In re: Gary Westcott
Petitioner: In re: Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections and Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary, In His Official Capacity
Respondent: Jessie Hoffman
Case Number: 25-30088
Filed: February 23, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 17, 2025 Summary In re: Gary Westcott

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 44 WRIT issued. [25-30088] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/17/2025 06:16 PM]
April 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate issue date satisfied. [25-30088] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/17/2025 05:13 PM]
April 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [] Judge: CH , Judge: JCH , Judge: ASO Mandate issue date is 05/09/2025; granting Petition for writ of mandamus filed by Petitioners Mr. Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary and Mr. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections [ # 4 ] [25-30088] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/17/2025 05:11 PM]
March 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 40 COURT ORDER: This panel previously DENIED AS MOOT petition for writ of mandamus and DENIED AS MOOT an administrative stay of the District Court's February 21, 2025 order. The panel has considered Petitioners' motion for reconsideration. IT IS ORDERED that the motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. [ # 36 ]; [ # 4 ]; [ # 4 ] [25-30088] (MFY) [Entered: 03/18/2025 05:17 PM]
March 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION filed by Petitioners Mr. Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary and Mr. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections for reconsideration of the Order dated 03/17/2025 [36]. Date of service: 03/18/2025 via email - Attorney for Petitioner: Aguinaga; Attorney for Respondents: Kappel, Kumar, Pourciau [25-30088] (Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga ) [Entered: 03/18/2025 10:11 AM]
March 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED COURT ORDER denying as moot Petition for writ of mandamus filed by Petitioners Mr. Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary and Mr. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections; denying as moot the request for an administrative stay of the District Court's February 21, 2025 order. [ # 4 ]. [25-30088] (MFY) [Entered: 03/17/2025 08:51 AM]
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER filed by Petitioners Mr. Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary and Mr. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections regarding two updates for the panel. Date of Service: 03/12/2025 via email - Attorney for Petitioner: Aguinaga; Attorney for Respondents: Kappel, Kumar, Pourciau [25-30088] (Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga ) [Entered: 03/12/2025 12:14 PM]
February 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 28 COURT ORDER. The parties have informed us that Jessie Hoffman has filed a new complaint against Louisiana state officials in the Middle District of Louisiana. In light of the new complaint, we anticipate that the district court will vacate its February 21, 2025 order. We accordingly hold this mandamus proceeding in abeyance for seven days, to give the district court the opportunity to consider whether to vacate the February 21, 2025 order. [25-30088] (MFY) [Entered: 02/27/2025 08:18 AM]
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 27 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga for Petitioner Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary in 25-30088, Attorney Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga for Petitioner Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections in 25-30088 [25-30088] (STH) [Entered: 02/26/2025 04:20 PM]
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 25 LETTER filed by Respondent Mr. Jessie Hoffman referencing Letter filed by Petitioners Mr. Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary and Mr. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections [ # 24 ]. Date of Service: 02/26/2025 via email - Attorney for Petitioner: Aguinaga; Attorney for Respondents: Kappel, Kumar, Pourciau [25-30088] (Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel ) [Entered: 02/26/2025 01:11 PM]
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER filed by Petitioners Mr. Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary and Mr. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections Date of Service: 02/26/2025 via email - Attorney for Petitioner: Aguinaga; Attorney for Respondents: Kappel, Kumar, Pourciau [25-30088] (Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga ) [Entered: 02/26/2025 12:11 PM]
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Samantha Bosalavage Pourciau for party(s) Respondent Jessie Hoffman, in case 25-30088 [25-30088] (EMF) [Entered: 02/25/2025 02:11 PM]
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga for Mr. Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary and Mr. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [25-30088] (Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga ) [Entered: 02/25/2025 10:27 AM]
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Jessie Hoffman [18] to the Petition filed by Petitioners Mr. Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary and Mr. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections [ # 4 ], Petition filed by Petitioners Mr. Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary and Mr. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections [ # 4 ] Date of Service: 02/24/2025 via email - Attorney for Petitioner: Aguinaga; Attorney for Respondents: Kappel, Kumar. [25-30088] (Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel ) [Entered: 02/24/2025 08:01 PM]
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [25-30088] (Samantha Bosalavage Pourciau ) [Entered: 02/24/2025 12:17 PM]
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 COURT ORDER granting request for a temporary administrative stay of the District Court's February 21, 2025 order filed by Petitioners Mr. Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary and Mr. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections [ # 4 ] [25-30088] (MFY) [Entered: 02/24/2025 11:08 AM]
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Mr. Michael Rubenstein is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:no longer handling case. [25-30088] (MFY) [Entered: 02/24/2025 10:40 AM]
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Jessie Hoffman [13] to the Petition filed by Petitioners Mr. Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary and Mr. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections [ # 4 ], Petition filed by Petitioners Mr. Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary and Mr. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections [ # 4 ] Date of Service: 02/24/2025 via email - Attorney for Petitioner: Aguinaga; Attorney for Respondents: Kappel, Kumar, Rubenstein. [25-30088] (Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel ) [Entered: 02/24/2025 09:55 AM]
February 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Attorney Cecelia Kappel added as counsel of record for Respondent Jessie Hoffman in 25-30088 [25-30088] (MFY) [Entered: 02/23/2025 08:32 PM]
February 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Petition for writ of mandamus [ # 4 ], Petition to stay district court's February 21, 2025 Order. [ # 4 ] filed by Petitioners Mr. Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary and Mr. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections [25-30088] (MFY) [Entered: 02/23/2025 08:17 PM]
February 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PETITION filed by Petitioners Mr. Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary and Mr. Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections for writ of mandamus [4] Date received in 5th Circuit: 02/23/2025., for administrative stay of District Court's February 21, 2025 ruling. [4].. Ruling requested immediately. [25-30088] (MFY) [Entered: 02/23/2025 08:04 PM]
February 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW COMPLETE. [25-30088] (MFY) [Entered: 02/23/2025 07:54 PM]
February 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORIGINAL PROCEEDING CASE docketed. [25-30088] (MFY) [Entered: 02/23/2025 07:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In re: Gary Westcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In re: Gary Westcott, Secretary, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Represented By: Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary, In His Official Capacity
Represented By: Jorge Benjamin Aguinaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jessie Hoffman
Represented By: Nishi L. Kumar
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Represented By: Samantha Bosalavage Pourciau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?