Joel Carter v. Kenneth McKee, et al
Defendant / Appellee: LEE MCROBERTS, Deputy Warden, KENNETH MCKEE, Corrections Facility Administrator, PAUL KLEE, Warden, B. EVERS, Resident Unit Manager, S. KINDINGER, Assistant Resident Unit Supervisor and KENNETH T. MCKEE, Warden, Corrections Facility Administrator
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOEL CARTER
Case Number: 19-1492
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER filed to dismiss as a duplicate appeal of case number 19-1552. 6th Cir. R. 45(a)(8). (REO) [Entered: 05/21/2019 09:59 AM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant MOTION filed by Joel Carter to proceed in forma pauperis. Certificate of service: 04/25/2019. (REO) [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:55 PM]
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner trust account statement filed. (REO) [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:54 PM]
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 CORRESPONDENCE: correspondence by Joel Carter regarding IFP motion. (REO) [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:21 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant not served in district court, complaint dismissed prior to service. (REO) [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:19 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:18 PM]
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Joel Carter. Transcript needed: n. (REO) [Entered: 05/03/2019 03:15 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joel Carter v. Kenneth McKee, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEE MCROBERTS, Deputy Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH MCKEE, Corrections Facility Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL KLEE, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: B. EVERS, Resident Unit Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. KINDINGER, Assistant Resident Unit Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH T. MCKEE, Warden, Corrections Facility Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOEL CARTER
Represented By: Joel Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?