Clifford Tyler v. Hillsdale County Sheriff's De, et al
Amicus Curiae: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, STATES UNITED TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, NAMI OH, OHIO EMPOWERMENT COALITION, DISABILITY RIGHTS OHIO, DISABILITY RIGHTS TENNESSEE, LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE and KENTUCKY PROTECTION AND ADVOCACY
Defendant / Appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, STAN W. BURCHARDT, individually and as Sheriff of Hillsdale County, Michigan, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, individually and as Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, B. TODD JONES, individually and as Acting Director of The U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives, HILLSDALE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, named as Hillsdale County Sheriff's Office, BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, ERIC H. HOLDER, JR., Attorney General, In his individual capacity as Attorney General of the United States, LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. Attorney General, In her official capacity as Attorney General of the United States and THOMAS E. BRANDON, individually and as Deputy Director of the U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Plaintiff / Appellant: CLIFFORD CHARLES TYLER
Case Number: 13-1876
Filed: June 27, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2016 Filing 97 MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. (BLC)
September 15, 2016 Filing 96 OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : The judgment of the district court is REVERSED, and the case is REMANDED for the application of intermediate scrutiny to determine the statutes constitutionality as applied to Tyler. Decision for publication. R. Guy Cole, Jr., Chief Judge; Danny J. Boggs (CONCURRING IN MOST OF THE JUDGMENT); Eugene E. Siler, Jr., Alice M. Batchelder (CONCURRING IN MOST OF THE JUDGMENT); Karen Nelson Moore (DISSENTING); Eric L. Clay, Circuit Judge; Julia Smith Gibbons (AUTHORING LEAD OPINION); John M. Rogers (CONCURRING IN PART AND DISSENTING IN PART); Jeffrey S. Sutton (CONCURRING IN MOST OF THE JUDGMENT); Deborah L. Cook, David W. McKeague (CONCURRING); Richard Allen Griffin, Raymond M. Kethledge, Helene N. White (CONCURRING); Jane Branstetter Stranch, and Bernice Bouie Donald, Circuit Judges. *The citation to the lead opinion in fn. 1 of Judge Batchelder's writing has been corrected.--[Edited 09/16/2016 by CL] (CL)
October 14, 2015 Filing 95 CAUSE REARGUED EN BANC by Mr. Lucas J. McCarthy for Appellant Clifford Charles Tyler and Ms. Abby Christine Wright for Appellees US Department of Justice, et al before Chief Judge Cole, Judges Boggs, Siler, Batchelder, Moore, Clay, Gibbons, Rogers, Sutton, Cook, McKeague, Griffin, Kethledge, White, Stranch and Donald. (KSC)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER filed denying motion from Law Project for Psychiatric Rights for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in support of plaintiff-appellant and reversal upon rehearing en banc [ # 91 ] filed by Mr. Wayne Ramsay. Entered by order of the court. (BLH)
October 13, 2015 Filing 93 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Wayne Ramsay for Law Project for Psychiatric Rights Certificate of Service: 10/13/2015. (BLH)
October 9, 2015 Filing 92 TENDERED brief. Received from Attorney Mr. Wayne Ramsay for Law Project for Psychiatric Rights. (BLH)
October 9, 2015 Filing 91 Motion filed by Mr. Wayne Ramsay for Law Project for Psychiatric Rights for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in support of plaintiff-appellant and reversal upon rehearing en banc. Certificate of service:10/09/2015. (BLH)
October 9, 2015 Filing 90 APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Wayne Ramsay for Law Project for Psychiatric Rights. (BLH)
September 22, 2015 Filing 89 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Ms. Ronda J. Cress for Kentucky Protection and Advocacy, Disability Rights Ohio, Ohio Empowerment Coalition, Disability Rights Tennessee and NAMI OH. Copies:1. Certificate of Service:09/21/2015.--[Edited 09/22/2015 by BLH] (BLH)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER filed granting motion from Kentucky Protection and Advocacy, Disability Rights Ohio, Ohio Empowerment Coalition, Disability Rights Tennessee and NAMI OH for leave to file a brief as amici curiae [ # 83 ] filed by Ms. Ronda J. Cress. Entered by order of the court. (BLH)
September 22, 2015 Filing 87 APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Michael Kirkman for Kentucky Protection and Advocacy, Disability Rights Ohio, Ohio Empowerment Coalition, Disability Rights Tennessee and NAMI OH. (BLH)
