John Thomas, et al v. Deutsche Bank Natl Trust Co, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN THOMAS and SUSAN THOMAS
Defendant / Appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, JPMORGAN CHASE & COMPANY, CHRISTINA ALLEN, nka Christina Schwarting, ANN GARBIS and LPS MORTGAGE PROCESSING SOLUTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 12-3737
Filed: June 19, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER filed granting stipulation to dismiss case - voluntarily [ # 38 ] filed by Mr. John Peter Sherrod, to dismiss pursuant to FRAP 42 and local rule 33(d). Entered by order of the court. (TM) [Entered: 11/05/2012 03:29 PM]
November 5, 2012 Filing 38 STIPULATION filed to dismiss voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Stipulation filed by Attorney Mr. John Peter Sherrod for Appellants John Thomas and Susan Thomas. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2012. (JPS) [Entered: 11/05/2012 08:28 AM]
October 25, 2012 Filing 35 STIPULATION filed to dismiss voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Stipulation filed by Attorney Mr. John Peter Sherrod for Appellants John Thomas and Susan Thomas. Certificate of Service: 10/25/2012. (JPS) [Entered: 10/25/2012 04:45 PM]
October 9, 2012 Filing 34 Letter sent by Mediation Office to extend time to file stipulation. Stipulation now due 10/24/2012. (CAW) [Entered: 10/09/2012 12:24 PM]
September 10, 2012 Filing 32 Letter sent by Mediation Office notifying that a brief or stipulation to dismiss is due 10/10/2012. (CAW) [Entered: 09/10/2012 12:32 PM]
August 13, 2012 Filing 31 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 09/12/2012. appellee brief now due 10/15/2012. (CAW) [Entered: 08/13/2012 10:58 AM]
August 1, 2012 Filing 30 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 08/29/2012. appellee brief now due 10/01/2012. (CAW) [Entered: 08/01/2012 09:53 AM]
August 1, 2012 Filing 29 A follow-up mediation telephone conference has been scheduled for 08/13/2012 at 10:00 am ET with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 08/01/2012 09:51 AM]
July 16, 2012 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. John Peter Sherrod for Appellants John Thomas and Susan Thomas Certificate of Service: 07/16/2012. (JPS) [Entered: 07/16/2012 10:08 AM]
July 9, 2012 Filing 24 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., Ann Garbis and JPMorgan Chase & Co. by Anne Marie Sferra. Certificate of Service: 07/09/2012. (AMS) [Entered: 07/09/2012 04:32 PM]
July 5, 2012 Filing 22 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., Ann Garbis and JPMorgan Chase & Co. by Nelson M. Reid. Certificate of Service: 07/05/2012. (NMR) [Entered: 07/05/2012 02:14 PM]
July 3, 2012 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Daniel C. Gibson for Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., JPMorgan Chase & Co. and Ann Garbis Certificate of Service: 07/03/2012. (DCG) [Entered: 07/03/2012 01:55 PM]
July 3, 2012 Filing 19 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., Ann Garbis and JPMorgan Chase & Co. by Daniel C. Gibson. Certificate of Service: 07/03/2012. (DCG) [Entered: 07/03/2012 12:32 PM]
July 3, 2012 Filing 18 Counsel to refile under their own ECF account [APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Co., Ann Garbis and JPMorgan Chase & Co. by Nelson M. Reid. Certificate of Service: 07/03/2012.]--[Edited 07/03/2012 by SB] (DCG) [Entered: 07/03/2012 12:30 PM]
June 26, 2012 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Albert G. Lin for Appellee Christina Allen . Certificate of Service: 06/26/2012.--[Edited 06/26/2012 by JB] (AGL) [Entered: 06/26/2012 03:17 PM]
June 25, 2012 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Albert G. Lin for Appellee LPS Mortgage Processing Solutions, Inc. Certificate of Service: 06/25/2012.--[Edited 06/26/2012 by JB] (AGL) [Entered: 06/25/2012 01:27 PM]
June 22, 2012 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Christina Allen and LPS Mortgage Processing Solutions, Inc. by Albert G. Lin. Certificate of Service: 06/22/2012. (AGL) [Entered: 06/22/2012 10:33 AM]
June 22, 2012 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Christina Allen and LPS Mortgage Processing Solutions, Inc. by John P. Gilligan. Certificate of Service: 06/22/2012.--[Edited 06/22/2012 by JB] (JPG) [Entered: 06/22/2012 10:26 AM]
June 21, 2012 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee LPS Mortgage Processing Solutions, Inc. by John P. Gilligan and Albert G. Lin. Certificate of Service: 06/21/2012.**ERROR: DOCUMENTS FILED INCORRECTLY. Counsel will refile on 6/22/12**--[Edited 06/22/2012 by JB] (AGL) [Entered: 06/21/2012 04:41 PM]
June 20, 2012 Filing 8 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. John Peter Sherrod for Appellants John Thomas and Susan Thomas. Certificate of Service:06/20/2012. (JPS) [Entered: 06/20/2012 04:15 PM]
June 20, 2012 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants John Thomas and Susan Thomas by John Sherrod. Certificate of Service: 06/20/2012. (JPS) [Entered: 06/20/2012 04:14 PM]
June 20, 2012 Filing 6 BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 08/15/2012. appellee brief now due 09/17/2012. (CAW) [Entered: 06/20/2012 12:24 PM]
June 20, 2012 Filing 5 Mediation telephone conference has been scheduled for 07/31/2012 at 2:00 pm ET with Paul Calico. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 06/20/2012 12:22 PM]
June 20, 2012 Filing 4 Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (CAW) [Entered: 06/20/2012 12:21 PM]
June 19, 2012 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/01/2012;. appellee brief due 09/04/2012; (JMB) [Entered: 06/19/2012 01:55 PM]
June 19, 2012 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Julie Brock (JMB) [Entered: 06/19/2012 01:54 PM]
June 19, 2012 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants John Thomas and Susan Thomas. Transcript needed: n. (JMB) [Entered: 06/19/2012 01:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John Thomas, et al v. Deutsche Bank Natl Trust Co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN THOMAS
Represented By: John Peter Sherrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUSAN THOMAS
Represented By: John Peter Sherrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Represented By: Daniel C. Gibson
Represented By: Nelson Marlin Reid
Represented By: Anne M. Sferra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE & COMPANY
Represented By: Daniel C. Gibson
Represented By: Nelson Marlin Reid
Represented By: Anne M. Sferra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTINA ALLEN, nka Christina Schwarting
Represented By: John P. Gilligan
Represented By: Albert G. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANN GARBIS
Represented By: Daniel C. Gibson
Represented By: Nelson Marlin Reid
Represented By: Anne M. Sferra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LPS MORTGAGE PROCESSING SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: John P. Gilligan
Represented By: Albert G. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?