Cynthia Harris v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, et al

Defendant: GOVERNMENT NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Defendant / Appellee: FLAGSTAR BANK and LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: CYNTHIA HARRIS
Case Number: 19-1020
Filed: January 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 RULING LETTER SENT granting appellant's motion to extend time to file brief by 28 days [ # 11 ] filed by Mr. Darwyn Prentiss Fair. Resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 03/26/2019; appellee brief now due 04/25/2019. (CAM) [Entered: 02/26/2019 04:47 PM]
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION filed by Mr. Darwyn Prentiss Fair for Cynthia Harris to extend time to file brief. Certificate of Service: 02/26/2019. [19-1020] (DPF) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:14 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Amy Sabbota Gottlieb for Appellee Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC Certificate of Service: 01/17/2019. [19-1020]--[Edited 01/18/2019 by CAM] (ASG) [Entered: 01/17/2019 04:30 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Amy Sabbota Gottlieb for Appellee Flagstar Bank Certificate of Service: 01/17/2019. [19-1020]--[Edited 01/18/2019 by CAM] (ASG) [Entered: 01/17/2019 04:30 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Flagstar Bank and Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC by Amy Sabbota Gottlieb. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2019. [19-1020] (ASG) [Entered: 01/17/2019 04:28 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 02/26/2019; appellee brief due 03/28/2019. (CAM) [Entered: 01/17/2019 12:16 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Darwyn Prentiss Fair for Cynthia Harris. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2019. [19-1020] (DPF) [Entered: 01/17/2019 10:34 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Darwyn Prentiss Fair for Appellant Cynthia Harris Certificate of Service: 01/17/2019. [19-1020] (DPF) [Entered: 01/17/2019 10:30 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Darwyn Prentiss Fair for Appellant Cynthia Harris. Certificate of Service:01/17/2019. [19-1020] (DPF) [Entered: 01/17/2019 10:27 AM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Cynthia Harris by Darwyn P. Fair. Certificate of Service: 01/17/2019. [19-1020] (DPF) [Entered: 01/17/2019 10:23 AM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 01/03/2019 03:29 PM]
January 3, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Cynthia Harris. Transcript needed: y. (CAM) [Entered: 01/03/2019 03:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cynthia Harris v. Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLAGSTAR BANK
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CYNTHIA HARRIS
Represented By: Darwyn Prentiss Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?