September 22, 2015 Filing 86 APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Ms. Kristen Henry for Kentucky Protection and Advocacy, Disability Rights Ohio, Ohio Empowerment Coalition, Disability Rights Tennessee and NAMI OH. (BLH)
September 21, 2015 Filing 85 APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Ms. Ronda J. Cress for NAMI OH.--[Edited 09/22/2015 by BLH] (BLH)
September 21, 2015 Filing 84 TENDERED brief. Received from Attorney Ms. Ronda J. Cress for Kentucky Protection and Advocacy, Disability Rights Ohio, Ohio Empowerment Coalition, Disability Rights Tennessee and NAMI OH. (Party NAMI OH added).--[Edited 09/22/2015 by BLH] (BLH)
September 21, 2015 Filing 83 Motion filed by Ms. Ronda J. Cress for Kentucky Protection and Advocacy, Disability Rights Ohio, Ohio Empowerment Coalition, Disability Rights Tennessee, and NAMI OH for leave to file a brief as amici curiae. Certificate of service:09/21/2015. (Party NAMI OH added).--[Edited 09/22/2015 by BLH] (BLH)
September 21, 2015 Filing 82 APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Ms. Ronda J. Cress for Kentucky Protection and Advocacy, Disability Rights Ohio, Ohio Empowerment Coalition and Disability Rights Tennessee. (BLH)
September 21, 2015 Filing 81 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Mr. Daniel B. Asimow for States United to Prevent Gun Violence, in support of affirmance. Copies:1. Certificate of Service:09/17/2015. (BLH)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER filed granting motion from States United to Prevent Gun Violence for leave to file a brief a amicus curiae in support of affirmance [ # 78 ] filed by Mr. Daniel B. Asimow. Entered by order of the court. (BLH)
September 17, 2015 Filing 79 TENDERED brief. Received from Attorney Mr. Daniel B. Asimow for States United to Prevent Gun Violence. (BLH)
September 17, 2015 Filing 78 Motion filed by Mr. Daniel B. Asimow for States United to Prevent Gun Violence for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in support of affirmance. Certificate of service:09/17/2015. (BLH)
September 17, 2015 Filing 77 APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Daniel B. Asimow for States United to Prevent Gun Violence. (BLH)
August 24, 2015 Filing 76 Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Ms. Abby Christine Wright for Appellees USA, DOJ, FBI, Robert S. Mueller, III, Eric H. Holder, Jr., ATF, B. Todd Jones, Thomas E. Brandon and Loretta E. Lynch. Certificate of Service: 08/24/2015. (ACW)
August 20, 2015 Filing 75 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Mr. Simon J. Frankel for Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence in support of the government. Copies:1. Certificate of Service:08/17/2015. (BLH)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER filed granting motion from the Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in support of the government [ # 72 ] filed by Mr. Simon J. Frankel. Entered by order of the court. (BLH)
August 17, 2015 Filing 73 TENDERED brief in support of the government. Received from Attorney Mr. Simon J. Frankel for Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (BLH)
August 17, 2015 Filing 72 Motion filed by Mr. Simon J. Frankel for Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence for leave to file a brief amicus curiae in support of the government. Certificate of service:08/17/2015. (BLH)
August 10, 2015 Filing 71 REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Lucas J. McCarthy for Appellant Clifford Charles Tyler. Certificate of Service:08/10/2015. (LJM)
August 5, 2015 Filing 70 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Mr. Harry Frischer for Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence in support of defendants-appellees and affirmance upon rehearing en banc. Copies:1. Certificate of Service:08/03/2015. (BLH)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER filed granting motion from the Brady Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in support of defendants-appellees and affirmance upon rehearing en banc [ # 66 ] filed by Mr. Harry Frischer. Entered by order of the court. (BLH)
August 3, 2015 Filing 67 TENDERED brief. Received from Attorney Mr. Harry Frischer for Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (BLH)
August 3, 2015 Filing 66 Motion filed by Mr. Harry Frischer for Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in support of defendants-appellees and affirmance upon rehearing en banc. Certificate of service:08/03/2015. (BLH)
August 3, 2015 Filing 65 APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Harry Frischer for Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. (BLH)
