Schwab Industries, Inc. v. Huntington National Bank, et al
Defendant / Appellee: HAHN LOESER & PARKS, HUNTINGTON NATIONAL BANK and ANDREW KRAUSE
Plaintiff / Appellant: SCHWAB INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 16-3790
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Filing 26 MANDATE ISSUED with no costs taxed. (RGF) [Entered: 03/08/2017 07:42 AM]
February 13, 2017 Filing 25 OPINION filed : AFFIRMED, decision not for publication. Danny J. Boggs, Circuit Judge; Eugene E. Siler , Jr., AUTHORING Circuit Judge and Bernice Bouie Donald, Circuit Judge. (RGF) [Entered: 02/13/2017 10:02 AM]
December 8, 2016 Filing 24 CAUSE SUBMITTED on briefs to panel consisting of Judges Boggs, Siler and Donald. (KSC) [Entered: 01/26/2017 08:09 AM]
December 8, 2016 Filing 23 SUBMISSION ON BRIEFS date set for January 26, 2017. (DTS) [Entered: 12/08/2016 03:23 PM]
October 24, 2016 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew D. Greenwell for Appellant Schwab Industries, Incorporated. Certificate of Service:10/24/2016. (MDG) [Entered: 10/24/2016 04:58 PM]
October 7, 2016 Filing 21 APPENDIX filed by Mr. Andrew Scott Nicoll for Huntington National Bank. Volume: I; Pages: 1 - 147. Certificate of Service: 10/07/2016. (ASN) [Entered: 10/07/2016 04:45 PM]
October 7, 2016 Filing 20 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Andrew Scott Nicoll for Huntington National Bank. Certificate of Service:10/07/2016. Argument Request: not requested. (ASN) [Entered: 10/07/2016 04:43 PM]
October 7, 2016 Filing 19 APPENDIX filed by Mr. Daniel R. Warren for Hahn Loeser & Parks, Huntington National Bank and Andrew Krause. Volume: 1; Pages: Appx. # 1 - Appx. # 962. Certificate of Service: 10/07/2016. (DRW) [Entered: 10/07/2016 11:49 AM]
October 7, 2016 Filing 18 APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Mr. Daniel R. Warren for Hahn Loeser & Parks, Huntington National Bank and Andrew Krause. Certificate of Service:10/07/2016. Argument Request: not requested. (DRW) [Entered: 10/07/2016 11:37 AM]
September 23, 2016 Filing 17 RULING LETTER SENT GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION to extend time to file brief [ # 16 ] filed by Mr. Daniel R. Warren., resetting briefing schedule: appellee brief now due 10/07/2016. (RGF) [Entered: 09/23/2016 10:30 AM]
September 22, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION filed by Mr. Daniel R. Warren for Hahn Loeser & Parks, Huntington National Bank and Andrew Krause to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 09/22/2016. (DRW) [Entered: 09/22/2016 03:27 PM]
August 29, 2016 Filing 15 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Matthew D. Greenwell for Schwab Industries, Incorporated. Certificate of Service:08/29/2016. Argument Request: requested. (MDG) [Entered: 08/29/2016 04:49 PM]
August 10, 2016 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Andrew Scott Nicoll for Appellee Huntington National Bank Certificate of Service: 08/10/2016. (ASN) [Entered: 08/10/2016 05:23 PM]
August 10, 2016 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Huntington National Bank by Jared M. Klaus. Certificate of Service: 08/10/2016. (JMK) [Entered: 08/10/2016 03:48 PM]
August 10, 2016 Filing 12 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Huntington National Bank by Andrew S. Nicoll. Certificate of Service: 08/10/2016. (ASN) [Entered: 08/10/2016 03:44 PM]
July 26, 2016 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Daniel R. Warren for Appellee Hahn Loeser & Parks Certificate of Service: 07/26/2016. (DRW) [Entered: 07/26/2016 12:19 PM]
July 26, 2016 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Hahn Loeser & Parks by Michael A. VanNiel. Certificate of Service: 07/26/2016. (MAV) [Entered: 07/26/2016 11:50 AM]
July 26, 2016 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Hahn Loeser & Parks by Daniel R. Warren. Certificate of Service: 07/26/2016. (DRW) [Entered: 07/26/2016 11:43 AM]
July 20, 2016 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Matthew D. Greenwell for Schwab Industries, Incorporated. Certificate of Service: 07/20/2016. (MDG) [Entered: 07/20/2016 05:27 PM]
July 20, 2016 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew D. Greenwell for Appellant Schwab Industries, Incorporated Certificate of Service: 07/20/2016. (MDG) [Entered: 07/20/2016 05:25 PM]
July 20, 2016 Filing 6 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Matthew D. Greenwell for Appellant Schwab Industries, Incorporated. Certificate of Service:07/20/2016. (MDG) [Entered: 07/20/2016 05:25 PM]
July 20, 2016 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Schwab Industries, Incorporated by Charles V. Longo. Certificate of Service: 07/20/2016. (CVL) [Entered: 07/20/2016 05:21 PM]
July 20, 2016 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Schwab Industries, Incorporated by Matthew D. Greenwell. Certificate of Service: 07/20/2016. (MDG) [Entered: 07/20/2016 05:13 PM]
July 15, 2016 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 08/29/2016;. appellee brief due 09/29/2016; (RGF) [Entered: 07/15/2016 03:16 PM]
July 15, 2016 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF) [Entered: 07/15/2016 03:15 PM]
July 15, 2016 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Schwab Industries, Incorporated. Transcript needed: n. (RGF) [Entered: 07/15/2016 03:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwab Industries, Inc. v. Huntington National Bank, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HAHN LOESER & PARKS
Represented By: Michael Andrew VanNiel
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HUNTINGTON NATIONAL BANK
Represented By: Andrew Scott Nicoll
Represented By: Hugh E. McKay
Represented By: Jared Michael Klaus
Represented By: Michael Andrew VanNiel
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW KRAUSE
Represented By: Michael Andrew VanNiel
Represented By: Daniel R. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SCHWAB INDUSTRIES, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Charles Vincent Longo
Represented By: Matthew D. Greenwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?