 20, 2024 Filing 26 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Emily Gerry for party(s) Appellee/Cross-Appellant GGNSC Administrative Services, L.L.C. Appellee/Cross-Appellant GGNSC Clinical Services, L.L.C. Appellee/Cross-Appellant GGNSC Southaven, L.L.C., in case 24-60415 [24-60415] (SH) [Entered: 09/20/2024 02:02 PM]
September 20, 2024 Filing 24 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert Salcido for party(s) Appellee/Cross-Appellant GGNSC Administrative Services, L.L.C. Appellee/Cross-Appellant GGNSC Clinical Services, L.L.C. Appellee/Cross-Appellant GGNSC Southaven, L.L.C., in case 24-60415 [24-60415] (SH) [Entered: 09/20/2024 01:12 PM]
September 20, 2024 Filing 23 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [24-60415] (Emily Gerry ) [Entered: 09/20/2024 01:06 PM]
September 20, 2024 Filing 22 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [24-60415] (Robert Salcido ) [Entered: 09/20/2024 09:47 AM]
September 17, 2024 Filing 21 RESPONSE DUE to Motion to stay further proceedings in this court filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Mr. Cameron Jehl in 24-60415 [ # 17 ]. Response/Opposition due on 09/26/2024. [24-60415] (SEP) [Entered: 09/17/2024 11:15 AM]
September 16, 2024 Filing 17 OPPOSED MOTION to stay further proceedings in this court. Reason: pending resolution in the district court of a motion to enforce a settlement agreement. Date of service: 09/16/2024 [24-60415] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant/Cross-Appellee Mr. Cameron Jehl to stay further proceedings in this court. Reason: pending resolution in the district court of a motion to enforce a settlement agreement. Date of service: 09/16/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellee/Cross-Appellant: Gratz; Attorney for Appellant/Cross-Appellee: McDuff [24-60415] (Robert Bruce McDuff ) [Entered: 09/16/2024 06:45 AM]
September 6, 2024 Filing 16 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/16/2024 for Appellant/Cross-Appellee Cameron Jehl. [24-60415] (DDL) [Entered: 09/06/2024 02:10 PM]
September 6, 2024 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [24-60415] (DDL) [Entered: 09/06/2024 02:09 PM]
September 3, 2024 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:19-CV-91. Electronic ROA due on 09/18/2024. [24-60415] (PAC) [Entered: 09/03/2024 02:38 PM]
September 3, 2024 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes - No hearings. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [24-60415] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant/Cross-Appellee Mr. Cameron Jehl advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 09/03/2024 via email - Attorney for Appellee/Cross-Appellant: Gratz; Attorney for Appellant/Cross-Appellee: McDuff [24-60415] (Robert Bruce McDuff ) [Entered: 09/03/2024 10:40 AM]
August 28, 2024 Filing 12 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [12] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [24-60415] (RA) [Entered: 08/28/2024 02:42 PM]
August 26, 2024 Filing 7 CASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. [7] Parties updated: Appellant/Cross-Appellee Cameron Jehl, Appellees/Cross-Appellants GGNSC Southaven, L.L.C., GGNSC Administrative Services, L.L.C. and GGNSC Clinical Services, L.L.C. in 24-60415. NOA filed by Appellees GGNSC Administrative Services, L.L.C., GGNSC Clinical Services, L.L.C. and GGNSC Southaven, L.L.C.. [7] [24-60415] (RA) [Entered: 08/26/2024 11:12 AM]
August 19, 2024 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [5] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 09/03/2024 for Appellant Cameron Jehl [24-60415] (RA) [Entered: 08/19/2024 04:46 PM]
August 15, 2024 Filing 1 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Cameron Jehl [24-60415] (RA) [Entered: 08/15/2024 09:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jehl v. GGNSC Southaven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Southaven, L.L.C., doing business as Golden Living Center-Southaven
Represented By: Margaret Sams Gratz Esq.
Represented By: Emily Gerry
Represented By: Robert Salcido Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Clinical Services, L.L.C., doing business as Golden Clinical Services
Represented By: Margaret Sams Gratz Esq.
Represented By: Emily Gerry
Represented By: Robert Salcido Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Administrative Services, L.L.C., doing business as Golden Ventures
Represented By: Margaret Sams Gratz Esq.
Represented By: Emily Gerry
Represented By: Robert Salcido Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Jehl
Represented By: Robert Bruce McDuff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?