July 30, 2015 Filing 64 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence by Simon J. Frankel. Certificate of Service: 07/30/2015. (SJF)
July 29, 2015 Filing 63 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed for Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence by Rebecca A. Jacobs. Certificate of Service: 07/29/2015. (RJ)
July 27, 2015 Filing 62 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Attorney Ms. Abby Christine Wright for Appellees USA, DOJ, FBI, Robert S. Mueller, III, Eric H. Holder, Jr., ATF, B. Todd Jones, Thomas E. Brandon and Loretta E. Lynch. Certificate of Service:07/27/2015. (ACW)
June 5, 2015 Filing 61 AMICUS APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Ms. Erin Elizabeth Murphy for Amicus Curiae National Rifle Association of America. (BLH)
June 4, 2015 Filing 60 AMICUS BRIEF filed by Mr. Paul D. Clement for National Rifle Association of America in support of plaintiff-appellant and reversal upon rehearing en banc. Copies: Electronic. Certificate of Service:05/29/2015. (BLH)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER filed granting motion for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in support of plaintiff-appellant and reversal upon rehearing en banc [ # 55 ] filed by Mr. Paul D. Clement. Entered by order of the court. (BLH)
May 29, 2015 Filing 58 TENDERED brief in support of plaintiff-appellant and reversal upon rehearing en banc. Received from Attorney Mr. Paul D. Clement for National Rifle Association of America. (BLH)
May 29, 2015 Filing 57 APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Stephen Vincent Potenza for National Rifle Association of America. (BLH)
May 29, 2015 Filing 56 APPEARANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Paul D. Clement for National Rifle Association of America. (BLH)
May 29, 2015 Filing 55 Motion filed by Mr. Paul D. Clement for National Rifle Association of America for leave to file a brief as amicus curiae in support of plaintiff-appellant and reversal upon rehearing en banc. Certificate of service: 05/29/2015. (BLH)
May 29, 2015 Filing 54 Oral argument acknowledgment filed by Attorney Mr. Lucas J. McCarthy for Appellant Clifford Charles Tyler. Certificate of Service: 05/29/2015. (LJM)
May 26, 2015 Filing 53 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Lucas J. McCarthy for Appellant Clifford Charles Tyler. Certificate of Service:05/26/2015. (LJM)
April 24, 2015 Filing 52 En Banc oral argument date set for 2:00 p.m., Wednesday, October 14, 2015. Notice of argument sent to counsel on 04/24/2015. (LAG)
April 23, 2015 Filing 51 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant supplemental brief due 05/26/2015; appellee supplemental brief due 07/27/2015. The supplemental briefs shall not exceed twenty-five (25) pages. Should appellant wish to file a reply brief, not to exceed twelve (12) pages, it is due not later than 08/10/2015. (BLH)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER filed granting petition for en banc rehearing [ # 47 ] filed by Ms. Abby Christine Wright, to reinstate case. The previous decision and judgment of this court is vacated, the mandate is stayed. R. Guy Cole , Jr., Chief Circuit Judge; Danny J. Boggs, Alice M. Batchelder, Karen Nelson Moore, Eric L. Clay, Julia Smith Gibbons, John M. Rogers, Jeffrey S. Sutton, Deborah L. Cook, David W. McKeague, Richard Allen Griffin, Raymond M. Kethledge, Helene N. White, Jane Branstetter Stranch, and Bernice Bouie Donald, Circuit Judges. (BLH)
March 24, 2015 Filing 49 RESPONSE to petition for en banc rehearing, [ # 47 ], previously filed by filed by Ms. Abby Christine Wright in 13-1876. Response filed by Mr. Lucas J. McCarthy for Clifford Charles Tyler. Certificate of service: 03/24/2015. (LJM)
March 10, 2015 Filing 48 LETTER SENT to Mr. Lucas J. McCarthy for Clifford Charles Tyler, notifying that he is directed to respond to the petition for en banc rehearing filed by Ms. Abby Christine Wright. Response due 03/24/2015. (BLH)
February 12, 2015 Filing 47 PETITION for en banc rehearing filed by Ms. Abby Christine Wright for USA, DOJ, FBI, Robert S. Mueller, III, Eric H. Holder, Jr., ATF, B. Todd Jones and Thomas E. Brandon. Certificate of Service: 02/12/2015. (ACW)
January 30, 2015 Filing 46 RULING LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to 02/17/2015 (14 days) to file a petition for rehearing en banc [ # 45 ] filed by Ms. Abby Christine Wright. (BLH)
January 26, 2015 Filing 45 MOTION filed by Ms. Abby Christine Wright for USA, DOJ, FBI, Robert S. Mueller, III, Eric H. Holder, Jr., ATF, B. Todd Jones and Thomas E. Brandon to extend time to file petition for rehearing en banc until 02/17/2015, to extend time to file petition for rehearing until 02/17/2015. Certificate of Service: 01/26/2015. (ACW)
