Keturah Mixon v. Trott Law, P.C., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: KETURAH MIXON
Defendant / Appellee: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC, BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION and TROTT LAW, P.C.
Case Number: 19-1366
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 15 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Keturah Mixon Certificate of Service:05/10/2019. Argument Request: not received. (CAM) [Entered: 05/20/2019 03:14 PM]
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Trott Law, P.C. by Matthew D. Levine. Certificate of Service: 05/02/2019. [19-1366] (MDL) [Entered: 05/02/2019 10:33 AM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 13 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Bank of America Corporation by Douglas E Winter. Certificate of Service: 04/22/2019. [19-1366] (DEW) [Entered: 04/22/2019 04:25 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Amy Sabbota Gottlieb for Appellee Bank of America Corporation Certificate of Service: 04/22/2019. [19-1366] (ASG) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:40 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Bank of America Corporation by Amy Sabbota Gottlieb. Certificate of Service: 04/22/2019. [19-1366] (ASG) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:38 PM]
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. C. Thomas Ludden for Appellee Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC Certificate of Service: 04/22/2019. [19-1366] (CTL) [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:59 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC by C. Thomas Ludden. Certificate of Service: 04/18/2019. [19-1366] (CTL) [Entered: 04/18/2019 12:47 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC by Thomas G. Costello. Certificate of Service: 04/18/2019. [19-1366] (TGC) [Entered: 04/18/2019 12:46 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 ***LOCKED--SEE RE 8***APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Keturah Mixon by Thomas G. Costello. Certificate of Service: 04/18/2019. [19-1366]--[Edited 04/18/2019 by CAM] (TGC) [Entered: 04/18/2019 12:01 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 ***LOCKED--SEE RE 9***APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Keturah Mixon by C. Thomas Ludden. Certificate of Service: 04/18/2019. [19-1366]--[Edited 04/18/2019 by CAM] (CTL) [Entered: 04/18/2019 12:00 PM]
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Bree Anne Stopera for Appellee Trott Law, P.C. Certificate of Service: 04/18/2019. [19-1366] (BAS) [Entered: 04/18/2019 09:04 AM]
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Trott Law, P.C. by Bree Anne Stopera. Certificate of Service: 04/17/2019. [19-1366] (BAS) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:28 PM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting pro se briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/21/2019; appellee brief due 06/20/2019. (CAM) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:31 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: C. Anthony Milton (CAM) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:26 AM]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Keturah Mixon. Transcript needed: n. (CAM) [Entered: 04/08/2019 11:20 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Keturah Mixon v. Trott Law, P.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KETURAH MIXON
Represented By: Keturah Mixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: David Gregory Michael
Represented By: Thomas G. Costello
Represented By: C. Thomas Ludden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Represented By: Aimee Renee Gibbs
Represented By: Douglas E. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TROTT LAW, P.C.
Represented By: Richard Arthur Welke
Represented By: Matthew D. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?