Little Caesar Enter, Inc, et al v. Miramar Quick Serv Restaurant, et al
Defendant / Appellant: ABDEL DRIHMI, SILON CORPORATION, MIRAMAR QUICK SERVICE RESTAURANT CORPORATION and KHALID DRIHMI
Plaintiff / Appellee: LITTLE CAESAR ENTERPRISES, INC. and LC TRADEMARKS, INC.
Case Number: 19-1860
Filed: August 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees LC Trademarks, Inc. and Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. by Justin L. Sallis. Certificate of Service: 09/26/2019. [19-1860] (JLS) [Entered: 09/26/2019 09:05 AM]
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees LC Trademarks, Inc. and Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. by Stephen J. Vaughan. Certificate of Service: 09/26/2019. [19-1860] (SJV) [Entered: 09/26/2019 09:00 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION: Setting transcript deadline, relating to transcript order, [8] Transcript to be filed in district court by Linda M. Cavanagh by 10/11/2019. (BLC) [Entered: 09/11/2019 09:34 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 Court Reporter Acknowledgement filed by Ms. Linda M. Cavanagh, for transcript [8] ; Arrangements for payment were made on 09/10/2019 ; Estimated completion date: 10/10/2019 ; Estimated number of pages: 55 . [19-1860] (LMC) [Entered: 09/11/2019 09:07 AM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION: Setting acknowledgement deadline, relating to transcript order, [8]. Linda M. Cavanagh's acknowledgement is due 09/11/2019. (BLC) [Entered: 08/28/2019 08:22 AM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Kerby Roberson for Appellants Abdel Drihmi, Khalid Drihmi, Miramar Quick Service Restaurant Corporation and Silon Corporation Certificate of Service: 08/27/2019. [19-1860] (KR) [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:57 PM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Kerby Roberson for Appellants Abdel Drihmi, Khalid Drihmi, Miramar Quick Service Restaurant Corporation and Silon Corporation. Certificate of Service:08/27/2019. [19-1860] (KR) [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:54 PM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT ordered from filed by Kerby Roberson for Abdel Drihmi, Khalid Drihmi, Miramar Quick Service Restaurant Corporation and Silon Corporation. [8] ; ----- This is to order a transcript from court reporter Linda Cavanagh of the following proceedings and to certify that satisfactory financial arrangements have been completed ----- Transcript ordered on: 08/27/2019 ; District Court Judge/Magistrate: Terrence G. Berg ; Hearing Dates: May 3, 2019 Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; Method of Payment: Private Funds ; Court reporter acknowledgement is due in 14 days. Certificate of Service: 08/27/2019. [19-1860] (KR) [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:52 PM]
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Abdel Drihmi, Khalid Drihmi, Miramar Quick Service Restaurant Corporation and Silon Corporation by Kerby Roberson, Esq.. Certificate of Service: 08/27/2019. [19-1860] (KR) [Entered: 08/27/2019 04:48 PM]
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Larry J. Saylor for Appellee LC Trademarks, Inc. Certificate of Service: 08/23/2019. [19-1860] (LJS) [Entered: 08/23/2019 12:17 PM]
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Larry J. Saylor for Appellee Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. Certificate of Service: 08/23/2019. [19-1860] (LJS) [Entered: 08/23/2019 12:16 PM]
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees LC Trademarks, Inc. and Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. by Larry J. Saylor. Certificate of Service: 08/23/2019. [19-1860] (LJS) [Entered: 08/23/2019 12:13 PM]
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: The initial transcript related filing has not been completed. If not completed by 08/26/2019 further action will be taken. The remaining forms listed in this court's 08/05/19 letter are to be filed by this date also. (BLC) [Entered: 08/22/2019 03:10 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Bryant Crutcher: 513-564-7013. (BLC) [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:37 PM]
August 5, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Abdel Drihmi, Khalid Drihmi, Miramar Quick Service Restaurant Corporation and Silon Corporation. Hearing held: y. (BLC) [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Little Caesar Enter, Inc, et al v. Miramar Quick Serv Restaurant, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ABDEL DRIHMI
Represented By: Kerby Roberson
Represented By: Clarence Benson Tucker Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SILON CORPORATION
Represented By: Kerby Roberson
Represented By: Clarence Benson Tucker Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MIRAMAR QUICK SERVICE RESTAURANT CORPORATION
Represented By: Kerby Roberson
Represented By: Clarence Benson Tucker Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KHALID DRIHMI
Represented By: Kerby Roberson
Represented By: Clarence Benson Tucker Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LITTLE CAESAR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Larry J. Saylor
Represented By: Justin Lydell Sallis
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LC TRADEMARKS, INC.
Represented By: Larry J. Saylor
Represented By: Justin Lydell Sallis
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?