January 2, 2015 Filing 44 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Thomas E. Brandon, ATF, FBI, Eric H. Holder, Jr., B. Todd Jones, Robert S. Mueller, III, DOJ and USA by Abby C. Wright. Certificate of Service: 01/02/2015. (ACW)
December 18, 2014 Filing 43 OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : The judgment of the district court is REVERSED, and the case is REMANDED. Decision for publication. Danny J. Boggs (AUTHORING), Eugene E. Siler, Jr., and Julia Smith Gibbons (CONCURRING), Circuit Judges. (CL)
March 21, 2014 Filing 42 CAUSE ARGUED by Mr. Lucas J. McCarthy for Appellant Clifford Charles Tyler and Ms. Anisha Dasgupta for Appellees USA, DOJ, FBI, Robert S. Mueller, III, Eric H. Holder, Jr., ATF, B. Todd Jones and Thomas E. Brandon before Boggs,Circuit Judge; Siler,Circuit Judge and Gibbons,Circuit Judge. (LAG)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER filed granting motion to waive oral argument [ # 40 ] filed by Mr. James L. Dyer on behalf of Hillsdale County and Hillside County Sheriff, Stan Burchardt Entered by order of the court. (YH)
March 20, 2014 Filing 40 MOTION filed by Mr. James L. Dyer for Hillsdale County Sheriff's Department and Stan W. Burchardt to waive oral argument and submit case on the briefs. Certificate of Service: 03/20/2014. [Motion to excuse Hillsdale County Sheriff's Department and Stan W. Burchardt ONLY from oral argument] --[Edited 03/20/2014 by BLC] (JLD)
February 27, 2014 Filing 39 Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Ms. Anisha Dasgupta for Appellees USA, DOJ, FBI, Robert S. Mueller, III, Eric H. Holder, Jr., ATF, B. Todd Jones and Thomas E. Brandon. Certificate of Service: 02/27/2014. (AD)
February 11, 2014 Filing 38 Oral argument acknowledgement filed by Attorney Mr. Lucas J. McCarthy for Appellant Clifford Charles Tyler. Certificate of Service: 02/11/2014. (LJM)
February 11, 2014 Filing 37 LETTER SENT to all counsel regarding time change of oral argument. Oral argument will begin at 8:30 a.m. instead of 9:00 a.m. (LAG)
February 3, 2014 Filing 36 Oral argument date set for 9:00 a.m., Friday, March 21, 2014. Notice of argument sent to counsel on 02/03/2014. (LAG)
December 6, 2013 Filing 34 REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Lucas J. McCarthy for Appellant Clifford Charles Tyler. Certificate of Service:12/06/2013. (LJM)
November 21, 2013 Filing 32 CORRECTED APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Anisha Dasgupta for USA, DOJ, FBI, Robert S. Mueller, III, Eric H. Holder, Jr., ATF, B. Todd Jones and Thomas E. Brandon. Certificate of Service:11/21/2013. Argument Request: requested. (AD)
November 20, 2013 Filing 30 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. James L. Dyer for Hillsdale County Sheriff's Department and Stan W. Burchardt. Certificate of Service:11/20/2013. Argument Request: waived. (JLD)
November 19, 2013 Filing 29 [DEFECTIVE FILING; CORRECTION NEEDED] [Counsel is directed to refile using the docketing event entry "corrected brief". The corrected brief must include Page ID# references following each record entry reference & Page ID# references in the designation of relevant district court documents. The corrected brief is due no later than 11/21/13] --[Edited 11/20/2013 by BLC] APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Ms. Anisha Dasgupta for USA, DOJ, FBI, Robert S. Mueller, III, Eric H. Holder, Jr., ATF, B. Todd Jones and Thomas E. Brandon. Certificate of Service:11/19/2013. Argument Request: requested. (AD)
October 21, 2013 Filing 28 BRIEFING LETTER SENT resetting briefing schedule: appellee brief now due 11/20/2013. (BLC)
October 17, 2013 Filing 26 LETTER filed by Ms. Anisha Dasgupta for USA, DOJ, FBI, Robert S. Mueller, III, Eric H. Holder, Jr., ATF, B. Todd Jones and Thomas E. Brandon regarding restoration of appropriations . Certificate of Service: 10/17/2013. (AD)
October 4, 2013 Filing 24 LETTER SENT to hold briefing in abeyance. The government shall inform the court once funds have been appropriated to the department. (BLC)
October 1, 2013 Filing 22 MOTION filed by Ms. Anisha Dasgupta for USA, DOJ, FBI, Robert S. Mueller, III, Eric H. Holder, Jr., ATF, B. Todd Jones and Thomas E. Brandon to hold case in abeyance. Certificate of Service: 10/01/2013. (AD)
August 27, 2013 Filing 21 LETTER SENT granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 20 ] filed by Ms. Anisha Dasgupta, resetting briefing schedule: appellee brief now due 10/11/2013. (BLC)
