Melissa Buck, et al v. Robert Gordon, et al
Defendant: ALEX AZAR, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services, DANA NESSEL, in her official capacity as Attorney General of Michigan, ROBERT GORDON, in his official capacity as Director of the Michigan Department of Health and Human Services, HERMAN MCCALL, in his official capacity as the Executive Director of the Michigan Children's Services Agency, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ALEX M. AZAR, II, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff / Appellee: MELISSA BUCK, CHAD BUCK, ST. VINCENT CATHOLIC CHARITIES and SHAMBER FLORE
Not Yet Classified: DANA DUMONT and KRISTY DUMONT
Case Number: 19-1959
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Sixth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 11, 2020 Summary Buck v. Gordon

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 22 APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Jason William Schnier for Dana Dumont and Kristy Dumont Certificate of Service:10/16/2019. Argument Request: requested. [19-1959] (JWS) [Entered: 10/16/2019 06:24 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 21 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Dana Dumont and Kristy Dumont by Garrard R. Beeney. Certificate of Service: 10/16/2019. [19-1959] (GRB) [Entered: 10/16/2019 06:05 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 20 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Dana Dumont and Kristy Dumont by Leila R. Siddiky. Certificate of Service: 10/16/2019. [19-1959] (LRS) [Entered: 10/16/2019 12:12 PM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 19 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Melissa Buck, Chad Buck, Shamber Flore and St. Vincent Catholic Charities by Jacob M. Coate. Certificate of Service: 10/16/2019. [19-1959] (JC) [Entered: 10/16/2019 11:36 AM]
October 16, 2019 Filing 18 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Melissa Buck, Chad Buck, Shamber Flore and St. Vincent Catholic Charities by William J. Haun. Certificate of Service: 10/16/2019. [19-1959] (WH) [Entered: 10/16/2019 11:35 AM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/22/2019; appellee brief due 11/21/2019. (RLJ) [Entered: 09/12/2019 07:27 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is already on file in the District Court Clerks Office. Filed by Mr. Jason William Schnier for Dana Dumont and Kristy Dumont. Certificate of Service: 09/11/2019. [19-1959] (JWS) [Entered: 09/11/2019 05:27 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Jason William Schnier for Appellants Dana Dumont and Kristy Dumont. Certificate of Service:09/11/2019. [19-1959] (JWS) [Entered: 09/11/2019 05:27 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Jason William Schnier for Appellants Dana Dumont and Kristy Dumont Certificate of Service: 09/11/2019. [19-1959] (JWS) [Entered: 09/11/2019 05:21 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Lori Halstead Windham for Appellees Chad Buck, Melissa Buck and Shamber Flore. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-1959]--[Edited 09/06/2019 by RB] (LHW) [Entered: 09/06/2019 12:53 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Lori Halstead Windham for Appellee St. Vincent Catholic Charities. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-1959]--[Edited 09/06/2019 by RB] (LHW) [Entered: 09/06/2019 11:12 AM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Melissa Buck, Chad Buck, Shamber Flore and St. Vincent Catholic Charities by Nicholas R. Reaves. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-1959] (NRR) [Entered: 09/06/2019 11:09 AM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Melissa Buck, Chad Buck, Shamber Flore and St. Vincent Catholic Charities by Mark L. Rienzi. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-1959] (MR) [Entered: 09/06/2019 11:06 AM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Melissa Buck, Chad Buck, Shamber Flore and St. Vincent Catholic Charities by Lori H. Windham. Certificate of Service: 09/06/2019. [19-1959] (LHW) [Entered: 09/06/2019 11:03 AM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Update fee status change to paid. APPEAL FEE PAID re 65 by amicus parties Dana Dumont, Kristy Dumont in the amount of $505, receipt number AMIWDC-4527475 (RLJ) [Entered: 09/04/2019 12:25 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Update fee status change to due. Counsel accidently paid fee here, returned, instructed to pay at the DC. Remains due 9/11/19. (PJE) [Entered: 09/04/2019 12:02 PM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 ****RETURNED**** Original Proceeding fee paid Mr. Jason William Schnier for Dana Dumont and Kristy Dumont. Fee Amount: $500.00 Receipt Number: A06-67510-617.. [19-1959]--[Edited 09/04/2019 by PJE] (JWS) [Entered: 09/04/2019 11:06 AM]
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Dana Dumont and Kristy Dumont by Jason W. Schnier. Certificate of Service: 09/04/2019. [19-1959] (JWS) [Entered: 09/04/2019 11:02 AM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Dana Dumont and Kristy Dumont by Jay D. Kaplan. Certificate of Service: 08/28/2019. [19-1959] (JDK) [Entered: 08/28/2019 02:36 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Dana Dumont and Kristy Dumont by Daniel S. Korobkin. Certificate of Service: 08/28/2019. [19-1959] (DSK) [Entered: 08/28/2019 12:49 PM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Johnson (RLJ) [Entered: 08/28/2019 11:39 AM]
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Dana Dumont and Kristy Dumont. Transcript needed: y. (RLJ) [Entered: 08/28/2019 11:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Melissa Buck, et al v. Robert Gordon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MELISSA BUCK
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Reaves
Represented By: Lori Halstead Windham
Represented By: Mark Rienzi
Represented By: Jacob Coate
Represented By: William Haun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHAD BUCK
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Reaves
Represented By: Lori Halstead Windham
Represented By: Mark Rienzi
Represented By: Jacob Coate
Represented By: William Haun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ST. VINCENT CATHOLIC CHARITIES
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Reaves
Represented By: Lori Halstead Windham
Represented By: Mark Rienzi
Represented By: Jacob Coate
Represented By: William Haun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SHAMBER FLORE
Represented By: Nicholas Robert Reaves
Represented By: Lori Halstead Windham
Represented By: Mark Rienzi
Represented By: Jacob Coate
Represented By: William Haun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX AZAR, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Jeanne Frances Long
Represented By: Christopher Alan Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA NESSEL, in her official capacity as Attorney General of Michigan
Represented By: Precious Snyott Boone
Represented By: Joshua Sean Smith
Represented By: Toni L. Harris
Represented By: Elizabeth Briggs
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Sukkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT GORDON, in his official capacity as Director of the Michigan Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Precious Snyott Boone
Represented By: Joshua Sean Smith
Represented By: Toni L. Harris
Represented By: Elizabeth Briggs
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Sukkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERMAN MCCALL, in his official capacity as the Executive Director of the Michigan Children's Services Agency
Represented By: Precious Snyott Boone
Represented By: Joshua Sean Smith
Represented By: Toni L. Harris
Represented By: Elizabeth Briggs
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Sukkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Jeanne Frances Long
Represented By: Christopher Alan Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Jeanne Frances Long
Represented By: Christopher Alan Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: DANA DUMONT
Represented By: Ann Elizabeth Ostrager
Represented By: Leila R. Siddiky
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Hannah Lonky
Represented By: Jay D. Kaplan
Represented By: Jason William Schnier
Represented By: Leslie Jill Cooper
Represented By: Garrard Russ Beeney
Represented By: Leila Rashida Siddiky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: KRISTY DUMONT
Represented By: Ann Elizabeth Ostrager
Represented By: Leila R. Siddiky
Represented By: Daniel S. Korobkin
Represented By: Hannah Lonky
Represented By: Jay D. Kaplan
Represented By: Jason William Schnier
Represented By: Leslie Jill Cooper
Represented By: Garrard Russ Beeney
Represented By: Leila Rashida Siddiky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?