August 23, 2013 Filing 20 MOTION filed by Ms. Anisha Dasgupta for USA, DOJ, FBI, Robert S. Mueller, III, Eric H. Holder, Jr., ATF, B. Todd Jones and Thomas E. Brandon to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 08/23/2013. (AD)
August 8, 2013 Filing 19 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Lucas J. McCarthy for Clifford Charles Tyler. Certificate of Service:08/08/2013. Argument Request: requested. (LJM)
July 10, 2013 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Mr. Lucas J. McCarthy for Clifford Charles Tyler; No hearings held in District Court. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2013. (LJM)
July 10, 2013 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Lucas J. McCarthy for Appellant Clifford Charles Tyler Certificate of Service: 07/10/2013. (LJM)
July 10, 2013 Filing 13 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Lucas J. McCarthy for Appellant Clifford Charles Tyler. Certificate of Service:07/10/2013. (LJM)
July 10, 2013 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Clifford Charles Tyler by Lucas McCarthy. Certificate of Service: 07/10/2013. (LJM)
July 5, 2013 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Thomas E. Brandon, ATF, FBI, Eric H. Holder, Jr., B. Todd Jones, Robert S. Mueller, III, DOJ and USA by Michael S. Raab. Certificate of Service: 07/05/2013. (MSR)
July 5, 2013 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Thomas E. Brandon, ATF, FBI, Eric H. Holder, Jr., B. Todd Jones, Robert S. Mueller, III, DOJ and USA by Anisha S. Dasgupta. Certificate of Service: 07/05/2013. (AD)
July 1, 2013 Filing 6 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Stan W. Burchardt and Hillsdale County Sheriff's Department by James L. Dyer. Certificate of Service: 07/01/2013. (JLD)
June 27, 2013 Filing 4 LETTER filed by Mr. Lucas J. McCarthy for Clifford Charles Tyler regarding additional appellees . Certificate of Service: 06/27/2013. (LJM)
June 27, 2013 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/09/2013;. appellee brief due 09/11/2013. (BLC)
June 27, 2013 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Bryant Crutcher: 513-564-7013. (BLC)
June 27, 2013 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Clifford Charles Tyler. Transcript needed: n. (BLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Clifford Tyler v. Hillsdale County Sheriff's De, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: Stephen Vincent Potenza
Represented By: Erin Murphy
Represented By: Paul D. Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Harry Frischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATES UNITED TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Daniel B. Asimow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NAMI OH
Represented By: Kristen Henry
Represented By: Michael Kirkman
Represented By: Ronda J. Cress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: OHIO EMPOWERMENT COALITION
Represented By: Kristen Henry
Represented By: Michael Kirkman
Represented By: Ronda J. Cress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISABILITY RIGHTS OHIO
Represented By: Kristen Henry
Represented By: Michael Kirkman
Represented By: Ronda J. Cress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISABILITY RIGHTS TENNESSEE
Represented By: Kristen Henry
Represented By: Michael Kirkman
Represented By: Ronda J. Cress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Simon J. Frankel
Represented By: Rebecca Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KENTUCKY PROTECTION AND ADVOCACY
Represented By: Kristen Henry
Represented By: Michael Kirkman
Represented By: Ronda J. Cress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STAN W. BURCHARDT, individually and as Sheriff of Hillsdale County, Michigan
Represented By: James L. Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, individually and as Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: B. TODD JONES, individually and as Acting Director of The U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HILLSDALE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, named as Hillsdale County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: James L. Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERIC H. HOLDER, JR., Attorney General, In his individual capacity as Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LORETTA E. LYNCH, U.S. Attorney General, In her official capacity as Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS E. BRANDON, individually and as Deputy Director of the U.S. Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives
Represented By: Michael Andrew Zee
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLIFFORD CHARLES TYLER
Represented By: Lucas J. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?